Chris Langer v. George S. Stern et al
Plaintiff: Chris Langer
Defendant: Does 1-10, Miguel Angel Martinez Velasco, George S. Stern, Adele S. Stern and Adele R. Stern
Case Number: 2:2019cv02151
Filed: March 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andre Birotte
Referring Judge: John E McDermott
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Filing 24 Compliance Statement filed by Defendant George S. Stern and Adele R. Stern (Kerekes, Steven)
June 12, 2019 Filing 23 STATEMENT Compliance For Stay and Early Mediation filed by Defendant Miguel Angel Martinez Velasco re: Order on Application to Stay Case and Early Mediation re ADA Disability Access Litigation (ADR-22) #20 . (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Garber, Adolfo)
June 7, 2019 Filing 22 STIPULATION REGARDING SELECTION of Panel Mediator filed. Parties request that the ADR Program assign a Panel Mediator from the following area of law: Civil Rights/ADA. Filed by Plaintiff Chris Langer(Grace, Phyl)
June 6, 2019 Filing 21 STATEMENT Plaintiff's Case Statement filed by Plaintiff Chris Langer re: Order on Application to Stay Case and Early Mediation re ADA Disability Access Litigation (ADR-22) #20 . (Price, Dennis)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Granting #19 APPLICATION to Stay Case re Early Mediation ADA Disability Access Litigation as to all proceedings. The ADR proceeding is to be completed no later than 8/2/2019. (gk)
May 17, 2019 Filing 19 First APPLICATION to Stay Case and Early Mediation re ADA Disability Access Litigation, filed by Defendants, Miguel Angel Martinez Velasco dba La Maquina Company Miguel Angel Martinez Velasco. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Garber, Adolfo)
May 15, 2019 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Adele R. Stern(in individual), Adele R. Stern(representative capacity as trustee under the Trust Agreement Entered into between George S. Stern and Adele R. Stern dated February 27, 1985), George S. Stern(representative capacity as trustee under the Trust Agreement Entered into between George S. Stern and Adele R. Stern dated February 27, 1985), George S. Stern(in individual ), (Kerekes, Steven)
May 15, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Adele R. Stern(in individual), Adele R. Stern(representative capacity as trustee under the Trust Agreement Entered into between George S. Stern and Adele R. Stern dated February 27, 1985), George S. Stern(representative capacity as trustee under the Trust Agreement Entered into between George S. Stern and Adele R. Stern dated February 27, 1985), George S. Stern(in individual ). (Attachments: #1 Declaration Proof of Service)(Attorney Steven W Kerekes added to party Adele R. Stern(pty:dft), Attorney Steven W Kerekes added to party Adele R. Stern(pty:dft), Attorney Steven W Kerekes added to party George S. Stern(pty:dft), Attorney Steven W Kerekes added to party George S. Stern(pty:dft))(Kerekes, Steven)
April 30, 2019 Filing 16 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Chris Langer, upon Defendant George S. Stern(representative capacity as trustee under the Trust Agreement Entered into between George S. Stern and Adele R. Stern dated February 27, 1985) served on 4/27/2019, answer due 5/20/2019; George S. Stern(in individual ) served on 4/27/2019, answer due 5/20/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Benson Doe - Member of Household in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell)
April 30, 2019 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Chris Langer, upon Defendant Adele R. Stern(in individual) served on 4/27/2019, answer due 5/20/2019; Adele R. Stern(representative capacity as trustee under the Trust Agreement Entered into between George S. Stern and Adele R. Stern dated February 27, 1985) served on 4/27/2019, answer due 5/20/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Benson Doe - Member of Household in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell)
April 23, 2019 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Chris Langer, re Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only #13 served on 04/23/2019. (Carson, Chris)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Scheduling Conference set for 7/26/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
April 16, 2019 Filing 12 First NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant, Miguel Angel Martinez Velasco and doing business as La Maquina Company Miguel Angel Martinez Velasco, (Garber, Adolfo)
April 16, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Miguel Angel Martinez Velasco and doing business as La Maquina Company Miguel Angel Martinez Velasco. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Proof of Service)(Attorney Adolfo Bojalil Garber added to party Miguel Angel Martinez Velasco(pty:dft))(Garber, Adolfo)
April 4, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Chris Langer, upon Defendant Miguel Angel Martinez Velasco served on 3/27/2019, answer due 4/17/2019. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Carson, Chris)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
March 25, 2019 Filing 8 Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (cb)
March 25, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Miguel Angel Martinez Velasco, Adele R. Stern(in individual), Adele R. Stern(representative capacity as trustee under the Trust Agreement Entered into between George S. Stern and Adele R. Stern dated February 27, 1985), George S. Stern(representative capacity as trustee under the Trust Agreement Entered into between George S. Stern and Adele R. Stern dated February 27, 1985), George S. Stern(in individual ). (et)
March 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
March 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (et)
March 22, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Chris Langer. (Handy, Russell)
March 22, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Chris Langer, (Handy, Russell)
March 22, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Chris Langer. (Handy, Russell)
March 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23421544 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Chris Langer. (Attorney Russell C Handy added to party Chris Langer(pty:pla))(Handy, Russell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chris Langer v. George S. Stern et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miguel Angel Martinez Velasco
Represented By: Adolfo Bojalil Garber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George S. Stern
Represented By: Steven W Kerekes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adele S. Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adele R. Stern
Represented By: Steven W Kerekes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Langer
Represented By: Russell C Handy
Represented By: Phyl Grace
Represented By: Raymond George Ballister, Jr
Represented By: Dennis Jay Price, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?