Bavaria Fiction GmbH v. Sonar Entertainment Distribution, LLC
Plaintiff: Bavaria Fiction GmbH
Defendant: Sonar Entertainment Distribution, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv02854
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Consuelo B Marshall
Referring Judge: Jean P Rosenbluth
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 49 Opposition Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Copyright Infringement . Motion #14 Sonar's Evidentiary Objections to Bavaria's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Defendant Sonar Entertainment Distribution, LLC. (Chieffo, Vincent)
July 2, 2019 Filing 48 Opposition Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Copyright Infringement . Motion #14 in Opposition to Bavaria's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Defendant Sonar Entertainment Distribution, LLC. (Chieffo, Vincent)
July 2, 2019 Filing 47 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Sonar Entertainment Distribution, LLC's Counterclaims [REDACTED] #31 Sonar's Request for Judicial Notice in Support of its Opposition to Bavaria's Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Sonar Entertainment Distribution, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Vincent H. Chieffo in Support of Sonar Entertainment Distribution, LLC's Request for Judicial Notice with Exhibits 1-2)(Chieffo, Vincent)
July 2, 2019 Filing 46 Opposition Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Sonar Entertainment Distribution, LLC's Counterclaims [REDACTED] #31 filed by Defendant Sonar Entertainment Distribution, LLC. (Chieffo, Vincent)
July 2, 2019 Filing 45 Bavaria Fiction, GmbH's Evidentiary Objections to Declarations and Exhibits in support of Sonar Entertainment Distribution, LLC's Motion for Preliminary Injunction in opposition to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Preserving the Status Quo . Motion #37 filed by Counter Defendant Bavaria Fiction GmbH, Plaintiff Bavaria Fiction GmbH. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Sustaining Bavaria Fiction, GmbH's Evidentiary Objections to Declarations and Exhibits in support of Sonar Entertainment Distribution, LLC's Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(Deixler, Bert)
July 2, 2019 Filing 44 Opposition to Sonar Entertainment Distribution, LLC's Motion for Preliminary Injunction in opposition to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Preserving the Status Quo . Motion #37 filed by Counter Defendant Bavaria Fiction GmbH, Plaintiff Bavaria Fiction GmbH. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Moritz Polter in Support of Bavaria Fiction's Opposition to Sonar's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Declaration of Randolph M. Paul, Esq., in Support of Bavaria Fiction's Opposition to Sonar's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16)(Deixler, Bert)
June 19, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: SEALED NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS UNDER FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(B)(6); MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES re Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal #39 #40 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (shb)
June 18, 2019 Filing 42 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff and Counter-defendant Bavaria Fiction GmbH, re SEALED NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS UNDER FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(B)(6); MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES re Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal #39 #40 , Sealed Document, #41 served on June 18, 2019. (Deixler, Bert)
June 18, 2019 Filing 41 SEALED DOCUMENT Unredacted Document Exhibit 1 re Request for Judicial Notice, #32 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal #39 filed by Counter Defendant Bavaria Fiction GmbH, Plaintiff Bavaria Fiction GmbH. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Exhibit 2)(Deixler, Bert)
June 18, 2019 Filing 40 SEALED NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS UNDER FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(B)(6); MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES re Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal #39 filed by Counter Defendant Bavaria Fiction GmbH, Plaintiff Bavaria Fiction GmbH. Motion set for hearing on 8/6/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Consuelo B. Marshall.(Deixler, Bert)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: GRANTING #33 BAVARIA FICTION, GMBHS UNOPPOSED APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL. (shb)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION STRIKING SONAR ENTERTAINMENT DISTRIBUTION, LLCS REQUEST FOR STATUTORY DAMAGES AND ATTORNEYS FEES #36 by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. The Stipulation Striking Sonars Request for Statutory Damages and Attorneys Fees is GRANTED. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Sonars request for attorneys fees and statutory damages is stricken from its Answer and Counterclaims. (Dkt. No. 18, at 21, 34, 4142.). (shb)
June 12, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Preserving the Status Quo . Motion filed by Defendant/Counter-Complainant Sonar Entertainment Distribution, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 8/6/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of John Grimball (with Exhibits 1-38), #3 Declaration of Sarah Castellvi (with Exhibits 39-41), #4 Declaration of David Ellender, #5 Declaration of Thomas Lesinski) (Chieffo, Vincent)
June 12, 2019 Filing 36 STIPULATION to Strike filed by Plaintiff and Counter-Defendant Bavaria Fiction GmbH. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation Striking Sonar Entertainment Distribution, LLC's Request for Statutory Damages and Attorney's Fees)(Deixler, Bert)
June 12, 2019 Filing 35 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff and Counter-defendant Bavaria Fiction GmbH, re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration, #34 served on June 12, 2019. (Deixler, Bert)
June 12, 2019 Filing 34 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss and Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Exhibits 1 and 2 under seal #33 filed by Counter Defendant Bavaria Fiction GmbH, Plaintiff Bavaria Fiction GmbH. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss; Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Unredacted Document Exhibit 1, #3 Unredacted Document Exhibit 2)(Deixler, Bert)
June 12, 2019 Filing 33 APPLICATION to file document Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss and Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Exhibits 1 and 2 under seal filed by Counter Defendant Bavaria Fiction GmbH, Plaintiff Bavaria Fiction GmbH. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Document Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss; Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Redacted Document Exhibit 1, #3 Redacted Document Exhibit 2, #4 Proposed Order)(Deixler, Bert)
June 12, 2019 Filing 32 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Sonar Entertainment Distribution, LLC's Counterclaims [REDACTED] #31 filed by Counter Defendant Bavaria Fiction GmbH, Plaintiff Bavaria Fiction GmbH. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Patrick J. Somers, #2 Redacted Document Exhibit 1, #3 Redacted Document Exhibit 2, #4 Proposed Order)(Deixler, Bert)
June 12, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Sonar Entertainment Distribution, LLC's Counterclaims [REDACTED] filed by Plaintiff and Counter-defendant Bavaria Fiction GmbH. Motion set for hearing on 8/6/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Deixler, Bert)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MINUTES IN CHAMBERS-ORDER AND NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: The Court is in receipt of Defendant's Ex pane application to continue the hearing on plaintiffs motion for preliminary injunction and for a briefing schedule on the parties' respective motions for preliminary injunction, filed on May 24, 2019 #27 . The Court having read and considered said application, hereby DENIES this ex pane application as moot in light of the court's order granting the Stipulation to continue #29 . (shb)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE THE HEARING ON BAVARIA FICTION GmbHS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND FOR A BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON THE PARTIES RESPECTIVE MOTIONS [28 by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. The COURT, hereby orders that the following schedule shall apply: June 12, 2019, filing deadline for:a. Sonar to file its cross-motion for preliminary injunction; and, b. Bavaria to respond to Sonars counterclaims. July 2, 2019 filing deadline for: a. Sonars opposition to Bavarias motion for preliminary injunction; b. Sonars opposition to Bavarias responsive pleading motion(s), in the event such motion(s) has been filed; and, c. Bavarias opposition to Sonars cross-motion for preliminary injunction; July 16, 2019 filing deadline for: a. Sonars reply in support of its own cross-motion for preliminary injunction; b. Bavarias reply in support of its own motion for preliminary injunction; and, c. Bavarias reply in support of its anticipated responsive pleading motion(s); and, AUGUST 6, 2019 at 10:00 am: hearing on Bavarias motion for preliminary injunction, Sonars anticipated cross-motion for preliminary injunction, and Bavarias anticipated responsive pleading motion(s) to Sonars counterclaims. (shb)
May 28, 2019 Filing 28 STIPULATION to Continue Hearing from June 18, 2019 to July 30, 2019 Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Copyright Infringement . Motion #14 filed by Defendant/Counter-Complainant Sonar Entertainment Distribution, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Chieffo, Vincent)
May 24, 2019 Filing 27 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Hearing from June 18, 2019 to July 9, 2019 Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Copyright Infringement . Motion #14 filed by Defendant/Counter-Complainant Sonar Entertainment Distribution, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Vincent H. Chieffo, #2 Proposed Order) (Chieffo, Vincent)
May 24, 2019 Filing 26 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Nina D Boyajian counsel for Counter Claimant Sonar Entertainment Distribution, LLC, Defendant Sonar Entertainment Distribution, LLC. Adding Nina D. Boyajian as counsel of record for Sonar Entertainment Distribution, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant/Counter-Complainant Sonar Entertainment Distribution, LLC. (Attorney Nina D Boyajian added to party Sonar Entertainment Distribution, LLC(pty:cc), Attorney Nina D Boyajian added to party Sonar Entertainment Distribution, LLC(pty:dft))(Boyajian, Nina)
May 22, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Bavaria Fiction GmbH. correcting Declaration (Motion related), #19 Attachment # 3, Exhibit 15 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 15)(Deixler, Bert)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. Scheduling Conference set for 10/8/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. (ys)
May 21, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Motion Related Document, #21 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Civil Events - select - Other Filings - select - Notices - select - Notice of Lodging and attach the Proposed Order. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (shb)
May 20, 2019 Filing 22 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Bavaria Fiction GmbH, re Motion Related Document, #21 , Declaration (Motion related), #20 , Declaration (Motion related),, #17 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Copyright Infringement . Motion #14 , Declaration (Motion related), #19 served on May 20, 2019. (Deixler, Bert)
May 20, 2019 Filing 21 [Proposed] Order Granting Plaintiff Bavaria Fiction's Motion for Preliminary Injunction re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Copyright Infringement . Motion #14 filed by Plaintiff Bavaria Fiction GmbH. (Deixler, Bert)
May 20, 2019 Filing 20 DECLARATION of Patrick J. Somers in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Copyright Infringement . Motion #14 filed by Plaintiff Bavaria Fiction GmbH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 17, #2 Exhibit 18, #3 Exhibit 19, #4 Exhibit 20)(Deixler, Bert)
May 20, 2019 Filing 19 DECLARATION of Randolph M. Paul in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Copyright Infringement . Motion #14 filed by Plaintiff Bavaria Fiction GmbH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 13, #2 Exhibit 14, #3 Exhibit 15, #4 Exhibit 16)(Deixler, Bert)
May 20, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #4 with JURY DEMAND, COUNTERCLAIM against Bavaria Fiction GmbH filed by Defendant Sonar Entertainment Distribution, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-3)(Chieffo, Vincent)
May 20, 2019 Filing 17 DECLARATION of Moritz Polter in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Copyright Infringement . Motion #14 filed by Plaintiff Bavaria Fiction GmbH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1A, #2 Exhibit 1B, #3 Exhibit 2A, #4 Exhibit 2B, #5 Exhibit 3A, #6 Exhibit 3B, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5A, #9 Exhibit 5B, #10 Exhibit 6, #11 Exhibit 7, #12 Exhibit 8, #13 Exhibit 9, #14 Exhibit 10, #15 Exhibit 11, #16 Exhibit 12)(Deixler, Bert)
May 20, 2019 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT and Civil L.R. 7.1-1 Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Sonar Entertainment Distribution, LLC identifying Sonar Entertainment Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Chieffo, Vincent)
May 20, 2019 Filing 15 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Vincent Henry Chieffo counsel for Defendant Sonar Entertainment Distribution, LLC. Adding Vincent H. Chieffo as counsel of record for Sonar Entertainment Distribution, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Sonar Entertainment Distribution, LLC. (Attorney Vincent Henry Chieffo added to party Sonar Entertainment Distribution, LLC(pty:dft))(Chieffo, Vincent)
May 20, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Copyright Infringement . Motion filed by Plaintiff Bavaria Fiction GmbH. Motion set for hearing on 6/18/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. (Deixler, Bert)
May 20, 2019 Filing 13 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Bert H Deixler counsel for Plaintiff Bavaria Fiction GmbH. Adding Amanda D. Barrow as counsel of record for Bavaria Fiction GmbH for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Bavaria Fiction GmbH. (Deixler, Bert)
May 20, 2019 Filing 12 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Bert H Deixler counsel for Plaintiff Bavaria Fiction GmbH. Adding Patrick J. Somers as counsel of record for Bavaria Fiction GmbH for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Bavaria Fiction GmbH. (Deixler, Bert)
May 20, 2019 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Bert H Deixler counsel for Plaintiff Bavaria Fiction GmbH. Adding Bert H. Deixler as counsel of record for Bavaria Fiction GmbH for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Bavaria Fiction GmbH. (Deixler, Bert)
April 23, 2019 Filing 10 SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Bavaria Fiction GmbH, upon Defendant All Defendants. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Deixler, Bert)
April 23, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Bavaria Fiction GmbH. upon All Defendants. Waiver of Service signed by Vincent H. Chieffo. (Deixler, Bert)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. It controls this case and may differ in some respects from the Local Rules. (ys)
April 15, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #4 as to Defendant Sonar Entertainment Distribution, LLC. (ghap)
April 15, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (ghap)
April 12, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #4 filed by Plaintiff Bavaria Fiction GmbH. (Deixler, Bert)
April 12, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23546793 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Bavaria Fiction GmbH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7) (Attorney Bert H Deixler added to party Bavaria Fiction GmbH(pty:pla))(Deixler, Bert)
April 12, 2019 Filing 3 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Bavaria Fiction GmbH. (Deixler, Bert)
April 12, 2019 Filing 2 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Bavaria Fiction GmbH, (Attorney Bert H Deixler added to party Bavaria Fiction GmbH(pty:pla))(Deixler, Bert)
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Bavaria Fiction GmbH. (Deixler, Bert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bavaria Fiction GmbH v. Sonar Entertainment Distribution, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonar Entertainment Distribution, LLC
Represented By: Nina D Boyajian
Represented By: Vincent Henry Chieffo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bavaria Fiction GmbH
Represented By: Bert H Deixler
Represented By: Patrick J Somers
Represented By: Amanda Dane Barrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?