Chris Kobin v. Big Picture Loans, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Chris Kobin
Defendant: Ascension Technologies, LLC, Big Picture Loans, LLC and Matt Martorello
Case Number: 2:2019cv02842
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Cormac J Carney
Referring Judge: Charles F Eick
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT, FOR EXTENSION OF DEADLINE FOR PLAINTIFF TO RESPOND TO DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS, AND FOR ORDER VACATING DEADLINE PURSUANT TO L.R. 23-3 #21 by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Defendants' deadline to respond to the complaint shall be extended to August 26, 2019; Plaintiff's deadline to file responses shall be September 26, 2019. (iv)
June 19, 2019 Filing 22 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Chris Kobin, re Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer (More than 30 days),, Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, #21 served on June 19, 2019. (Caddell, Michael)
June 19, 2019 Filing 21 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to August 26, 2019 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response filed by Plaintiff Chris Kobin. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Caddell, Michael)
April 26, 2019 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Chris Kobin. upon Matt Martorello waiver sent by Plaintiff on 4/26/2019, answer due 6/25/2019. Waiver of Service signed by Jonathan P. Boughrum. (Caddell, Michael)
April 26, 2019 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Chris Kobin. upon Big Picture Loans, LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 4/26/2019, answer due 6/25/2019. Waiver of Service signed by Justin Gray. (Caddell, Michael)
April 26, 2019 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Chris Kobin. upon Ascension Technologies, LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 4/26/2019, answer due 6/25/2019. Waiver of Service signed by Justin Gray. (Caddell, Michael)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney John B. Scofield to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Chris Kobin, designating Michael A. Caddell as local counsel #16 . (iv)
April 19, 2019 Filing 16 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney John B. Scofield, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Chris Kobin (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23582207) filed by Plaintiff Chris Kobin. (Attachments: #1 1 - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Caddell, Michael)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION TO SERVE AS LOCAL COUNSEL WITHOUT HAVING AN OFFICE WITHIN THIS DISTRICT #14 by Judge Cormac J. Carney. It is therefore ORDERED that Caddell & Chapman serve as local counsel for Plaintiff without maintaining an office within this District. It is further ordered that Caddell & Chapman lawyer, John Scofield, will not be required to associate with local counsel maintaining an office within this District for purposes of seeking to be admitted to practice pro hac vice in this litigation. (lom)
April 19, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Serve as Local Counsel Without Having an Office in This District (Unopposed) filed by Plaintiff Chris Kobin. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Caddell, Michael)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Ronald S.W. Lew to Judge Cormac J. Carney for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-02842 CJC(Ex). (rn)
April 15, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney John B. Scofield, Jr.. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (et)
April 15, 2019 Filing 11 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Matt Martorello. (et)
April 15, 2019 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Ascension Technologies, LLC. (et)
April 15, 2019 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Big Picture Loans, LLC. (et)
April 15, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
April 15, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Ronald S. W. Lew and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (et)
April 12, 2019 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Chris Kobin. (Caddell, Michael)
April 12, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Chris Kobin. (Caddell, Michael)
April 12, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Chris Kobin. (Caddell, Michael)
April 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Chris Kobin, (Caddell, Michael)
April 12, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Chris Kobin. (Caddell, Michael)
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23543808 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Chris Kobin. (Attachments: #1 Declaration 1 - Loan Agreement) (Attorney Michael A Caddell added to party Chris Kobin(pty:pla))(Caddell, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chris Kobin v. Big Picture Loans, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ascension Technologies, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Big Picture Loans, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Martorello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Kobin
Represented By: Michael A Caddell
Represented By: Cynthia B Chapman
Represented By: John B Scofield, Jr
Represented By: Amy E Tabor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?