Moda-Innochips Co., LTD. v. Pressure Profile Systems, Inc. et al
Petitioner: Moda-Innochips Co., LTD.
Respondent: Pressure Profile Systems, Inc. and Impress, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02684
Filed: April 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Rozella A Oliver
Referring Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:0009
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Filing 28 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge George H. Wu re: #26 REQUEST to Continue. The Court has received Respondent Pressure Profile Systems, Inc.'s Request for Continuance of Hearing #26 . The Request is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Judgment entered on June 21, 2019. Defendant must move to reopen case and set aside judgment. (mrgo)
June 24, 2019 Filing 26 REQUEST to Continue Hearing Re: Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Respondent Pressure Profile Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Proposed Order Granting Respondent Pressure Profile Systems, Inc.'s Request for Continuance of Hearing) (Yoo, Timothy)
June 24, 2019 Filing 25 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Timothy B Yoo counsel for Respondent Pressure Profile Systems, Inc.. Adding Timothy B. Yoo as counsel of record for Pressure Profile Systems, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Respondent Pressure Profile Systems, Inc.. (Attorney Timothy B Yoo added to party Pressure Profile Systems, Inc.(pty:res))(Yoo, Timothy)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER CONFIRMING FOREIGN ARBITRATION AWARD by Judge George H. Wu, in favor of Moda-Innochips Co., LTD. against Pressure Profile Systems, Inc. in the principal amount of $300,000.00, plus simple interest accruing at the rate of six percent (6%) per annum from April 12th, 2016 up and until the date of the approval of the Petition Related to: Motion Hearing, #24 . (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (mrgo)
June 17, 2019 Filing 24 MINUTES OF PETITIONER'S PETITION TO CONFIRM FOREIGN ARBITRATION AWARD #1 Hearing held before Judge George H. Wu. Court confers with Plaintiff's counsel. Based on the tentative issued on June 6, 2019, and for reasons stated on the record, the Petition is GRANTED. Counsel will prepare and file a proposed order by June 19, 2019. Court Reporter: Katie E. Thibodeaux. (mrgo)
June 6, 2019 Filing 23 MINUTES OF PETITIONER'S PETITION TO CONFIRM FOREIGN ARBITRATION AWARD #1 Hearing held before Judge George H. Wu. The Court's Tentative Ruling is circulated and attached hereto. Court confers with the parties. For reasons stated on the record, the Petition is continued to June 17, 2019 at 8:30 a.m. Parties will attempt to resolve. A joint document is to be filed by noon June 14, 2019 if matter is settled. Court Reporter: Katie E Thibodeaux. (lom)
May 21, 2019 Filing 22 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Petitioner Moda-Innochips Co., LTD., upon Respondent Pressure Profile Systems, Inc. served on 5/8/2019, answer due 5/29/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Daniel Park in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Syed, Habeeb)
May 8, 2019 Filing 21 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS: by Judge George H. Wu: The Court, on its own motion, CONTINUES PETITIONERS PETITION TO CONFIRM FOREIGN ARBITRATION AWARD previously scheduled for 05/16/2019 to 6/6/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 3, 2019 Filing 20 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Petitioner Moda-Innochips Co., LTD., upon Respondent Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Lynanne Gares: Managing Agent of Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons returned. (Syed, Habeeb)
May 2, 2019 Filing 19 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Petitioner Moda-Innochips Co., LTD., upon Respondent Impress, Inc. served on 5/2/2019, answer due 5/23/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Lynanne Gares: Managing Agent of Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Syed, Habeeb)
April 16, 2019 Filing 18 21 DAY Summons Issued re Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to respondent Impress, Inc. (mrgo)
April 15, 2019 Filing 17 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Petitioner Moda-Innochips Co., LTD.. (Syed, Habeeb)
April 11, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #14 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (lom)
April 11, 2019 Filing 15 21 DAY Summons Issued re Petition #1 as to Defendant Pressure Profile Systems, Inc. (lom)
April 11, 2019 Filing 14 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Petitioner Moda-Innochips Co., LTD.. (Syed, Habeeb)
April 11, 2019 Filing 13 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Petitioner Moda-Innochips Co., LTD.. (Syed, Habeeb)
April 11, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #9 , Summons Request #10 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (lom)
April 10, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF LODGING filed by MODA-INNOCHIPS CO., LTD. re Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Syed, Habeeb)
April 10, 2019 Filing 10 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Petitioner Moda-Innochips Co., LTD.. (Syed, Habeeb)
April 10, 2019 Filing 9 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Petitioner Moda-Innochips Co., LTD.. (Syed, Habeeb)
April 10, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Petitioner Moda-Innochips Co., LTD. identifying None as Corporate Parent. (Syed, Habeeb)
April 10, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Petitioner Moda-Innochips Co., LTD., (Syed, Habeeb)
April 10, 2019 Filing 6 TEXT ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS: by Judge George H. Wu: The Court sets a hearing on PETITIONERS PETITION TO CONFIRM FOREIGN ARBITRATION AWARD #1 for 5/16/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (ghap)
April 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
April 10, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (ghap)
April 10, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Petitioner Moda-Innochips Co., LTD.. (Syed, Habeeb)
April 10, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION TO CONFIRM FOREIGN ARBITRATION AWARD Receipt No: 0973-23524396 - Fee: $400, filed by Petitioner Moda-Innochips Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit) (Attorney Habeeb Syed added to party Moda-Innochips Co., LTD.(pty:pet))(Syed, Habeeb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moda-Innochips Co., LTD. v. Pressure Profile Systems, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Moda-Innochips Co., LTD.
Represented By: Habeeb Syed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Pressure Profile Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy B Yoo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Impress, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?