John I. Beeler v. Nancy A. Berryhill

Plaintiff: John I. Beeler
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 2:2019cv02837
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Referring Judge: Andrew J Guilford
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFIED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD (SOCIAL SECURITY) filed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Attachments: #1 Certification Page, #2 Court Transcript Index, #3 Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, if applicable, #4 Payment Documents and Decisions, #5 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices, #6 Non Disability Related Development, #7 Disability Related Development, #8 Medical Records Part 1, #9 Medical Records Part 2, #10 Medical Records Part 3)(Sachelari, Paul)
July 1, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill.(Sachelari, Paul)
May 20, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian for all further proceedings. Please use the case number CV19-2837 JC on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn)
May 17, 2019 Filing 12 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Attorney Paul H Sachelari added to party Nancy A. Berryhill(pty:dft))(Sachelari, Paul)
May 6, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), (Perales, Monica)
May 6, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff John I. Beeler, upon Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill served on 5/1/2019, answer due 8/29/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Perales, Monica)
April 17, 2019 Filing 9 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (sbou)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian: granting #3 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (sbou)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER [Social Security] by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. This case is designated for electronic filing. See Local Rule 5-4. When a proposed order or other proposed document is lodged or accompanies a filing, a WordPerfect or Word copy of the proposed order or other proposed document shall also be e-mailed to: JC_Chambers@cacd.uscourts.gov. (See document for details.) (sbou)
April 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andrew J. Guilford and referred to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (ghap)
April 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff John I Beeler, (Perales, Monica)
April 12, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff John I Beeler. (Perales, Monica)
April 12, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff John I Beeler. (Perales, Monica)
April 12, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff John I Beeler. (Perales, Monica)
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff John I Beeler. (Attorney Monica Perales added to party John I Beeler(pty:pla))(Perales, Monica)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: John I. Beeler v. Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John I. Beeler
Represented By: Monica Perales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Paul H Sachelari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?