Design Collection, Inc. v. SOHO Apparel, LTD, et al

Plaintiff: Design Collection, Inc.
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10 inclusive, Ross Stores Inc., SOHO APPAREL, LTD and SOHO Apparel, LTD.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02791
Filed: April 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles F Eick
Referring Judge: Stephen V Wilson
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 IN CHAMBERS ORDER-TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: The Order to Show Cause #12 , issued on 06/21/2019, is DISCHARGED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Granting Joint Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) #15 , by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. The time for Defendants SOHO APPAREL, LTD and ROSS STORES INC. to respond to the Complaint is extended up to and including July 26, 2019. (twdb)
July 3, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Design Collection, Inc.to Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, Set/Reset Deadlines #12 Corrected (Doniger, Stephen)
July 3, 2019 Filing 15 Corrected STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Design Collection, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order ON JOINT STIPULATION FOR COURT APPROVAL TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANTS SOHO APPAREL, LTD AND ROSS STORES INC.TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT)(Doniger, Stephen)
July 1, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Design Collection, Inc.to Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, Set/Reset Deadlines #12 (Doniger, Stephen)
July 1, 2019 Filing 13 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Ross Stores Inc. answer now due 7/26/2019; SOHO Apparel, LTD. answer now due 7/26/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Design Collection, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order ON JOINT STIPULATION FOR COURT APPROVAL TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANTS SOHO APPAREL, LTD AND ROSS STORES INC.TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT)(Doniger, Stephen)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Show Cause Response due by 7/5/2019.) (mrgo)
June 20, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Design Collection, Inc., upon Defendant SOHO Apparel, LTD. served on 4/23/2019, answer due 5/14/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Gisella Headen - Office Manager in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Doniger, Stephen)
June 20, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Design Collection, Inc., upon Defendant Ross Stores Inc. served on 4/17/2019, answer due 5/8/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon The Corporation Trust Company c/o Amy Mclaren - Registered Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Doniger, Stephen)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
April 15, 2019 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Ross Stores Inc., and SOHO Apparel, LTD. (jtil)
April 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
April 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (jtil)
April 11, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Design Collection, Inc.. (Doniger, Stephen)
April 11, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Design Collection, Inc.. (Doniger, Stephen)
April 11, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Design Collection, Inc.. (Doniger, Stephen)
April 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Design Collection, Inc., (Doniger, Stephen)
April 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23535313 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Design Collection, Inc.. (Attorney Stephen M Doniger added to party Design Collection, Inc.(pty:pla))(Doniger, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Design Collection, Inc. v. SOHO Apparel, LTD, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10 inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ross Stores Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOHO APPAREL, LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOHO Apparel, LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Design Collection, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen M Doniger
Represented By: Scott A Burroughs
Represented By: David Shein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?