Centennial Bank v. David Effress et al

Plaintiff: CENTENNIAL BANK, an Arkandas state bank and Centennial Bank
Defendant: DAVID SCOTT EFFRESS, AURA, Hull No. BEYKK006E011, its engines, machinery, appurtenances, etc (the "Vessel") In Rem, David S Effress and AURA, Hull No. BEYKK006E011
Case Number: 2:2019cv02923
Filed: April 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Rozella A Oliver
Referring Judge: Otis D Wright
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:1701
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by defendant David Effress (lc)
May 22, 2019 Filing 14 SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Centennial Bank, upon Defendant AURA, Hull No. BEYKK006E011 served on 5/2/2019, answer due 5/23/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Andonian, Paul)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER APPOINTING SUBSTITUTE CUSTODIAN AND AUTHORIZING MOVEMENT AND INPSECTION OF DEFENDANT #10 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: US Marshal authorized to seize vessel and surrender possession to Appointed Custodian Nielsen Beaumont Marine, Inc. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR OTHER SPECIFIC AND INSTRUCTIONS). (lc)
May 15, 2019 Filing 12 WARRANT OF ARREST IN REM OF VESSEL RE AURA, Hull No.BEYKK006E011 and its Appurtenances etc(lc)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER AUTHORIZING ISSUANCE OF WARRANT FOR ARREST #9 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II (lc)
April 23, 2019 Filing 10 APPLICATION to Appoint Custodian With 2 Attachments filed by Plaintiff Centennial Bank. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Don Beaumont, #2 Proposed Order Order Appointing Substitute Custodian and Authorizing Movement and Inspection of Defendant Vessel) (Andonian, Paul)
April 23, 2019 Filing 9 APPLICATION for Review of In Accordance with Supplemental Rule C with 2 Attachments filed by Plaintiff Centennial Bank. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order Authorizing Issuance of Warrant for Arrest, #2 Proposed Warrant Warrant for Arrest of Vessel and Appurtenances) (Andonian, Paul)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. Counsel are STRONGLY encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR SPECIFIC FILING REQUIREMENTS AND INFORMATION; PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. all proposed sealed documents must be submitted via e-mail to the Judges Chambers email address, EXCLUDING those submitted by pro se parties and IN CAMERA filings, which shall continue to comply with Local Rule 79-5.1. Please refer to the Judges procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents. (lc)
April 17, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAYS Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants AURA, Hull No. BEYKK006E011, David S. Effress. (et)
April 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
April 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (et)
April 16, 2019 Filing 4 and Notice of Interested Parties CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff CENTENNIAL BANK, an Arkandas state bank, identifying None. (Andonian, Paul)
April 16, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff CENTENNIAL BANK, an Arkandas state bank. (Andonian, Paul)
April 16, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff CENTENNIAL BANK, an Arkandas state bank. (Andonian, Paul)
April 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23556515 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff CENTENNIAL BANK, an Arkandas state bank CENTENNIAL BANK, an Arkandas state bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1 - 5) (Attorney Paul N Andonian added to party CENTENNIAL BANK, an Arkandas state bank(pty:pla))(Andonian, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Centennial Bank v. David Effress et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CENTENNIAL BANK, an Arkandas state bank
Represented By: Paul N Andonian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Centennial Bank
Represented By: Paul N Andonian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID SCOTT EFFRESS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AURA, Hull No. BEYKK006E011, its engines, machinery, appurtenances, etc (the "Vessel") In Rem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David S Effress
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AURA, Hull No. BEYKK006E011
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?