Justine Tanjaya v. The Regents of The University of California et al
Plaintiff: Justine Tanjaya
Defendant: The Regents of The University of California, Does 1 through 25 , inclusive, Soltirios Tetradis and Regents of The University of California
Case Number: 2:2019cv02956
Filed: April 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Frederick F Mumm
Referring Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2019 Filing 44 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS): by Judge George H. Wu: The STIPULATED CONTINUANCE TO HEARING DATE #43 , filed on November 12, 2019 is DENIED. Counsel are ordered to appear on DEFENDANT THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIAS MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT #35 set for November 14, 2019 at 8:30 a.m. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 12, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE OF ERRATA RE STIPULATED CONTINUANCE TO HEARING DATE (ECF NO. 41) filed by Defendants Regents of The University of California, Soltirios Tetradis. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Vance, Usha)
November 7, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Defendant Soltirios Tetradis. Motion set for hearing on 12/12/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Vance, Usha)
November 4, 2019 Filing 41 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Soltirios Tetradis answer now due 11/12/2019; Regents of The University of California answer now due 11/27/2019, filed by Defendant Soltirios Tetradis; Regents of The University of California.(Attorney Usha Chilukuri Vance added to party Soltirios Tetradis(pty:dft))(Vance, Usha)
October 31, 2019 Filing 40 REPLY In support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT #35 filed by Defendant Regents of The University of California. (Attachments: #1 Reply In Support of Request for Judicial Notice)(Vance, Usha)
October 24, 2019 Filing 39 Opposition Response in opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT #35 Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Justine Tanjaya. (Attachments: #1 Evidentiary Objections to Defendant)(Gillam, Carol)
October 11, 2019 Filing 38 21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint/Petition #29 as to Defendant Soltirios Tetradis, DDS, Ph.D. (yl)
October 11, 2019 Filing 37 Notice of Withdrawal of Stipulation for Order #33 filed by Defendants Regents of The University of California. (Vance, Usha)
October 11, 2019 Filing 36 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition #29 with JURY DEMAND (SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT) filed by Defendants Regents of The University of California.(Vance, Usha)
October 11, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Defendants Regents of The University of California. Motion set for hearing on 11/14/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Kang, #2 Exhibit Kang Ex. A, #3 Declaration Vance, #4 Exhibit Vance Ex. A, #5 Request for Judicial Notice, #6 Proposed Order) (Vance, Usha)
October 10, 2019 Filing 34 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition #29 filed by Plaintiff Justine Tanjaya. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Proof of Service)(Gillam, Carol)
October 8, 2019 Filing 33 STIPULATION for Order Establishing Briefing Schedule filed by Defendant Regents of The University of California. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Usha C. Vance, #2 Proposed Order)(Vance, Usha)
October 8, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 9/5/19 re Transcript #31 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Kielwasser, Anne) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 8, 2019 Filing 31 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 9/5/19 - 9:04 a.m.. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Anne Kielwasser, phone number TO ORDER - FORM G120. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 10/29/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/8/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/6/2020. (Kielwasser, Anne)
October 7, 2019 Filing 30 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant Regents of The University of California for Court Reporter. Court will contact Usha Vance at usha.vance@mto.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Vance, Usha)
September 27, 2019 Filing 29 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint - (Discovery), Amended Complaint/Petition #16 , filed by Plaintiff Justine Tanjaya(Gillam, Carol)
September 5, 2019 Filing 28 MINUTES OF DEFENDANT THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA'S MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #22 Hearing held before Judge George H. Wu. Defendant's Motion is GRANTED without prejudice. Plaintiff will have 21 days from the date of this order to file a Second Amended Complaint. Court Reporter: Anne Kielwasser. (lom)
August 13, 2019 Filing 27 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS: by Judge George H. Wu: The Court, on its own motion, CONTINUES DEFENDANT THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIAS MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #22 previously scheduled for 08/29/19 to 9/5/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 8, 2019 Filing 26 REPLY In Support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint #22 filed by Defendant The Regents of The University of California. (Attachments: #1 Reply In Support of Request for Judicial Notice)(Vance, Usha)
July 25, 2019 Filing 25 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint #22 filed by Plaintiff Justine Tanjaya. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff's Evidentiary Objections, #2 Certificate of Service)(Gillam, Carol)
July 3, 2019 Filing 24 SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibits A, C & E to Smiley Decl ISO re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint #22 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal, #23 filed by Defendant The Regents of The University of California. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C, #2 Exhibit E)(Vance, Usha)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER REGARDING THE REGENTS OF UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA'S APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge George H. Wu: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Defendants Application for Leave to File Under Seal is GRANTED. The following documents should be filed with Plaintiff Justine Tanjayas email address redacted (See order for further details) #20 (yl)
June 27, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant The Regents of The University of California. Motion set for hearing on 8/29/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Smiley Decl, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit D, #4 Exhibit F, #5 Exhibit G, #6 Proposed Order, #7 Judicial Notice) (Vance, Usha)
June 27, 2019 Filing 21 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document (Exhs A, C & E to Smiley Decl) under seal #20 filed by Defendant The Regents of The University of California. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Ex. A to Smiley Decl, #2 Unredacted Document Ex. C to Smiley Decl, #3 Unredacted Document Ex. E to Smiley Decl)(Vance, Usha)
June 27, 2019 Filing 20 APPLICATION to file document (Exhs A, C & E to Smiley Decl) under seal filed by Defendant The Regents of The University of California. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Document, #3 Redacted Document, #4 Redacted Document)(Vance, Usha)
May 30, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Amended Complaint/Petition #16 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lom)
May 28, 2019 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Justine Tanjaya, re Amended Complaint/Petition #16 served on 5/28/19. (Gillam, Carol)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Regarding Stipulation to continue Scheduling Conference #15 by Judge George H. Wu that the parties' deadlien to file a Joint Rule 26(f) report and the Scheduling Conference are VACATED. (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (jp)
May 28, 2019 Filing 16 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by Plaintiff Justine Tanjaya(Gillam, Carol)
May 23, 2019 Filing 15 STIPULATION to Continue Scheduling Conference from June 6, 2019 to After Court has ruled on any Motion to Dismiss by Regents filed by Defendant The Regents of The University of California. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Usha C. Vance, #2 Proposed Order)(Vance, Usha)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REGARDING STIPULATION PERMITTING PLAINTIFF TO AMEND COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 15(a)(2) by Judge George H. Wu, re Stipulation to Amend/Correct #13 . (Amended Pleadings due by 5/28/2019.) The Regents of The University of California answer due 6/27/2019. (Responses due by 7/25/2019, Replies due by 8/8/2019.) (mrgo)
May 15, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION to Amend Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant The Regents of The University of California. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Vance, Usha)
April 25, 2019 Filing 12 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Usha Chilukuri Vance counsel for Defendant The Regents of The University of California. Margaret L. Wu is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant The Regents of the University of California. (Vance, Usha)
April 25, 2019 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Usha Chilukuri Vance counsel for Defendant The Regents of The University of California. Charles F. Robinson is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant The Regents of the University of California. (Vance, Usha)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge George H. Wu. (Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/23/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 6/6/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu.) (mrgo)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Standing Order Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trials Before Judge George H. Wu by Judge George H. Wu. (See document for details) (mrgo)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REGARDING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT BY NOT MORE THAN 30 DAYS (L.R. 8-3) by Judge George H. Wu re Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) #7 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the time for Defendant The Regents of the University of California to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint shall be, and hereby is, extended to May 15, 2019. (mrgo)
April 22, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to The Regents of The University of California answer now due 5/15/2019, filed by Defendant The Regents of The University of California. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Vance, Usha)
April 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing of Notice of Removal of Civil Action in State Court filed by Defendant The Regents of The University of California. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Vance, Usha)
April 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
April 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (car)
April 17, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1-25, inclusive, The Regents of The University of California. Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiff Justine Tanjaya. Filed in State Court on 2/25/19 Submitted with attachment 1 to notice of removal #1 (car)
April 17, 2019 Filing 3 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant The Regents of The University of California, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 served on April 17, 2019. (Vance, Usha)
April 17, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant The Regents of The University of California. (Vance, Usha)
April 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the State of California, County of Los Angeles, case number 19STCV06426 Receipt No: 0973-23563991 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant The Regents of The University of California. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Usha Chilukuri Vance added to party The Regents of The University of California(pty:dft))(Vance, Usha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Justine Tanjaya v. The Regents of The University of California et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Regents of The University of California
Represented By: Charles F Robinson
Represented By: Margaret L Wu
Represented By: Usha Chilukuri Vance
Represented By: Hailyn J Chen
Represented By: Jerome Mayer-Cantu
Represented By: Jerome L Mayer-Cantu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 25 , inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Soltirios Tetradis
Represented By: Usha Chilukuri Vance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regents of The University of California
Represented By: Charles F Robinson
Represented By: Margaret L Wu
Represented By: Usha Chilukuri Vance
Represented By: Hailyn J Chen
Represented By: Jerome L Mayer-Cantu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justine Tanjaya
Represented By: Sara Heum
Represented By: Carol L Gillam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?