Construction Laborers Trust Funds for Southern California Administrative Company v. Civic Construction Associates et al

Plaintiff: CONSTRUCTION LABORERS TRUST FUNDS FOR SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA ADMINISTRATIVE COMPANY, a Delaware limited liability company and Construction Laborers Trust Funds for Southern California Administrative Company
Defendant: THE WESTERN SURETY COMPANY, a South Dakota corporation, CIVIC CONSTRUCTION ASSOCIATES, a California corporation, The Western Surety Company and Civic Construction Associates
Case Number: 2:2019cv02935
Filed: April 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Maria A Audero
Referring Judge: Philip S Gutierrez
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to The Western Surety Company answer now due 6/23/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff Construction Laborers Trust Funds for Southern California Administrative Company.(Hutchinson, Peter)
May 31, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiff Construction Laborers Trust Funds for Southern California Administrative Company. upon Civic Construction Associates waiver sent by Plaintiff on 5/17/2019, answer due 7/16/2019. Waiver of Service signed by Julian Michael Contreras as agent of Civic Construction. (Hutchinson, Peter)
May 30, 2019 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Construction Laborers Trust Funds for Southern California Administrative Company, upon Defendant The Western Surety Company served on 5/3/2019, answer due 5/24/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Albert Damonte - Agent for Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Hutchinson, Peter)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji)
April 17, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants Civic Construction Associates, The Western Surety Company. (car)
April 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
April 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (car)
April 16, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff CONSTRUCTION LABORERS TRUST FUNDS FOR SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA ADMINISTRATIVE COMPANY, a Delaware limited liability company, (Hutchinson, Peter)
April 16, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff CONSTRUCTION LABORERS TRUST FUNDS FOR SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA ADMINISTRATIVE COMPANY, a Delaware limited liability company. (Hutchinson, Peter)
April 16, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff CONSTRUCTION LABORERS TRUST FUNDS FOR SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA ADMINISTRATIVE COMPANY, a Delaware limited liability company. (Hutchinson, Peter)
April 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23559912 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff CONSTRUCTION LABORERS TRUST FUNDS FOR SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA ADMINISTRATIVE COMPANY, a Delaware limited liability company. (Attorney Peter A Hutchinson added to party CONSTRUCTION LABORERS TRUST FUNDS FOR SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA ADMINISTRATIVE COMPANY, a Delaware limited liability company(pty:pla))(Hutchinson, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Construction Laborers Trust Funds for Southern California Administrative Company v. Civic Construction Associates et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CONSTRUCTION LABORERS TRUST FUNDS FOR SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA ADMINISTRATIVE COMPANY, a Delaware limited liability company
Represented By: Peter A Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Construction Laborers Trust Funds for Southern California Administrative Company
Represented By: Marsha Michiko Hamasaki
Represented By: Ara Karamian
Represented By: Alexander Bernard Cvitan
Represented By: Peter A Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE WESTERN SURETY COMPANY, a South Dakota corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CIVIC CONSTRUCTION ASSOCIATES, a California corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Western Surety Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Civic Construction Associates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?