United States of America v. 20 Acres of Land, More or Less, Situate in San Bernardino County, California et al
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, and United States of America
Defendant: Jan Lamngo, San Bernardino County Auditor-Controller Treasurer Tax Collector, 20 Acres of Land, More or Less, Situate in San Bernardino County, California, Spouse of Jan Lamngo and Dan Lamngo
Case Number: 2:2019cv02781
Filed: April 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles F Eick
Referring Judge: John F Walter
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 28:1358
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. The purpose of this Order is to notify the parties and their counsel of the deadlines and the schedule that will govern this action. Pretrial Conference set for 4/10/2020 at 10:00 AM. Hearing on Motions in Limine; Disputed Jury Instructions set for 4/17/2020 at 10:00 AM. Jury Trial set for 4/28/2020 at 8:30 AM. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (iv)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER VACATING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REFERRAL TO PRIVATE MEDIATION by Judge John F. Walter. The Court has reviewed the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report and finds that a Scheduling Conference is not necessary. The hearing on July 22, 2019 is vacated and taken off calendar. A Scheduling and Case Management Order will issue. Any unserved DOE defendants are dismissed at this time. The Court, having considered the parties' Request: ADR Procedure Selection, the Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program, or the report submitted by the parties pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) and Civil L.R. 26-1, hereby: ORDERS this case referred to: ADR PROCEDURE NO. 3: (Private mediation). The ADR proceeding is to be completed no later than: January 6, 2020. The Joint Report re: Results of Settlement Conference due on: January 10, 2020. (iv)
July 8, 2019 Filing 23 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 4 days, filed by Plaintiff United States of America.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Discovery Schedule, #2 Exhibit Proposed Discovery Plan)(Plant, Miles)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge John F. Walter: Counsel are hereby notified that a Scheduling Conference has been set for July 22, 2019 at 1:15 p.m. before Judge John F. Walter in Courtroom 7A, 350 W. 1st St, Los Angeles, CA 90012. Lead Trial Counsel shall attend all proceedings before this Court, including the Scheduling Conference. Counsel are directed to comply with Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 26-1 in a timely fashion and to file a Joint Report, on or before July 8, 2019. (iv)
May 31, 2019 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL ON 5/31/19 RE Answer to Complaint #19 ; Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #20 filed by Defendant Jan Lamngo. (lom)
May 31, 2019 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Jan Lamngo. (lom)
May 31, 2019 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Jan Lamngo. (lom)
May 31, 2019 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff United States of America. upon Dan Lamngo waiver sent by Plaintiff on 4/11/2019, answer due 6/10/2019. Waiver of Service signed by Dan Lamngo. (Plant, Miles)
May 21, 2019 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff United States of America. upon Jan Lamngo waiver sent by Plaintiff on 4/11/2019, answer due 6/10/2019. Waiver of Service signed by Jan Lamngo. (Plant, Miles)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: granting #9 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Permit Deposit of Estimate of Just Compensation into an Interest-Bearing Account in the Court's Registry. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Application is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court shall accept the deposit of eight thousand dollars and no cents ($8,000.00) tendered by the United States, including by wire transfer or check, and shall deposit these funds into an interest-bearing account under the terms and conditions of Fed. R. Civ. P. 67 and Local Civil Rule 67. (lom)
April 29, 2019 Filing 15 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Dan Lamngo, Jan Lamngo. (iv)
April 24, 2019 Filing 14 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Declaration, #3 , Miscellaneous Document, #4 filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Addendum)(Plant, Miles)
April 24, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Additional Defendant filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Plant, Miles)
April 24, 2019 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Miles H. Plant , Lead Trial Counsel, re: Compliance with Local Rules Governing Electronic Filing filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Plant, Miles)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv)
April 17, 2019 Filing 10 DISCLAIMER filed by Defendant San Bernardino County Auditor-Controller Treasurer Tax Collector to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . (Norton, Mitchell)
April 15, 2019 Filing 9 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Deposit Funds filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Permitting Deposit of Estimate of Just Compensation) (Plant, Miles)
April 12, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
April 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (jtil)
April 12, 2019 Filing 6 Waiver of Service - Returned Executed by San Bernardino County Auditor-Controller/Treasurer/Tax Collector filed by Plaintiff United States of America filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, (Plant, Miles)
April 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA,. correcting Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Declaration, #3 , Miscellaneous Document, #4 (Plant, Miles)
April 11, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Condemnation filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedule A - Authority, #2 Exhibit Schedule B - Public Purpose, #3 Exhibit Schedule C - Legal Description, #4 Exhibit Schedule D - Map, #5 Exhibit Schedule E - Estate Taken, #6 Exhibit Schedule F - Estimate of Just Compensation, #7 Exhibit Schedule G - Interested Parties)(Plant, Miles)
April 11, 2019 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Taking filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedule A - Authority, #2 Exhibit Schedule B - Public Purpose, #3 Exhibit Schedule C - Legal Description, #4 Exhibit Schedule D - Map, #5 Exhibit Schedule E - Estate Taken, #6 Exhibit Schedule F - Estimate of Just Compensation, #7 Exhibit Schedule G - Interested Parties)(Plant, Miles)
April 11, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA,. (Plant, Miles)
April 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT No Fee Required - US Government, filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedule A - Authority, #2 Exhibit Schedule B - Public Purpose, #3 Exhibit Schedule C - Legal Description, #4 Exhibit Schedule D - Map, #5 Exhibit Schedule E - Estate Taken, #6 Exhibit Schedule F - Estimate of Just Compensation, #7 Exhibit Schedule G - Interested Parties) (Attorney Miles H Plant added to party UNITED STATES OF AMERICA,(pty:pla))(Plant, Miles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. 20 Acres of Land, More or Less, Situate in San Bernardino County, California et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jan Lamngo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Bernardino County Auditor-Controller Treasurer Tax Collector
Represented By: Mitchell L Norton
Represented By: Michelle Danielle Blakemore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 20 Acres of Land, More or Less, Situate in San Bernardino County, California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spouse of Jan Lamngo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Lamngo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA,
Represented By: Miles H Plant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Miles H Plant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?