Angela Marie Willee v. Nancy A. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Angela Marie Willee
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 2:2019cv02838
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Paul L Abrams
Referring Judge: John A Kronstadt
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams for all further proceedings. Please use the case number CV19-2838 PLA on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn)
May 31, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Attorney Marla K Letellier added to party Nancy A. Berryhill(pty:dft))(Letellier, Marla)
May 16, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Plaintiff Angela Marie Willee. (Krank, Laura)
May 16, 2019 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Angela Marie Willee, upon Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill served on 5/16/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Service was executed in compliance with statute not specified. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Krank, Laura)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (ch)
April 12, 2019 Filing 6 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (et)
April 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and referred to Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (et)
April 12, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Angela Marie Willee, (Krank, Laura)
April 12, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Angela Marie Willee. (Krank, Laura)
April 12, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Angela Marie Willee. (Krank, Laura)
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23543238 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Angela Marie Willee. (Attorney Laura E Krank added to party Angela Marie Willee(pty:pla))(Krank, Laura)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Angela Marie Willee v. Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Marie Willee
Represented By: Laura E Krank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Marla K Letellier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?