Paul Reiffer v. Alta Centers, Inc.

Plaintiff: Paul Reiffer
Defendant: Alta Centers, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02780
Filed: April 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Steve Kim
Referring Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES #20 by Judge George H. Wu. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties stipulation extending the time for Plaintiff to file its motion to strike is hereby granted. Plaintiff shall have until August 2, 2019 to a motion to strike Defendant's answer and affirmative defenses. (lom)
July 8, 2019 Filing 20 Second STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File File Motion to Strike filed by Plaintiff Paul Reiffer. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Grossbardt, Jonah)
July 8, 2019 Filing 19 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 2-4 days, filed by Plaintiff Paul Reiffer.. (Grossbardt, Jonah)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Judge George H. Wu, Granting Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Motion to Strike Defendant's Answer and Affirmative Defenses #17 . Plaintiff shall have until July 8, 2019 to a motion to strike Defendants answer and affirmative defenses. (twdb)
June 24, 2019 Filing 17 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File File Motion to Strike filed by Plaintiff Paul Reiffer. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Grossbardt, Jonah)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge George H. Wu. (Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/8/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 7/18/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu.) (mrgo)
June 4, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #14 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (mrgo)
June 3, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Attorney for Defendant Alta Centers, Inc..(Tahmazian, Jilbert)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Judge George H. Wu re Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, #12 . IT IS SO ORDERED. Defendant should answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint on or before Tuesday, June 4, 2019. (mrgo)
May 20, 2019 Filing 12 First STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint filed by Attorney for Defendant Alta Centers, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Jilbert Tahmazian added to party Alta Centers, Inc.(pty:dft))(Tahmazian, Jilbert)
May 8, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Paul Reiffer, upon Defendant Alta Centers, Inc. served on 5/1/2019, answer due 5/22/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Kristina White, Director of Operations at Alta Centers, Inc. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Grossbardt, Jonah)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Standing Order Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trials by Judge George H. Wu. (lom)
April 12, 2019 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Alta Centers, Inc. (lh)
April 12, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
April 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (lh)
April 11, 2019 Filing 6 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Paul Reiffer. (Grossbardt, Jonah)
April 11, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Paul Reiffer. (Grossbardt, Jonah)
April 11, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Paul Reiffer, (Grossbardt, Jonah)
April 11, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Paul Reiffer (Grossbardt, Jonah)
April 11, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Paul Reiffer. (Grossbardt, Jonah)
April 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23532593 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Paul Reiffer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Registration, #2 Exhibit 2- Infringement) (Attorney Jonah Adam Grossbardt added to party Paul Reiffer(pty:pla))(Grossbardt, Jonah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paul Reiffer v. Alta Centers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Reiffer
Represented By: Jonah Adam Grossbardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alta Centers, Inc.
Represented By: Jilbert Tahmazian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?