Daniel Goldberg Lerner v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services et al

Plaintiff: Daniel Goldberg Lerner
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Acting Secretary Kevin K. McAleenan, Director Lee Francis Cissna, Lee Francis Cissna and Kevin K. McAleenan
Case Number: 2:2019cv02894
Filed: April 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Rozella A Oliver
Referring Judge: Otis D Wright
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 08:1329
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by defendant United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Park, Grace)
May 10, 2019 Filing 17 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Daniel Goldberg Lerner, upon Defendant Lee Francis Cissna served on 5/2/2019, answer due 7/1/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Civil Process Clerk. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to William P. Barr, U.S. Attorney General. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Lee Francis Cissna, Director, USCIS. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: #1 USAO - Certified Mail Receipt, #2 USAG - Certified Mail Receipt, #3 Cissna - Certified Mail Receipt)(Lawler, Martin)
May 10, 2019 Filing 16 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Daniel Goldberg Lerner, upon Defendant Kevin K. McAleenan served on 5/2/2019, answer due 7/1/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Civil Process Clerk. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to William P. Barr, U.S. Attorney General. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Kevin K. McAleenan, Acting Secretary, DHS. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: #1 Kevin McAleenan - Certified Mail Receipt, #2 USAO - Certified Mail Receipt, #3 USAG - Certified Mail Receipt)(Lawler, Martin)
May 10, 2019 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Daniel Goldberg Lerner, upon Defendant United States Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 5/2/2019, answer due 7/1/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Civil Process Clerk. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to William P. Barr, U.S. Attorney General. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: #1 USAO - Certified Mail Receipt, #2 USAG - Certified Mail Receipt, #3 USCIS - Certified Mail Receipt)(Lawler, Martin)
April 25, 2019 Filing 14 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to defendant Kevin K. McAleenan. (lc)
April 25, 2019 Filing 13 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to defendant Lee Francis Cissna. (lc)
April 25, 2019 Filing 12 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to defendant United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (lc)
April 24, 2019 Filing 11 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons,,,, #10 filed by Plaintiff Daniel Goldberg Lerner. (Attachments: #1 Summons_McAleenan, #2 Summons_Cissna)(Lawler, Martin)
April 17, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #6 , Summons Request #7 , Summons Request #8 , Summons Request #9 . The following error(s) was found: The case number and/or judge(s)initials are incorrect. The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. Summons is not directed to the defendant(s). The defendants name must appear in the To:section of the summons. 1) Complete case number to include official Judge and Magistrates initials and to read as: 2:19-cv-02894-ODW-RAO. :2) No et als in caption. Parties have to be named exactly to the complaint caption; 3) Re TO: area defendants to be named ( re. No 6, William Barr and.7 civil process clerk are Not named defendants but part of service address. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (lc)
April 17, 2019 Filing 9 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Daniel Goldberg Lerner. (Lawler, Martin)
April 17, 2019 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Daniel Goldberg Lerner. (Lawler, Martin)
April 17, 2019 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Daniel Goldberg Lerner. (Lawler, Martin)
April 17, 2019 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Daniel Goldberg Lerner. (Lawler, Martin)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. Counsel are STRONGLY encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR SPECIFIC FILING REQUIREMENTS AND INFORMATION; PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. all proposed sealed documents must be submitted via e-mail to the Judges Chambers email address, EXCLUDING those submitted by pro se parties and IN CAMERA filings, which shall continue to comply with Local Rule 79-5.1. Please refer to the Judges procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents. (lc)
April 16, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (ghap)
April 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Daniel Goldberg Lerner, (Lawler, Martin)
April 15, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Daniel Goldberg Lerner. (Lawler, Martin)
April 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23552000 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Daniel Goldberg Lerner. (Attorney Martin J Lawler added to party Daniel Goldberg Lerner(pty:pla))(Lawler, Martin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Daniel Goldberg Lerner v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Secretary Kevin K. McAleenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Lee Francis Cissna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Francis Cissna
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin K. McAleenan
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Goldberg Lerner
Represented By: Martin J Lawler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?