Brian Whitaker v. Kensington Luggage S.M., Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Brian Whitaker
Defendant: Does 1-10 and Kensington Luggage S.M., Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02152
Filed: March 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: R Gary Klausner
Referring Judge: Gail J Standish
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by plaintiff Brian Whitaker. Dismissal is with prejudice. (Carson, Chris)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 DENIED BY ORDER OF THE COURT by Judge R. Gary Klausner, re Stipulation to Vacate Dates Due to Settlement #15 . (jp)
May 30, 2019 Filing 15 Joint STIPULATION to Vacate date due to settlement filed by plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Chris Carson added to party Brian Whitaker(pty:pla))(Carson, Chris)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES AND ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner. The Court has reviewed the Notice of Settlement filed on May 29, 2019 #13 . The parties are hereby notified that they are not relieved of any deadlines (including the filing of responsive documents) or Court appearances until a dismissal of the action is filed. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 29, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Carson, Chris)
April 24, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Kensington Luggage S.M., Inc. answer now due 5/29/2019, filed by Attorney for Defendant Kensington Luggage S.M., Inc..(Attorney Michael Allen Correia added to party Kensington Luggage S.M., Inc.(pty:dft))(Correia, Michael)
April 11, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker, upon Defendant Kensington Luggage S.M., Inc. served on 4/8/2019, answer due 4/29/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for Service of Process: IQBAL SINGH DHALIWAL in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell)
April 3, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Brian Whitaker, re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #9 served on 04/03/2019. (Carson, Chris)
March 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge R. Gary Klausner for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-02152 RGK(GJSx). (rn)
March 25, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Kensington Luggage S.M., Inc. (et)
March 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
March 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (et)
March 22, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Handy, Russell)
March 22, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker, (Handy, Russell)
March 22, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Handy, Russell)
March 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23421549 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Attorney Russell C Handy added to party Brian Whitaker(pty:pla))(Handy, Russell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brian Whitaker v. Kensington Luggage S.M., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kensington Luggage S.M., Inc.
Represented By: Michael Joseph Karlin
Represented By: Larry Scott Karlin
Represented By: Michael Allen Correia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Whitaker
Represented By: Russell C Handy
Represented By: Phyl Grace
Represented By: Chris Carson
Represented By: Dennis Jay Price, II
Represented By: Raymond George Ballister, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?