Adam Perzow v. Moshe Hogeg et al
Plaintiff: Adam Perzow
Defendant: Kenges Rakishev, Moshe Hogeg, Joseph Chen and Does 2-10, 12-20
Case Number: 2:2019cv02318
Filed: March 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Frederick F Mumm
Referring Judge: Manuel L Real
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #33 filed by Adam Perzow. CCA # 19-55763. The motion to reinstate this appeal is granted. The August 28, 2019 order is vacated, and the appeal is reinstated. Accordingly, the order to show cause is discharged, and this appeal shall proceed. [See document for more details.] (mat)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #33 filed by Adam Perzow. CCA # 19-55763. Pursuant to Ninth Circuit Rule 42-1, this appeal is dismissed for failure to prosecute. Counsel for appellant is directed to notify his/her client immediately in writing regarding this dismissal. This order served on the district court shall, 21 days after the date of the order, act as the mandate of this court. (mat)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER OF DISMISSAL BY LACK OF PROSECUTION AS TO DEFENDANTS KENGES RAKISHEV AND JOSEPH CHEN by Judge R. Gary Klausner: Plaintiff was ordered to show cause in writing by not later than 6/26/2019 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution as to the remaining defendants Kenges Rakishev and Joseph Chen #32 ; WHEREAS, this period has elapsed without any action by plaintiff. The Court hereby DISMISSES this instant action for lack of prosecution as to defendants Kenges Rakishev and Joseph Chen. ( Case Terminated. Made JS-6. ) (gk)
July 3, 2019 Filing 34 NOTIFICATION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Appeal Docket No. 19-55763 assigned to Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #33 as to Plaintiff Adam Perzow. (iv)
July 3, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Plaintiff Adam Perzow. Appeal of Order on Motion to Dismiss Case, Order on Motion for Leave to File Document #31 . (Appeal Fee - $505 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24031126.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Bowse, Michael)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MINUTES OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION AS TO THE REMAINING DEFENDANTS by Judge Manuel L. Real: Plaintiff is hereby ordered to show cause in writing by not later than 6/26/2019 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution as to the remaining defendants. The court will consider the filing of the following as an appropriate response to this Order to Show Cause, on or before the above date: Proof of service of summons and complaint. The Order will stand submitted upon the filing of the response to the Order to Show Cause. Failure to timely respond to the Court's Order will result in the dismissal of the action. Court Reporter: N/A. (gk)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT MOSHE HOGEG'S MOTION TO DISMISS #21 by Judge Manuel L. Real. See document for details. (gk)
May 20, 2019 Filing 30 OPPOSITION in opposition to re: APPLICATION for Leave to file Sur-Reply #29 filed by Defendant Moshe Hogeg. (Haeusler, Rita)
May 20, 2019 Filing 29 APPLICATION for Leave to file Sur-Reply filed by Plaintiff Adam Perzow. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum [Proposed} Sur-Reply) (Bowse, Michael)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 TEXT ONLY SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Manuel L. Real, The Court has determined that Motion to Dismiss Case filed by defendant Moshe Hogeg #21 set for hearing on May 20, 2019 at 10:00 A.M. is suitable for a decision on the papers as filed by all parties without the need for oral argument. Therefore, the said motion is taken UNDER SUBMISSION on the papers as filed and the hearing date of May 20, 2019 is VACATED and TAKEN OFF CALENDAR. The Court will issue its ruling on the matter in due course. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dbu) TEXT ONLY ENTRY Modified on 5/17/2019 (dbu).
May 9, 2019 Filing 27 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 7-10 days, filed by Plaintiff Adam Perzow.. (Bowse, Michael)
May 6, 2019 Filing 26 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #21 First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Moshe Hogeg. (Haeusler, Rita)
May 1, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Adam Perzow. correcting MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion, #24 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum [Corrected] Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Complaint)(Bowse, Michael)
April 30, 2019 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #21 filed by Plaintiff Adam Perzow. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Adam Perzow, #2 Declaration Declaration of Ari Gati)(Bowse, Michael)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Judge Manuel L. Real Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Aviva Wernick to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Moshe Hogeg, designating Rita M. Haeusler as local counsel #20 . (gk)
April 15, 2019 Filing 22 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #21 filed by Defendant Moshe Hogeg. (Haeusler, Rita)
April 15, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by defendant Moshe Hogeg. Motion set for hearing on 5/20/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Manuel L. Real. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Moshe Hogeg, #2 Proposed Order) (Haeusler, Rita)
April 15, 2019 Filing 20 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Aviva Wernick to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Moshe Hogeg (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23549914) filed by defendant Moshe Hogeg. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Haeusler, Rita)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Judge Manuel L. Real Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Gil Ben-Ezra to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Moshe Hogeg, designating Rita M. Haeusler as local counsel #11 . (gk)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING MOSHE HOGEG'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge Manuel L. Real: The Court hereby GRANTS Defendant Moshe Hogeg's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint #8 and extends the deadline for Mr. Hogeg to respond to Plaintiffs Amended Complaint to 4/15/2019. (gk)
April 8, 2019 Filing 17 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant Moshe Hogeg, OF ORDER RE: NOTICE TO COUNSEL served on April 8, 2019. (Haeusler, Rita)
April 5, 2019 Filing 16 DECLARATION of Rita M. Haeusler in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer to 4/15/2019 re Amended Complaint #8 filed by Defendant Moshe Hogeg. (Haeusler, Rita)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CORRECTED* TEXT ONLY SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Manuel L. Real. Defendant filed an Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File a *Response on March 28, 2019 (Dkt. No. 8 ). *Defendant's response was due on April 3, 2019. Counsel is hereby ORDERED to file a declaration in support of the unopposed motion explaining in detail why additional time is necessary. The Court notes that merely restating the causes of action in the complaint does not provide "good cause." The Court ORDERS counsel to file the declaration on or before 11:59 PST of April 6, 2019. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cch) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ONLY SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Manuel L. Real. Defendant filed an Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Answer on March 28, 2019 (Dkt. No. #8 ). The Answer was due on April 3, 2019. Counsel is hereby ORDERED to file a declaration in support of the unopposed motion explaining in detail why additional time is necessary. The Court notes that merely restating the causes of action in the complaint does not provide "good cause." The Court ORDERS counsel to file the declaration on or before 11:59 PST of April 6, 2019. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cch) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Judge Manuel L. Real. The following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order for the following reason(s): (1) Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. Other error(s) with document(s): As the parties noted in their Stipulation to Extend Time to the Amended Complaint, the operative complaint in this case is the amended complaint. Local Rule 8-3 does not apply. Local Rule 8-3 allows an extension of time to respond to the initial complaint without a court order. This rule does not apply to any amended pleadings. (cch)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER RE: NOTICE TO COUNSEL upon filing of the complaint by Judge Manuel L. Real. READ CAREFULLY - FAILURE TO COMPLY MAY LEAD TO SANCTIONS. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (cch)
April 3, 2019 Filing 11 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Gil Ben-Ezra to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Moshe Hogeg (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23489126) filed by defendant Moshe Hogeg. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Haeusler, Rita)
April 1, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Moshe Hogeg answer now due 4/15/2019, re Amended Complaint filed by defendant Moshe Hogeg.(Haeusler, Rita)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Manuel L. Real for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-02318 R(FFMx). (rn)
March 28, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer to 4/15/2019 re Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Moshe Hogeg. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Haeusler, Rita)
March 28, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
March 28, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (esa)
March 28, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF FILING REMOVAL PAPERS AND PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL ON ALL PARTIES IN THE SUPERIOR COURT ACTION filed by defendant Moshe Hogeg. (Haeusler, Rita)
March 27, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and First Amended Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Adam Perzow, upon Defendant Moshe Hogeg acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 3/8/2019. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Avina Wesmill, relationship not indicated. (Filed in state court 3/14/19, submitted as document 1, attachment 4) (esa) Modified on 3/28/2019 (esa).
March 27, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendants Joseph Chen, Does 2-10, 12-20, Moshe Hogeg, Kenges Rakishev, Jury Demand, filed by plaintiff Adam Perzow (Filed in state court 3/8/19, submitted as document 1, attachment 3)(esa)
March 27, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Moshe Hogeg, Does 1-20, Jury Demand, filed by plaintiff Adam Perzow. (Filed in state court 11/9/18, submitted as document 1, attachment 1, p. 2) (esa)
March 27, 2019 Filing 4 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant Moshe Hogeg, OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL AND RELATED INITIAL DOCUMENTS served on March 27, 2019. (Haeusler, Rita)
March 27, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Moshe Hogeg, identifying Adam Perzow; Moshe Hogeg; Kenges Rakishev; Joseph Chen; Singulariteam Ltd. (Israel); Heath Global, Inc.; IDC Investdotcom holdings Ltd.. (Haeusler, Rita)
March 27, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Moshe Hogeg. (Haeusler, Rita)
March 27, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 18STCV04802 Receipt No: 0973-23452952 - Fee: $400, filed by defendant Moshe Hogeg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 Certificate of Service, #3 Exhibit 3 First Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit 4 Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt, #5 Exhibit 5 Civil Case Cover Sheet and Addendum, #6 Exhibit 6 Notice of Case Assignment, #7 Exhibit 7 Summons, #8 Exhibit 8 Notice of Case Management Conference, #9 Exhibit 9 State Court Docket, #10 Exhibit 10 Notice to Adverse Party of Removal) (Attorney Rita M Haeusler added to party Moshe Hogeg(pty:dft))(Haeusler, Rita)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adam Perzow v. Moshe Hogeg et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Perzow
Represented By: Michael A Bowse
Represented By: Dustin A Huffine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenges Rakishev
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moshe Hogeg
Represented By: Rita M Haeusler
Represented By: Gil Ben-Ezra
Represented By: Aviva Wernick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 2-10, 12-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?