Joceyln Babauta Topete v. Sodexo, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Joceyln Babauta Topete
Defendant: Sodexo, Inc., Does 1 - 50, Inclusive and Does 1-50, Inclusive
Case Number: 2:2019cv02896
Filed: April 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
Referring Judge: Otis D Wright
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER OF DISMISSAL #17 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: Per Joint Stipulation, the Court hereby dismisses with prejudice Plaintiffs individual claims in the above-entitled action, and dismisses without prejudice the class claims in the above-entitled action. Each party shall bear its own costs and attorneys fees. The Court VACATES all dates and deadlines. The Clerk of the Court shall close the case. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lc)
June 21, 2019 Filing 17 STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1) filed by defendant Sodexo, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Deldar, Zina)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER EXTENDING DEFENDANT SODEXO, INC.S TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT FROM MAY 22, 2019 TO JUNE 21, 2019 #15 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II (lc)
May 16, 2019 Filing 15 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Sodexo, Inc. answer now due 6/21/2019, filed by Defendant Sodexo, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Deldar, Zina)
April 24, 2019 Filing 14 DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by defendant Sodexo, Inc... (Deldar, Zina)
April 19, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Sodexo, Inc. answer now due 5/22/2019, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by defendant Sodexo, Inc..(Deldar, Zina)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. Counsel are STRONGLY encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR SPECIFIC FILING REQUIREMENTS AND INFORMATION; PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. all proposed sealed documents must be submitted via e-mail to the Judges Chambers email address, EXCLUDING those submitted by pro se parties and IN CAMERA filings, which shall continue to comply with Local Rule 79-5.1. Please refer to the Judges procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents. (lc)
April 17, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
April 17, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (car)
April 16, 2019 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant Sodexo, Inc., re Declaration #6 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #8 , Declaration #5 , Declaration #3 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #7 , Declaration #4 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 served on April 15, 2019. (Wohl, Jeffrey)
April 15, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1-50, Inclusive, Sodexo, Inc. Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiff Joceyln Babauta Topete. Filed in State Court on 3/6/2019. Submitted with attachment 1 to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
April 15, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by defendant Sodexo, Inc., (Wohl, Jeffrey)
April 15, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Sodexo, Inc. identifying Sodexo, S.A. as Corporate Parent. (Wohl, Jeffrey)
April 15, 2019 Filing 6 DECLARATION of Dr. Paul F. White, Ph.D. re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Sodexo, Inc.. (Wohl, Jeffrey)
April 15, 2019 Filing 5 DECLARATION of Jeffrey D. Wohl re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Sodexo, Inc.. (Wohl, Jeffrey)
April 15, 2019 Filing 4 DECLARATION of Kevin Gentry re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Sodexo, Inc.. (Wohl, Jeffrey)
April 15, 2019 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Kelly Barbary re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Sodexo, Inc.. (Wohl, Jeffrey)
April 15, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Sodexo, Inc.. (Wohl, Jeffrey)
April 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 19STCV07843 Receipt No: 0973-23552020 - Fee: $400, filed by defendant Sodexo, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Other Documents Received from Plaintiff in Addition to Complaint) (Attorney Jeffrey D Wohl added to party Sodexo, Inc.(pty:dft))(Wohl, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joceyln Babauta Topete v. Sodexo, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joceyln Babauta Topete
Represented By: Danny Yadidsion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sodexo, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey D Wohl
Represented By: Zina Deldar
Represented By: Paul Andrew Holton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 - 50, Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-50, Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?