Jose Luis Mejia v. United States of America

Petitioner: Jose Luis Mejia
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2019cv02514
Filed: April 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John F Walter
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DENYING MOTION TO STAY DURATION OF THE 1-YEAR TIME LIMITATION PERIOD TO FILE 28 U.S.C. 2255 PETITION UNTIL THE DATE OF THE FINAL DISPOSITION ON THE NINTH CIRCUIT"LIMITED REMAND" ON THE "BRADY ISSUE" THAT IS PENDING IN THIS HONORABLE DISTRICT COURT OR HOLD IN ABEYANCE WITH CONDITION TO SUPPLEMENT AND AMEND 28 U.S.C. 2255 [filed 4/3/2019; Docket No. #1 ]; ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL ON MOTION TO STAY DURATION OF THE1-YEAR TIME LIMITATION PERIOD TO FILE 28 U.S.C.2255 PETITION UNTIL THE DATE OF FINALDISPOSITION ON THE NINTH CIRCUIT "LIMITEDREMAND" ON THE "BRADY ISSUE" THAT IS PENDING IN THIS HONORABLE DISTRICT COURT OR HOLD IN ABEYANCE WITH CONDITION TO SUPPLEMENT AND AMEND 28 U.S.C. 2255 [filed 5/15/2019; Docket No. #5 ] by Judge John F. Walter. The Court finds that these matters are appropriate for decision without oral argument. The hearing calendared for June 11, 2019 is hereby vacated and the matter taken off calendar. After considering the Motion to Stay, the Motion for Appointment of Counsel, and the Government's Response, and the arguments therein, the Court rules as follows: Petitioner's Motion to Stay and Motion for Appointment of Counsel are DENIED as unripe, without prejudice to Petitioner filing a timely motion under 28 U.S.C. 2255 once the Petitioner's case (and those of his eight co-defendants) becomes final. (iv)
May 15, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL ON MOTION TO STAY DURATION OF THE 1-YEAR TIME LIMITATION PERIOD TO FILE 28 U.S.C. 2255 PETITION UNTIL THE DATE OF FINAL DISPOSITION ON THE NINTH CIRCUIT "LIMITED REMAND" ON THE "BRADY ISSUE" THAT IS PENDING IN THIS HONORABLE DISTRICT COURT filed by Plaintiff Jose Luis Mejia. (iv)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Judge John F. Walter. On April 3, 2019, Petitioners filed a Motion to Stay Duration of the 1-Year Time Limitation Period to File 28 U.S.C 2255 Petition Until the Date of Final Disposition on the Ninth Circuit "Limited Remand" on The "Brady Issue" That Is Pending In this Honorable District Court or Hold in Abeyance with Condition to Supplement and Amend 28 U.S.C 2255 #1 . The Government shall file its Opposition to Petitioners' Motion on or before May 20, 2019. The Court sets a hearing on Petitioners' Motion for June 11, 2019 at 11:00 a.m (iv)
April 18, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST for copy of 28 USC 2255 and Motion to Stay filed by Petitioner Jose Luis Mejia. (lom)
April 3, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter for motion filed under 28 U.S.C. 2255. (ghap)
April 3, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence pursuant to 28 USC 2255 assigned to Judge John F. Walter. For docketing entries refer to CR Case # 2:05-cr-578-JFW, filed by petitioner Jose Luis Mejia. (ghap)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jose Luis Mejia v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Assistant 2241-2255 US Attorney LA-CR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jose Luis Mejia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?