Antonio Fernandez v. PIH Health Real Estate Services, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Antonio Fernandez
Defendant: Does 1-10, United Medical Imaging, Inc. and PIH Health Real Estate Services, LLC
Cross Defendant: Roes 1-20
Case Number: 2:2019cv02155
Filed: March 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles F Eick
Referring Judge: Virginia A Phillips
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2019 Filing 24 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant United Medical Imaging, Inc., identifying Antonio Fernandez, PIH Health Real Estate Services, LLC, United Medical Imaging, Inc.. (Tabolsky, Alexander)
June 5, 2019 Filing 23 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant United Medical Imaging, Inc..(Attorney Alexander C Tabolsky added to party United Medical Imaging, Inc.(pty:dft))(Tabolsky, Alexander)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER ON JOINT STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE ENTRY OF DEFAULT AS TO UNITED MEDICAL IMAGING, INC. by Judge Virginia A. Phillips, re Stipulation to Set Aside Default, #21 : FOR GOOD CAUSE APPEARING, the following is hereby ORDERED: A. The Default by Clerk (ECF No. 15) is set aside; B. Defendant United Medical Imaging, Inc. shall file answer to the Complaint no later than June 5, 2019; and SO ORDERED. (bm)
May 17, 2019 Filing 21 Joint STIPULATION to Set Aside Default as to Defendant United Medical Imaging, Inc. filed by Defendant United Medical Imaging, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Farid Novian added to party United Medical Imaging, Inc.(pty:dft))(Novian, Farid)
May 16, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS #18 RE: Answer #16 , by Clerk of Court. The document is accepted as filed. Other: Defendant shall file their Notice of Interested Parties forthwith. (bm)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. Scheduling Conference set for 7/29/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (bh)
May 10, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer #16 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (bm)
May 9, 2019 Filing 17 CROSSCLAIM against cross-defendant United Medical Imaging, Inc., filed by cross-claimant PIH Health Real Estate Services, LLC.(Park, Ernie)
May 9, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant PIH Health Real Estate Services, LLC.(Park, Ernie)
April 22, 2019 Filing 15 DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to United Medical Imaging, Inc., a California Corporation (bm)
April 19, 2019 Filing 14 REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant United Medical Imaging, Inc. filed by Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proof of Service) (Grace, Phyl)
April 14, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to PIH Health Real Estate Services, LLC answer now due 5/10/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant PIH Health Real Estate Services, LLC.(Attorney Ernie Zachary Park added to party PIH Health Real Estate Services, LLC(pty:dft))(Park, Ernie)
April 11, 2019 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez, upon Defendant PIH Health Real Estate Services, LLC served on 4/7/2019, answer due 4/29/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for Service of Process: PEGGY A CHULACK in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell)
April 4, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez, upon Defendant United Medical Imaging, Inc. served on 3/28/2019, answer due 4/18/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for Service of Process: NASSER HEIKALI in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Carson, Chris)
April 3, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Antonio Fernandez, re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #9 served on 04/03/2019. (Carson, Chris)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (bh)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Virginia A. Phillips for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-02155 VAP(Ex). (rn)
March 25, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants PIH Health Real Estate Services, LLC, United Medical Imaging, Inc. (car)
March 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
March 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (car)
March 22, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. (Handy, Russell)
March 22, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez, (Handy, Russell)
March 22, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. (Handy, Russell)
March 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23421609 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. (Attorney Russell C Handy added to party Antonio Fernandez(pty:pla))(Handy, Russell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Antonio Fernandez v. PIH Health Real Estate Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Medical Imaging, Inc.
Represented By: Farid Novian
Represented By: Alexander C Tabolsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PIH Health Real Estate Services, LLC
Represented By: Ernie Zachary Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Fernandez
Represented By: Russell C Handy
Represented By: Dennis Jay Price, II
Represented By: Raymond George Ballister, Jr
Represented By: Phyl Grace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Roes 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?