Hector Miramontes Jr. v. Nancy Ann Berryhill

Plaintiff: Hector Miramontes, Jr
Defendant: Nancy Ann Berryhill
Case Number: 2:2019cv02932
Filed: April 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Paul L Abrams
Referring Judge: Josephine L Staton
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams for all further proceedings. Please use the case number CV19-2932 PLA on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn)
June 5, 2019 Filing 14 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Nancy Ann Berryhill. (Attorney Lara A Bradt added to party Nancy Ann Berryhill(pty:dft))(Bradt, Lara)
June 4, 2019 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Hector Miramontes, Jr, upon Defendant Nancy Ann Berryhill served on 5/24/2019, answer due 9/23/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to G Ortega. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Emily Sase. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to illegible. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Monge, Troy)
May 20, 2019 Filing 12 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Social Security), #1 as to defendant Nancy Ann Berryhill. (ch)
May 20, 2019 Filing 11 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #2 , Complaint - (Social Security), #1 filed by Plaintiff Hector Miramontes, Jr. (Monge, Troy)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (ch)
May 3, 2019 FILING FEE PAID for new civil case. Receipt No. 0973-23676154 for $400 filing fee. (Monge, Troy)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CONSENT ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY by Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams Granting Troy D. Monge in place and stead of Hector Miramontes, Jr. (sbou)
May 2, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #6 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Request for Substitution of Counsel G01. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
April 30, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Plaintiff Hector Miramontes, Jr. (Monge, Troy)
April 30, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Troy Dana Monge counsel for Plaintiff Hector Miramontes, Jr. Adding Troy D. Monge as counsel of record for Hector Miramontes, Jr. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff Hector Miramontes, Jr.. (Attorney Troy Dana Monge added to party Hector Miramontes, Jr(pty:pla))(Monge, Troy)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton denying #3 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff SHALL PAY THE FILING FEES IN FULL within 30 days or this case will be dismissed. (jp)
April 17, 2019 RECOMMENDATION issued by Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. Re REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support #3 . Proposed Order forwarded to the District Judge for approval.(ch)
April 16, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and referred to Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (et)
April 16, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Hector Miramontes, Jr. (et)
April 16, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Hector Miramontes, Jr. (et)
April 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR REVIEW OF SOCIAL SECURITY DISABILITY OF SUPPLEMENTAL SECURITY INCOME DECISION filed against DefendantNancy Ann Berryhill Case assigned to Judge Josephine L. Staton and referred to Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams., filed by Plaintiff Hector Miramontes, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons for Defendant Nancy Ann Berryhill) (et)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hector Miramontes Jr. v. Nancy Ann Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Ann Berryhill
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Lara A Bradt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hector Miramontes, Jr
Represented By: Troy Dana Monge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?