Wun-Ling Chang, M.D., Inc. v. Blue Cross of California, et al

Plaintiff: Wun-Ling Chang, M.D., Inc.
Defendant: Does 1 through 20, inclusive, Blue Cross of California and Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv02930
Filed: April 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Referring Judge: Virginia A Phillips
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2019 Filing 16 Receipt of acknowledgment letter from Los Angeles County Superior Court, Los Angeles, CA 90012. Case No. 19STC02777. (bm)
April 25, 2019 Filing 15 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles County Superior Corut. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles County Superior Corut, Los Angeles, CA 90012. (bm)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REMANDING CASE by Judge Virginia A. Phillips, re Stipulation to Remand Case to State Court #13 : The Court, having reviewed the Parties' Stipulation to Remand, and good cause appearing, HEREBY ORDERS that this case be remanded forthwith to the Superior Court for the County of Los Angeles. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (bm)
April 22, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION to Remand Case to State Court filed by Plaintiff Wun-Ling Chang, M.D., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Remanding Case)(Rose, Howard)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STANDING ORDER by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (bh)
April 17, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Blue Cross of California, re Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #7 served on April 17, 2019. (Watson, Benjamin)
April 17, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Wun-Ling Chang, M.D., Inc., (Rose, Howard)
April 17, 2019 Filing 9 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Blue Cross of California amending Complaint - (Discovery), JURY DEMAND, filed by Plaintiff Wun-Ling Chang, M.D., Inc.(Rose, Howard)
April 16, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
April 16, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (esa)
April 16, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Wun-Ling Chang, M.D., Inc., upon Defendant Blue Cross of California acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 2/13/2019. (Filed in state court 3/6/19, submitted as document 1, attachment 1, p. 44) (esa)
April 16, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Blue Cross of California, Does 1 through 20, inclusive, filed by plaintiff Wun-Ling Chang, M.D., Inc. (Filed in state court 1/31/19, submitted as document 1, attachment 1) (esa)
April 16, 2019 Filing 6 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, BLUE CROSS OF CALIFORNIA dba ANTHEM BLUE CROSS, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Declaration, #4 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #5 , Declaration, #3 served on April 16, 2019. (Watson, Benjamin)
April 16, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, BLUE CROSS OF CALIFORNIA dba ANTHEM BLUE CROSS, identifying Anthem, Inc.. (Watson, Benjamin)
April 16, 2019 Filing 4 DECLARATION of Christopher H. Loftin re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Defendants Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, BLUE CROSS OF CALIFORNIA dba ANTHEM BLUE CROSS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-6, #2 Exhibits 7-11)(Watson, Benjamin)
April 16, 2019 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Michelle L. Cheng re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Defendants Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, BLUE CROSS OF CALIFORNIA dba ANTHEM BLUE CROSS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Watson, Benjamin)
April 16, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, BLUE CROSS OF CALIFORNIA dba ANTHEM BLUE CROSS. (Watson, Benjamin)
April 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 19STCV02777 Receipt No: 0973-23558730 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, BLUE CROSS OF CALIFORNIA dba ANTHEM BLUE CROSS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Superior Court Documents) (Attorney Benjamin Charles Watson added to party Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Benjamin Charles Watson added to party BLUE CROSS OF CALIFORNIA dba ANTHEM BLUE CROSS(pty:dft))(Watson, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wun-Ling Chang, M.D., Inc. v. Blue Cross of California, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wun-Ling Chang, M.D., Inc.
Represented By: Howard Loring Rose
Represented By: Don A Ernst
Represented By: Christopher D Edgington
Represented By: Adrian J Barrio
Represented By: M Taylor Ernst
Represented By: Robert S Gianelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 20, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross of California
Represented By: Kenneth N Smersfelt
Represented By: Amir Shlesinger
Represented By: Benjamin Charles Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company
Represented By: Kenneth N Smersfelt
Represented By: Amir Shlesinger
Represented By: Benjamin Charles Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?