Antonio Fernandez v. Hekmatravan Family Norwalk LLC et al

Plaintiff: Antonio Fernandez
Defendant: Golin Theaters, Inc., Does 1-10, Hekmatravan Family Norwalk LLC and Levian Family Norwalk, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv02156
Filed: March 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Cormac J Carney
Referring Judge: Gail J Standish
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REGARDING SETTLEMENT PROCEDURES, PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE, AND TRIAL by Judge Cormac J. Carney. (gga)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Discovery cut-off 4/16/2020. Motions due by 6/15/2020. Last date to conduct settlement conference is 5/19/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 7/20/2020 at 3:00 p.m. Jury Trial set for 7/28/2020 at 8:30 a.m. (gga)
May 20, 2019 Filing 15 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan filed by Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez.. (Price, Dennis)
April 21, 2019 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez, upon Defendant Hekmatravan Family Norwalk LLC served on 4/16/2019, answer due 5/7/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for Service of Process : HAMID RAVAN in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell)
April 18, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF INTENT upon filing of the complaint by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Scheduling order to be issued on June 13, 2019. (gga)
April 17, 2019 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants Golin Theaters, Inc., Hekmatravan Family Norwalk LLC, Levian Family Norwalk, LLC (Hurley, Gregory)
April 17, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendants Golin Theaters, Inc., Hekmatravan Family Norwalk LLC, Levian Family Norwalk, LLC.(Attorney Gregory F Hurley added to party Golin Theaters, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Gregory F Hurley added to party Hekmatravan Family Norwalk LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Gregory F Hurley added to party Levian Family Norwalk, LLC(pty:dft))(Hurley, Gregory)
April 8, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez, upon Defendant Golin Theaters, Inc. served on 4/7/2019, answer due 4/29/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Crystal Whittaker Marketing Operations Admin Manager was authorized to receive documents. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell)
April 4, 2019 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez, upon Defendant Levian Family Norwalk, LLC served on 3/27/2019, answer due 4/17/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for Service of Process: JAVID LEVIAN in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Carson, Chris)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Cormac J. Carney for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-02156 CJC(GJSx). (rn)
March 25, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Golin Theaters, Inc., Hekmatravan Family Norwalk LLC, Levian Family Norwalk, LLC. (car)
March 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
March 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (car)
March 22, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. (Handy, Russell)
March 22, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez, (Handy, Russell)
March 22, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. (Handy, Russell)
March 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23421619 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. (Attorney Russell C Handy added to party Antonio Fernandez(pty:pla))(Handy, Russell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Antonio Fernandez v. Hekmatravan Family Norwalk LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golin Theaters, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory F Hurley
Represented By: Michael J Chilleen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hekmatravan Family Norwalk LLC
Represented By: Gregory F Hurley
Represented By: Michael J Chilleen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Levian Family Norwalk, LLC
Represented By: Gregory F Hurley
Represented By: Michael J Chilleen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Fernandez
Represented By: Russell C Handy
Represented By: Dennis Jay Price, II
Represented By: Raymond George Ballister, Jr
Represented By: Phyl Grace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?