Anthony M. Blue v. Warren L. Montgomery

Petitioner: Anthony M. Blue
Respondent: Warren L. Montgomery
Case Number: 2:2019cv02888
Filed: April 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andre Birotte
Referring Judge: Suzanne H Segal
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DISMISSING PETITION WITH LEAVE TO AMEND by Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. The Petition is dismissed with leave to amend. If Petitioner wishes to pursue this action, he must file a First Amended Petition stating all his claims for relief within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order. A copy of the Central District's standard form for habeas petitions is attached for Petitioner's use. If Petitioner no longer wishes to pursue this action, he may use the attached form Notice of Dismissal and voluntarily dismiss this action without prejudice. (See document for further details). (Attachments: #1 State Habeas Form, #2 Notice of Dismissal Form) (mr)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal, ORDERING Exhibits submitted by Petitioner Anthony M. Blue received on 5/17/2019 is not to be filed but instead rejected. Denial based on: Not clear what Petitioner is attempting to file. (et)
May 17, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST Tolling of Time for Case #MA066161 A Pending State Court Habeas Corpus Petition filed by Petitioner Anthony M. Blue. (hr)
May 17, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Petitioner Anthony M. Blue. (hr)
April 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and referred to Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (Attachments: #1 CV 111) (esa)
April 15, 2019 Filing 2 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by petitioner Anthony M. Blue. (esa)
April 15, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In State Custody (28:2254) Case assigned to Judge Andre Birotte Jr and referred to Magistrate Judge Susan H. Segal,(Filing fee $ 5 due), filed by petitioner Anthony M. Blue. (esa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anthony M. Blue v. Warren L. Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warren L. Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Anthony M. Blue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?