Healthcare Ally Management of California, LLC v. Unitedhealthcare, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Healthcare Ally Management of California, LLC
Defendant: Unitedhealthcare, Inc., DOES 1 - 100, inclusive and Does 1-100
Case Number: 2:2019cv02487
Filed: April 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Maria A Audero
Referring Judge: Otis D Wright
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2019 Filing 15 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles Superior Court, Santa Monica, No 19SMCV00258. (lc)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO REMAND AND REMANDING ACTION TO STATE COURT #13 ; ANDDENYING AS MOOT PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REMAND #12 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: Case remanded to Los Angeles County Superior Court, Santa Monica, No. 19SMCV00258. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lc)
May 24, 2019 Filing 13 Joint STIPULATION to Remand Case to State Court filed by Defendant Unitedhealthcare, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation to Reman)(Westerfeld, Bryan)
May 2, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court, Los Angeles County filed by Plaintiff Healthcare Ally Management of California, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 6/17/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D. Wright II. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Michael D. Newborn ISO Healthcare Ally Mgmt of CA's Motion to Remand and Request Costs, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Healthcare Ally Mgmt of CA's Motion to Remand and Request Expenses and Fees) (Newborn, Michael)
April 16, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar to Judge Otis D. Wright, II for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:19-cv-02487 ODW(MAAx). (rn)
April 16, 2019 Filing 10 STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge filed by Plaintiff Healthcare Ally Management of California, LLC. (Newborn, Michael)
April 10, 2019 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Unitedhealthcare, Inc., re Supplement #8 served on 4/10/2019. (Westerfeld, Bryan)
April 10, 2019 Filing 8 SUPPLEMENT to Answer to Complaint (Discovery), Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Unitedhealthcare, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Conformed Defendant's Answer to Complaint)(Westerfeld, Bryan)
April 3, 2019 Filing 7 REMINDER NOTICE re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. Each party must file form CV-11C within the consent deadlines pursuant to L.R. 73-2. Additionally, the parties are directed to L.R. 73-2.2 Proof of Service. In any case in which only a magistrate judge is initially assigned, plaintiff must file a proof of service within 10 days of service of the summons and complaint as to each defendant. (hr)
April 3, 2019 Filing 6 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Unitedhealthcare, Inc., of Notice to Superior Court of Removal of Action to Federal Court served on 4/3/2019. (Westerfeld, Bryan)
April 3, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (Attachments: #1 CV-11C) (esa)
April 2, 2019 COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by defendant Unitedhealthcare, Inc. (non-conformed, submitted as document 1, attachment 2)(esa)
April 2, 2019 COPY OF SERVICE OF PROCESS TRANSMITTAL executed by Plaintiff Healthcare Ally Management of California, LLC, upon Defendant Unitedhealthcare, Inc. served on 3/1/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System, Agent for Process of Service by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (non-conformed, submitted as document 1, attachment 1) (esa)
April 2, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Does 1-100, Unitedhealthcare, Inc., Jury Demand, filed by plaintiff Healthcare Ally Management of California, LLC. (Filed in state court 2/8/19, submitted as document 1, attachment 1) (esa)
April 2, 2019 Filing 4 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Unitedhealthcare, Inc., re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 served on 4/2/2019. (Westerfeld, Bryan)
April 2, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Unitedhealthcare, Inc., identifying UnitedHealthcare, Inc.; United Healthcare Services, Inc.; UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Westerfeld, Bryan)
April 2, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Unitedhealthcare, Inc.. (Westerfeld, Bryan)
April 2, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 19SMCV00258 Receipt No: 0973-23485681 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Unitedhealthcare, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B Defendant's Answer to Complaint, #3 Exhibit C Declaration of Jonathan A. Stieglitz) (Attorney Bryan Scott Westerfeld added to party Unitedhealthcare, Inc.(pty:dft))(Westerfeld, Bryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Healthcare Ally Management of California, LLC v. Unitedhealthcare, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unitedhealthcare, Inc.
Represented By: Bryan Scott Westerfeld
Represented By: Jessica Brooke Hardy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 - 100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Healthcare Ally Management of California, LLC
Represented By: Michael D Newborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?