Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group v. Angeles Chemical Co Inc et al
Defendant: Angeles Chemical Co., Inc., Pacific Die Casting Corporation, Angelus Waterproofing and Restoration, Inc., Resin Technology Corporation, Doe Corporations, Chemed Corporation, Sasol Wax North America Corporation, Veritiv Operating Company, ELG Metals, Inc., The Dial Corporation, Angelus Chemical, ELG Metals West Coast, Inc., Traxx Corporation, Jervis B. Webb Company of California, Mouren Laurens Oil Company, Acme Kustom Fit, Inc., Orlandini Enterprises, Rohm and Haas Company, Metal Management, Inc., Beatrice Companies, Inc., Sasol Wax Americas, Inc., Crown Beverage Packaging, LLC, National Drum Company, Purex Corporation, Vast Enterprises, B. Stephen Cooperage, Inc., Pemaco, Inc., Veritiv Corporation, Angeles Chemical Company, Lux International Corporation, Insilco Corporation, Jervis B. Webb Company, Shirley R. Bruck, Jose Ramirez, Stephen A. Compas, Sasol (USA) Corporation, William W. Bruck, 5211 Southern Avenue, LLC, Maria A. Molina, Best Tape, Inc., Joyce Mendell Brody, Nortek, Inc., Nikki Reagan, AFC Cable Systems, Inc., Ellen Gay Jacobs, Jeffrey M. Palmer, Angeles Chemical Company, Incorporated, General Inspection Laboratories, Air Nail Company, Inc., Reisner Metals, Inc., Shultz Steel Company, International Staple & Machine Company, Timothy J. Owens & Associates, Inc., On Atlantic, LLC, Carerncar, LLC, Genil, Inc., Armstrong Flooring, Inc. and ERCASA, LLC
Petitioner: SASOL CHEMICALS (USA) LLC
Counter Defendant: Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group
3Rd Party Defendant: Mondo Chrome, JET CUSTOM CHROME, All State Welding Alloy, GREGGS HONDA SERVICE, INTERNATIONAL TORQUE aka TORQUES INTERNATIONAL, FANTASTIC PLATING aka FANTASTIC CUSTOM CHROME aka FANTASTIC CUSTOMER CHROME PLATING, Advanced Grinding aka SGT Advanced Grinding Co, MONDO CHROME aka MONDO CUSTOM CHROME aka MONDOS SHOW CHRIME aka MANDOS CUSTOM CHROME, G&N PRODUCT DEVELOPMENT, Technical Trade Institute, Alloy Precision Grinding Co, International Torque, Advanced Grinding, Fantastic Plating, Mandos Custom Chrome, Torques International, G and N Product Development, Mondo Custom Chrome, Fantastic Custom Chrome, SGT Advanced Grinding Co, Fantastic Customer Chrome Plating, Mondos Show Chrime, Carerncar LLC, Reisner Metals Inc, Julie Dykstra, Mistras Group, Inc., Does 1-25, QUALA (f/n/a QUALAWASH HOLDINGS, LLC, a Florida Liability company), VICKSBURG L.P., JACKSON IRON WORKS, INC., PATATA INVESTMENT, LLC, LYNCHBURG L.P., BOWERS-BAM, LLC, CUDAHY ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION, Azalea Joint Venture, LLC, Tsay J & R, LLC, Brenntag Pacific, Inc., M STEPHENS MANUFACTURING, INC., BETTY R. ANGEL, TRUSTEE OF TRUST B UNDER THE ANGEL TRUST dated December 8, 1987, WINSOME ENTERPRISES, INC. (dba QUALITY CARRIERS, a subsidiary of QUALITY DISTRIBUTION, INC.), BOWERS-MM, LLC, PRATT & WHITNEY TOOL, CO., QUALA SYSTEMS, INC., Ameron International Corporation, Armstrong Cork Co, Mistras Group Inc, Quala Systems Inc, Brenntag Pacific Inc, Jackson Iron Works Inc, Lynchburg LP, Armstrong Flooring Inc, M Stephens Manufacturing Inc, Bowers-Bam LLC, Accella Polyurethane Systems LLC, Bowers-MM LLC, Betty R Angel, Vicksburg LP, Patata Investment LLC, Quala, Azalea Joint Venture LLC, Pratt and Whitney Tool Co, Tsay J and R LLC, Winsome Enterprises Inc and Shultz Properties Inc
Cross Defendant: Far Best Corporation, American Polymers Corporation, M.O. Dion and Sons, Inc., Conagra Brands, Inc., Walter Gatfield, Mike Palm Club, LLC, Reliable Steel Building Products, Inc., Louise C. Gatfield, Jorge Molina, Henkel Consumer Goods, Inc., International Fastener Research Corp., Bristol Industries, Inc., Jeannette M. Compas, Zoes, Far-Best Corporation, Angeles Chemical Company Incorporated, Air Nail Company Inc, International Staple and Machine Company, W.R. Grace & Company, Sasol Chemicals USA LLC, Timothy J Owens and Associates Inc, WR Grace and Company, Armstrong World Industries Inc, Genil Inc and On Atlantic LLC
3Rd Party Plaintiff: TW Tedesco Properties, L.P.
Counter Claimant: Viad Corporation and Armstrong World Industries, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv03007
Filed: April 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andre Birotte
Referring Judge: Pedro V Castillo
2 Judge: Frederick F Mumm
3 Judge: Jean P Rosenbluth
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. § 9607 Real Property Tort to Land
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 509 ORDER CLOSING CASE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: On 1/4/2022, Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group filed a Notice of Dismissal, voluntarily dismissing the last remaining Defendant in this case #508 . Moreover, Third Party Plaintiff and Cross Claimant TW Tedesco Properties, L.P. has dismissed all of its outstanding claims. As a result of these dismissals, there remain no outstanding claims in this case. In light of this fact, the Court now closes this case. ( Case Terminated. Made JS-6. ) (gk)
January 4, 2022 Filing 508 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) (A)(i) as to Metal Management, Inc.. (Vineyard, Daniel)
January 3, 2022 Filing 507 In its Notice of Dismissal, (Dkt. No. #506 ), Plaintiff stated that Defendant ACME Kustom Fit, Inc., was the last defendant remaining in the Action. However, Defendant Metal Management, Inc. has yet to be terminated. The Court orders Plaintiff to file a report by close of business, January 10, 2022, indicating whether Defendant Metal Management, Inc. has been terminated, and, if so, at what point in the record. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jgr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 29, 2021 Filing 506 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group((as to Counterclaim Doc No. 140 filed 10/1/2019)) pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) (A)(i) as to Acme Kustom Fit, Inc.. (Vineyard, Daniel)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 505 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANTS HENKEL CONSUMER GOODS, INC. AND VIAD CORP PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41(a)(2) by Judge Andre Birotte Jr, re Stipulation to Dismiss Party #500 . The Court now GRANTS the dismissal as follows: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2), the claims and causes of action by the Group against Defendants in the above-captioned action, including the Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint, are dismissed. Each party shall bear its own costs. (et)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 504 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT ELG METALS, INC. PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41(a)(2) by Judge Andre Birotte Jr, re Stipulation to Dismiss Party #499 . The Court now GRANTS the dismissal as follows: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2), the claims and causes of action by the Group against Defendant in the above-captioned action, including the Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint, are dismissed. Each party shall bear its own costs. (et)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 503 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANTS CARERNCAR, LLC AND ERCASA, LLC PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41(a)(2) by Judge Andre Birotte Jr, re Stipulation to Dismiss Party #498 . Court now GRANTS the dismissal as follows: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2), the claims and causes of action by the Group against Defendants in the above-captioned action, including the Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint, are dismissed. Each party shall bear its own costs. (et)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 502 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANTS BEST TAPE, INC. AND TRAXX CORPORATION PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41(a)(2) by Judge Andre Birotte Jr, re Stipulation to Dismiss Party #497 . The Court now GRANTS the dismissal as follows: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2), the claims and causes of action by the Group against Defendants in the above-captioned action, including the Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint, are dismissed. Each party shall bear its own costs. (et)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 501 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT ARMSTRONG FLOORING, INC. PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41(a)(2) by Judge Andre Birotte Jr, re Stipulation to Dismiss Party #496 . The Court GRANTS the dismissal as follows: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2), the claims and causes of action by the Group against Defendant in the above-captioned action, including the Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint, are dismissed. Each party shall bear its own costs. (et)
November 23, 2021 Filing 500 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendants Henkel Consumer Goods, Inc., Viad Corporation filed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Henkel Consumer Goods)(Vineyard, Daniel)
November 23, 2021 Filing 499 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss defendant ELG Metals, Inc. filed by plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order ELG Metals, Inc.)(Vineyard, Daniel)
November 23, 2021 Filing 498 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendants Carerncar, LLC, ERCASA, LLC filed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Carerncar,LLC)(Vineyard, Daniel)
November 23, 2021 Filing 497 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendants Best Tape, Inc., Traxx Corporation filed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Best Tape, Inc.)(Vineyard, Daniel)
November 23, 2021 Filing 496 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant Armstrong Flooring, Inc. filed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Armstrong)(Vineyard, Daniel)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 495 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL OF 5211 SOUTHERN AVENUE, LLC; JOYCE MENDELL BRODY; RELIABLE STEEL BUILDING PRODUCTS, INC.; JEFFREY M. PALMER; AND NIKKI REAGAN FROM TW TEDESCO PROPERTIES, L.P.'S FIRST AMENDED CROSS-CLAIM WITH PREJUDICE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (bm)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 494 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL OF COOPER DRUM COOPERATING PARTIES GROUP FROM TW TEDESCO PROPERTIES, L.P.'S COUNTER-CLAIM WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr., re Stipulation to Dismiss Party #492 : It is hereby ORDERED that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4l (c). the claims and causes of action by Tedesco against CDCPG in the above- captioned action, including Tedesco's Counter-Claim, are dismissed without prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs. (bm)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 493 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL OF COOPER DRUM COOPERATING PARTIES GROUP FROM TW TEDESCO PROPERTIES, L.P.'S COUNTER-CLAIM WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr., re Stipulation to Dismiss Party #491 : It is hereby ORDERED that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(c), the claims and causes of action by Tedesco against CDCPG in the above-captioned action, including Tedescos Counter-Claim, are dismissed without prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs. (bm) Modified on 11/22/2021 (bm).
November 18, 2021 Filing 492 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss TW Tedesco Properties, L.P. filed by Counter Claimant TW Tedesco Properties, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hamrick, Alpheus)
November 18, 2021 Filing 491 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Cross-Claimant TW Tedesco Properties, L.P. filed by Cross-Complainant TW Tedesco Properties, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hamrick, Alpheus)
November 18, 2021 Filing 490 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Cross-Complainant TW Tedesco Properties, L.P. pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) Cross-Claim as to TW Tedesco Properties, L.P.. (Hamrick, Alpheus)
November 18, 2021 Filing 489 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Third-Party Plaintiff TW Tedesco Properties, L.P. pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) Third-Party Complaint as to TW Tedesco Properties, L.P.. (Hamrick, Alpheus)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 488 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT AND ORDER BARRING CLAIMS #474 by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. After considering the moving papers and the record as a whole, the Motion is GRANTED. The Court finds that the Settlement Agreement between and among CARERNCAR and CDCPG was made in good faith and is fair, reasonable, and consistent with the purposes of the CERCLA. (iv)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 487 ORDER GRANTING ELG METALS, INC.'S MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT AND BARRING CLAIMS AND GRANTING CERTIFICATION OF PARTIAL FINAL JUDGMENT UNDER F.R.C.P. 54(b) #478 by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. After considering the moving papers and the record as a whole, the Motion is GRANTED. The Court finds that the Settlement Agreement between and among ELG and Plaintiff was made in good faith and is fair, reasonable, and consistent with the purposes of the CERCLA. (iv)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 486 ORDER GRANTING ARMSTRONG FLOORING, INC.'S MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT AND BARRING CLAIMS AND GRANTING CERTIFICATION OF PARTIAL FINAL JUDGMENT UNDER F.R.C.P. 54(b) #479 by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. The Motion is GRANTED. The Court finds that the Settlement Agreement between and among Defendant and Plaintiff was made in good faith and is fair, reasonable, and consistent with the purposes of the CERCLA. (iv)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 485 ORDER GRANTING HENKEL CONSUMER GOODS INC. AND VIAD CORP'S MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT AND ORDER BARRING CLAIMS by Judge Andre Birotte Jr: granting #473 MOTION for Settlement. Accordingly, the Court ORDERS that: 1. The Settlement Agreement between and among Defendants and Plaintiff is approved as a good faith settlement; 2. All pending cross-claims against Defendants are dismissed with prejudice; (see order for further details). (mrgo)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 484 ORDER GRANTING BEST TAPE, INC.'S AND TRAXX CORPORATION'S MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT AND ORDER BARRING CLAIMS AND CERTIFICATION OF PARTIAL FINAL JUDGMENT UNDER F.R.C.P. 54(b) by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.granting #471 MOTION for Settlement (bm)
November 11, 2021 Filing 483 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney David F Wood counsel for Defendant M.O. Dion and Sons, Inc.. David F. Wood is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by DEFENDANT M.O. DION & SONS, Inc.. (Wood, David)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 482 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT TW TEDESCO PROPERTIES, L.P. PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41(a)(2) by Judge Andre Birotte Jr, re Stipulation to Dismiss Party #481 : The Court GRANTS the dismissal as follows: It is hereby ORDERED that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2), the claims and causes of action by the Group against Defendant in the above-captioned action, including the Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, are dismissed. Each party shall bear its own costs. (bm)
November 5, 2021 Filing 481 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant TW Tedesco Properties, L.P. filed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Vineyard, Daniel)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 480 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT CROWN BEVERAGE PACKAGING, LLC #472 by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. See attached order for details. (lom)
November 3, 2021 Filing 479 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of Motion for Good Faith Settlement Determination filed by Defendant Armstrong Flooring, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 12/3/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Declaration J. Praitis, #2 Declaration D. Vineyard, #3 Declaration S. Stake, #4 Proposed Order) (Attorney Judith Maria Praitis added to party Armstrong Flooring, Inc.(pty:dft)) (Praitis, Judith)
November 3, 2021 Filing 478 First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of Good Faith Settlement and Order Barring Claims and Certification of Partial Final Judgment filed by Defendant ELG Metals West Coast, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 12/3/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Monica Browner ISO Motion, #2 Declaration Stephanie Stake ISO Motion, #3 Declaration Dan Vineyard ISO Motion, #4 Proposed Order) (Attorney Monica Browner added to party ELG Metals West Coast, Inc.(pty:dft)) (Browner, Monica)
November 3, 2021 Filing 477 DECLARATION of DANIEL E. VINEYARD In Support of NOTICE OF JOINT MOTION AND JOINT MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT AND ORDER BARRING CLAIMS Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of NOTICE OF JOINT MOTION AND JOINT MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT AND ORDER BARRING CLAIMS #474 filed by Third Party Defendants Carerncar LLC, Carerncar, LLC, Cross Defendants Carerncar LLC, Carerncar, LLC, Defendants Carerncar, LLC, Carerncar, LLC, ERCASA, LLC, Counter Claimant Carerncar, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [ PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT AND ORDER BARRING CLAIMS)(Cohen, Albert)
November 3, 2021 Filing 476 DECLARATION of Stephanie Stake In Support of NOTICE OF JOINT MOTION AND JOINT MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT AND ORDER BARRING CLAIMS Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of NOTICE OF JOINT MOTION AND JOINT MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT AND ORDER BARRING CLAIMS #474 filed by Cross Defendants Carerncar LLC, Carerncar, LLC, Defendants Carerncar, LLC, Carerncar, LLC, ERCASA, LLC, Counter Claimant Carerncar, LLC, ThirdParty Defendant Carerncar, LLC. (Cohen, Albert)
November 3, 2021 Filing 475 DECLARATION of Albert M. Cohen In Support of NOTICE OF JOINT MOTION AND JOINT MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT AND ORDER BARRING CLAIMS Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of NOTICE OF JOINT MOTION AND JOINT MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT AND ORDER BARRING CLAIMS #474 filed by Cross Defendants Carerncar LLC, Carerncar, LLC, Defendants Carerncar, LLC, Carerncar, LLC, ERCASA, LLC, Counter Claimant Carerncar, LLC, ThirdParty Defendant Carerncar, LLC. (Cohen, Albert)
November 3, 2021 Filing 474 Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of NOTICE OF JOINT MOTION AND JOINT MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT AND ORDER BARRING CLAIMS filed by Defendant Carerncar LLC, Carerncar LLC, Carerncar, LLC, Carerncar, LLC, ERCASA, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 12/3/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attorney Albert Martin Cohen added to party Carerncar LLC(pty:3pd), Attorney Albert Martin Cohen added to party Carerncar, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Albert Martin Cohen added to party ERCASA, LLC(pty:dft)) (Cohen, Albert)
November 3, 2021 Filing 473 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval , determination of good faith settlement and order barring claims filed by defendants and counterclaimants Henkel Consumer Goods, Inc., Henkel Consumer Goods, Inc., Viad Corporation, Viad Corporation. Motion set for hearing on 12/3/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Berj K. Parseghian, #2 Declaration Daniel E. Vineyard, #3 Declaration Stephanie Stake, #4 Proposed Order) (Parseghian, Berj)
November 1, 2021 Filing 472 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant Crown Beverage Packaging, LLC filed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Vineyard, Daniel)
October 21, 2021 Filing 471 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of Determination of Good Faith Settlement and for an Order Barring Claims and for Certification of Partial Final Judgment Under FRCP 54(b) filed by Defendants Best Tape, Inc., Traxx Corporation. Motion set for hearing on 11/19/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Andrew Spitser, #3 Declaration of Daniel Vineyard) (Spitser, Andrew)
October 20, 2021 (DUPLICATE ENTRY) [SECOND AMENDED] COUNTERCLAIM against Counterdefendant Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group; amending (Amended) Counterclaims #264 ; with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant Viad Corp. (Answer to Third Amended Complaint and Counterclaims filed as one document, see document number 468) (gk)
October 20, 2021 (DUPLICATE ENTRY) [SECOND AMENDED] COUNTERCLAIM against Counterdefendant Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group; amending (Amended) Counterclaim #263 ; with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant Henkel Consumer Goods, Inc. as successor by merger to The Dial Corporation. (Answer to Third Amended Complaint and Counterclaims filed as one document, see document number 467). (gk)
October 20, 2021 Filing 468 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition, #462 COUNTERCLAIMS and JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant Viad Corporation, Viad Corporation.(Parseghian, Berj)
October 20, 2021 Filing 467 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition, #462 , COUNTERCLAIMS and JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant Henkel Consumer Goods, Inc., Henkel Consumer Goods, Inc..(Parseghian, Berj)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 470 ORDER GRANTING TW TEDESCO PROPERTIES, L.P.'S MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT AND ORDER BARRING CLAIMS AND CERTIFICATION OF PARTIAL FINAL JUDGMENT by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The Court GRANTS the Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement and for an Order Barring Claims and for Certification of Partial Final Judgment Under FRCP 54(b) #455 . The Court ORDERS that: (1) The Settlement Agreement between Defendant TW Tedesco Properties, L.P. and Plaintiff is approved as a good faith settlement; (2) Any claims or cross-claims for indemnity, contribution, or cost recovery against Tedesco by any non-settling party regarding matters addressed in the Settlement Agreement are barred; (3) The provisions of the Uniform Comparative Fault Act ("UCFA") shall apply as to the effect of this settlement; (4) Pursuant to UCFA Section 6, 42 U.S.C. Section 9613(f)(1), and the California Code of Civil Procedure Section 877.6, any and all claims for contribution, cost recovery, and/or indemnity against Tedesco, arising out of the matters asserted in this action or addressed in the Settlement Agreement, regardless of when asserted or by whom, are barred. Such claims are barred regardless of whether they are brought pursuant to CERCLA, 42 U.S.C. Section 9601, et seq., or pursuant to other federal or state law; (5) The Settlement Agreement constitutes a judicially approved settlement for purposes of 42 U.S.C. Section 9613(f). Moreover, the Court GRANTS Tedesco's certification of partial final judgment under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 54(b). The hearing scheduled for 10/22/2021 is hereby VACATED. (gk)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 469 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT AND ORDER BARRING CLAIMS by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The Court GRANTS the Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement and Order Barring Claims #464 . The Court ORDERS that: (1) The Settlement Agreement between Defendant Crown Beverage Packaging, LLC ("Crown") and Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group ("CDCPG") is approved as a good faith settlement; (2) Any claims or cross-claims for indemnity, contribution, or cost recovery against Crown by any non-settling party regarding matters addressed in the Settlement Agreement are barred; (3) The provisions of the Uniform Comparative Fault Act ("UCFA") shall apply as to the effect of this settlement; (4) Pursuant to UCFA Section 6 and the California Code of Civil Procedure Section 877.6, any and all claims for contribution, cost recovery, and/or indemnity against Crown, arising out of the matters asserted in this action or addressed in the Settlement Agreement, regardless of when asserted or by whom, are barred. Such claims are barred regardless of whether they are brought pursuant to CERCLA, 42 U.S.C. Section 9601, et seq., or pursuant to other federal or state law. (gk) Modified on 10/20/2021 (gk).
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 466 ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Granting Request for Approval of Substitution of Attorney David L. Isabel for Defendant Crown Beverage Packaging, LLC in place of Attorney Eric E. Tomaszewski #447 . (gk)
October 13, 2021 Filing 465 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice (Other),, #464 . The following error(s) was/were found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Applications/Ex Parte Applications/Motions/Petitions/Requests > Settlement. The filer used the event, Notice (Other), for docketing this filing. Only a motion-type event will prompt the filer to set a hearing date. This document notices an untimely date of 10/22/2021 at 10:00 AM. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
October 8, 2021 Filing 464 NOTICE of Motion and Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement and for an Order Barring Contribution filed by Defendant Crown Beverage Packaging, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel E. Vineyard, Esq. in support of Good Faith Determination and Order Barring Claims and for Certification of Partial Final Judgment under F.R.C.P. 54 (B), #2 Declaration of Steven L. Hoch, Esq. in support of Good Faith Determination and Order Barring Claims and for Certification of Partial Final Judgment under F.R.C.P. 54 (B), #3 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement and Order Barring Claims)(Hoch, Steven)
October 7, 2021 Filing 463 NOTICE OF LODGING filed by Crown Beverage Packaging, LLC re REQUEST TO WITHDRAW ATTORNEY Eric E. Tomaszewski as counsel of record for Crown Beverage Packaging, LLC #447 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - [Proposed] Order)(Hoch, Steven)
October 6, 2021 Filing 462 THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Acme Kustom Fit, Inc., Best Tape, Inc., Crown Beverage Packaging, LLC, ELG Metals, Inc., Henkel Consumer Goods, Inc., Metal Management, Inc., TW Tedesco Properties, L.P., Traxx Corporation, Viad Corporation, Carerncar, LLC, ERCASA, LLC, Armstrong Flooring, Inc. amending Amended Complaint/Petition,,, #258 , filed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group(Vineyard, Daniel)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 461 ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION TO FILE THE COOPER DRUM COOPERATING PARTIES GROUP'S THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT ADDING CARERNCAR, INC., ERCASA, LLC, AND ARMSTRONG FLOORING, INC. AS DEFENDANTS TO THE ACTION by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The Court hereby GRANTS the Unopposed Motion to File the Cooper DrumCooperating Parties Group's Third Amended Complaint adding Carerncar, Inc., ERCASA, LLC, and Armstrong Flooring, Inc. as Defendants to the Action Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(a)(2) #458 and ORDERS: Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group may file the Third Amended Complaint, attached as Exhibit A to the Motion, adding Carerncar, Inc., ERCASA, LLC, and Armstrong Flooring, Inc. as Defendants and removing dismissed parties as Defendants in this action. The Third Amended Complaint must be filed within four days of this order. Based on Plaintiff's unopposed Motion, the corresponding hearing on 10/29/2021 is VACATED. (gk)
September 30, 2021 Filing 460 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Clerk RE: Request filed 9/10/2021 #447 . Counsel shall immediately file a Proposed Order and email a Microsoft Word version of the Proposed Order to the chambers email address. (gk)
September 30, 2021 Filing 459 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: REQUEST TO WITHDRAW ATTORNEY Eric E. Tomaszewski as counsel of record for Crown Beverage Packaging, LLC #447 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed order not submitted pursuant to Local Rule 52-4.1. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
September 28, 2021 Filing 458 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file COOPER DRUM COOPERATING PARTIES GROUP'S THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group. Motion set for hearing on 10/29/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Third Amended Complaint, #2 Proposed Order) (Vineyard, Daniel)
September 23, 2021 Filing 457 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Third-Party Plaintiff TW Tedesco Properties, L.P. pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Reisner Metals, Inc., Shultz Properties Inc, Shultz Steel Company. (Hamrick, Alpheus)
September 23, 2021 Filing 456 NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Third-Party Plaintiff TW Tedesco Properties, L.P.((as to Third Party Complaint Doc No. 173 filed 11/15/2019, and amended Doc No. 431 filed 4/28/2021)), upon Third-Party Defendant Shultz Properties Inc acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 9/23/2021, answer due 10/14/2021. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Brendan Brown, Attorney. (Hamrick, Alpheus)
September 22, 2021 Filing 455 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT AND FOR AN ORDER BARRING CLAIMS AND FOR CERTIFICATION OF PARTIAL FINAL JUDGMENT UNDER FRCP 54(b) filed by Defendant, Counter-Claimant, Cross-Claimant, and Third-Party Plaintiff TW Tedesco Properties, L.P.. Motion set for hearing on 10/22/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeff Poole, #2 Declaration of Daniel Vineyard, #3 Proposed Order) (Poole, Jeff)
September 22, 2021 Filing 454 21-Day Summons Issued re First Amended Third-Party Complaint #431 as to Third Party Defendant Shultz Properties, Inc. (gk)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 453 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT M.O. DION & SONS, INC. PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41(a)(2) by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Upon Stipulation #451 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2), the claims and causes of action by Plaintiff against Defendant M.O. Dion & Sons, Inc. in the action, including the Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, are dismissed as against Defendant only. Each party shall bear its own costs. (gk)
September 21, 2021 Filing 452 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Third-Party Complaint,,,,,,, #431 filed by Third-Party Plaintiff TW Tedesco Properties, L.P.. (Poole, Jeff)
September 20, 2021 Filing 451 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant M.O. Dion and Sons, Inc. filed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Vineyard, Daniel)
September 17, 2021 Filing 450 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: First Amended Third-Party Complaint #431 . The following error(s) was found: The summons caption for the Third Party Complaint includes Schultz Properties, Inc. (just before Zoe 11-20). The caption should read identical to the Third Party Complaint's party caption list. Please note that this is not a First Amended Summons on a Third Party Complaint. It is a "Summons on a First Amended Third Party Complaint." The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (gk)
September 15, 2021 Filing 449 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Third-Party Complaint,,,,,,, #431 filed by Third-Party Plaintiff TW Tedesco Properties, L.P.. (Hamrick, Alpheus)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 448 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO SUBSTITUTE SHULTZ PROPERTIES, INC. FOR ZOE NO.11 IN TW TEDESCO PROPERTIES, L.P.'S FIRST AMENDED THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The Court hereby GRANTS the Stipulation #446 and ORDERS that Shultz Properties, Inc. shall be substituted as a Third Party Defendant in place of Zoe No. 11 in Tedesco's First Amended Third Party Complaint #431 , which shall hereafter reflect such substitution. (gk)
September 10, 2021 Filing 447 REQUEST TO WITHDRAW ATTORNEY Eric E. Tomaszewski as counsel of record for Crown Beverage Packaging, LLC filed by Defendant Crown Beverage Packaging, LLC. (Attorney Datev Dave Krikor Shenian added to party Crown Beverage Packaging, LLC(pty:dft)) (Shenian, Datev Dave)
September 10, 2021 Filing 446 STIPULATION for Order TO SUBSTITUTE SHULTZ PROPERTIES, INC. FOR ZOE NO. 11 IN TW TEDESCO PROPERTIES, L.P.S FIRST AMENDED THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT filed by Third-Party Plaintiff TW Tedesco Properties, L.P.((as to Third Party Complaint Doc No. 173 filed 11/15/2019, and amended Doc No. 431 filed 4/28/2021)). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hamrick, Alpheus)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 445 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT M.O. DION & SONS, INC.'S MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT AND FOR AN ORDER BARRING CONTRIBUTION by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Defendant M.O. Dion & Sons, Inc.'s ("M.O. Dion") Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement and Order Barring Contribution #442 is GRANTED. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: The Settlement between M.O. Dion and Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group ("CDCPG") is approved as being a good faith settlement. All claims for the total equitable indemnity, equitable comparative contribution, equitable partial indemnity based on comparative negligence or comparative fault arising out of the facts alleged in this matter are barred, regardless of when or by whom such claims are asserted. The Court orders that the Settlement constitutes a judicially approved settlement for purposes of 42 U.S.C. Section 9613(f). The Court grants M.O. Dion certification of partial final judgment under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 54(b). (gk)
August 10, 2021 Filing 444 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Third-Party Plaintiff TW Tedesco Properties, L.P. pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Julie Dykstra(Trustee of the Restated Beverly A. Barber Trust Agreement, dated July 31, 1997 (as to First Amended Third Party Complaint Doc No. 431 filed 4/28/2021)), Mistras Group Inc, On Atlantic, LLC. (Poole, Jeff)
July 28, 2021 Filing 443 Notice of Electronic Filing re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of Good Faith Determination #442 e-mailed to David Isabel bounced due to No longer with firm. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lmh) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 27, 2021 Filing 442 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of Good Faith Determination filed by defendant M.O. Dion and Sons, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 8/27/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration, #3 Declaration) (Attorney Stratton Peter Constantinides added to party M.O. Dion and Sons, Inc.(pty:dft)) (Constantinides, Stratton)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 441 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT'S RELIABLE STEEL BUILDING PRODUCTS, INC., JEFFREY M. PALMER, AND NIKKI REAGAN PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41(a)(2) #439 by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. The Court GRANTS the dismissal as follows: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2), the claims and causes of action by the Group against Defendants in the above-captioned action only, including the Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, are dismissed. Each party shall bear its own costs. (lom)
July 20, 2021 Filing 440 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Third-Party Plaintiff TW Tedesco Properties, L.P. pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to QUALA SYSTEMS, INC.. (Hamrick, Alpheus)
July 20, 2021 Filing 439 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendants Jeffrey M. Palmer, Nikki Reagan, Reliable Steel Building Products, Inc. filed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Vineyard, Daniel)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 438 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT GENERAL INSPECTION LABORATORIES (N/K/A GENIL, INC.) PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41(a)(2) by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The Court GRANTS the Joint Stipulation of Dismissal #437 as follows: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2), the claims and causes of action by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group against Defendant General Inspection Laboratories (n/k/a Genil, Inc.) only in the action, including the Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, are dismissed with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs. (gk)
May 21, 2021 Filing 437 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant General Inspection Laboratories filed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Vineyard, Daniel)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 436 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT AND ORDER BARRING CLAIMS by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The Joint Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement and Order Barring Claims #434 is GRANTED. the Court ORDERS that: (1) The Settlement Agreement between Defendant GENIL, INC. ("GENIL") and Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group ("CDCPG") is approved as a good faith settlement; (2) All pending cross-claims against GENIL shall be dismissed with prejudice; (3) Any claims or cross-claims for indemnity, contribution, or cost recovery against GENIL by any non-settling party regarding matters addressed in the Settlement Agreement are barred; (4) The provisions of the Uniform Comparative Fault Act ("UCFA") shall apply as to the effect of this settlement; (5) Any and all claims for contribution, cost recovery, and/or indemnity against GENIL, arising out of the matters asserted in this action or addressed in the Settlement Agreement, regardless of when asserted or by whom, are barred. (gk)
April 30, 2021 Filing 435 21-Day Summons Issued re First Amended Third-Party Complaint #431 as to Third Party Defendants Alloy Precision Grinding Co, Ameron International Corporation, Betty R Angel, Armstrong Cork Co, Armstrong Flooring Inc, Azalea Joint Venture LLC, Bowers-Bam LLC, Bowers-MM LLC, Brenntag Pacific Inc, Carerncar LLC, Cudahy Economic Development Corporation, Julie Dykstra Trustee of the Restated Beverly A. Barber Trust Agreement, dated July 31, 1997, Fantastic Plating, G and N Product Development, International Torque, Jackson Iron Works Inc, Jet Custom Chrome, Mondo Chrome, On Atlantic LLC, Lynchburg LP, M Stephens Manufacturing Inc, Mistras Group Inc, Patata Investment LLC, Pratt and Whitney Tool Co, Quala, Quala Systems Inc, Reisner Metals Inc, Shultz Steel Company, Technical Trade Institute, Accella Polyurethane Systems LLC, Advanced Grinding, All State Welding Alloy, Tsay J and R LLC, Vicksburg LP, Winsome Enterprises Inc, General Inspection Laboratories n/k/a Genil, Inc., Greggs Honda Service. (gk)
April 29, 2021 Filing 434 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of Determination of Good Faith Settlement and Order Barring Claims filed by Defendant and Cross-Defendant General Inspection Laboratories. Motion set for hearing on 5/28/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Charles M. Denton, #3 Declaration of Daniel E. Vineyard) (Lounsberry, Kendra)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 433 ORDER RE: ANGELES CHEMICAL COMPANY, INC. AND CDCPG'S JOINT MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT AND ORDER BARRING CLAIMS by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The Joint Motion #423 is GRANTED. The Court ORDERS that the Settlement Agreement between and among Defendant and Cross-Defendant Angeles Chemical Co., Inc. ("Angeles") and Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group ("CDCPG") is approved as a good faith settlement. All pending cross-claims against Angeles shall be dismissed with prejudice. Any claims or cross-claims for indemnity, contribution, or cost recovery against Angeles by any non-settling party regarding matters addressed in the Settlement Agreement are barred. See document for further details. (gk)
April 28, 2021 Filing 432 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Third-Party Complaint,,,,,,, #431 filed by Third-Party Plaintiff TW Tedesco Properties, L.P.. (Poole, Jeff)
April 28, 2021 Filing 431 First AMENDED THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT against Third-Party Defendants Alloy Precision Grinding Co(a business form unknown (as to Third Party Complaint Doc No. 173 filed 11/15/2019)), Ameron International Corporation, Armstrong Flooring, Inc., Azalea Joint Venture, LLC, BETTY R. ANGEL, TRUSTEE OF TRUST B UNDER THE ANGEL TRUST dated December 8, 1987, BOWERS-BAM, LLC, BOWERS-MM, LLC, Brenntag Pacific, Inc., Julie Dykstra(in her capacity as Trustee of the RESTATED BEVERLY A. BARBER TRUST AGREEMENT, dated July 31, 1997), Fantastic Plating(a business form unknown), G and N Product Development(a business form unknown), General Inspection Laboratories, Greggs Honda Service(a business form unknown (as to Third Party Complaint Doc No. 173 filed 11/15/2019)), International Torque(a business form unknown), JACKSON IRON WORKS, INC., Jet Custom Chrome(a business form unknown (as to Third Party Complaint Doc No. 173 filed 11/15/2019)), LYNCHBURG L.P., M STEPHENS MANUFACTURING, INC., Mistras Group, Inc., Mondo Chrome(a business form unknown (as to Third Party Complaint Doc No. 173 filed 11/15/2019)), On Atlantic, LLC, PATATA INVESTMENT, LLC, PRATT & WHITNEY TOOL, CO., QUALA (f/n/a QUALAWASH HOLDINGS, LLC, a Florida Liability company), QUALA SYSTEMS, INC., Reisner Metals, Inc., Shultz Steel Company, Technical Trade Institute(a business form unknown), CUDAHY ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION, Carerncar, LLC, Advanced Grinding(a business entity form unknown), All State Welding Alloy(a business form unknown (as to Third Party Complaint Doc No. 173 filed 11/15/2019)), Tsay J & R, LLC, VICKSBURG L.P., WINSOME ENTERPRISES, INC. (dba QUALITY CARRIERS, a subsidiary of QUALITY DISTRIBUTION, INC.), Zoes amending Third Party Complaint,, #173 ; JURY DEMAND, filed by Third-Party Plaintiff TW Tedesco Properties, L.P.(Poole, Jeff)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 430 ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Upon TW Tedesco Properties, L.P.'s ("Tedesco") Motion #428 , the Court ORDERS that Tedesco may file its First Amended Third-Party Complaint as attached as Exhibit "1" to the Motion to add certain parties as third-party defendants in this action. (gk)
April 8, 2021 Filing 429 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney H. Joseph Drapalski, III counsel for ThirdParty Defendant Mistras Group, Inc.. H. Joseph Drapalski, III will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Mistras Group, Inc.. (Drapalski, H. Joseph)
April 7, 2021 Filing 428 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file First Amended Third Party Complaint filed by Third Party Plaintiff TW Tedesco Properties, L.P.((as to Third Party Complaint Doc No. 173 filed 11/15/2019)). Motion set for hearing on 5/7/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order) (Hamrick, Alpheus)
March 31, 2021 Filing 427 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Clerk RE: First Amended Third Party Complaint filed 3/31/2021 #419 . The document is stricken. (gk)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 426 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANTS JERVIS B. WEBB COMPANY AND JERVIS B. WEBB COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41(a)(2) by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Upon Stipulation #418 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2), the claims and causes of action by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group against Defendants Jervis B. Webb Company and Jervis B. Webb Company of California only in the action, including the Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, are dismissed with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs. (gk)
March 30, 2021 Filing 425 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Third Party Complaint,,,, #419 . The following error(s) was/were found: Leave of court required for filing. Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Other Complaint Filings > Amended Third-Party Complaint. The filer used the event, Complaints and Other Initiating Documents > Third Party Complaint, for docketing this filing. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
March 29, 2021 Filing 424 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Determination of Good Faith Settlement and Order Barring Claims; Memorandum of Points and Authorities #423 filed by Defendant Angeles Chemical Co., Inc.. (Caufield, Jeffery)
March 29, 2021 Filing 423 Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Determination of Good Faith Settlement and Order Barring Claims; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Defendant Angeles Chemical Co., Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 4/30/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Santino Tropea, #2 Exhibit A to Tropea Declaration, #3 Declaration of Chevazz G. Grown, #4 Declaration of John Locke, #5 Proposed Order) (Caufield, Jeffery)
March 29, 2021 Filing 422 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Steven J Elie counsel for Defendant Shultz Steel Company. Steven J. Elie will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Shultz Steel Company. (Elie, Steven)
March 29, 2021 Filing 421 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Steven J Elie counsel for Defendant Reisner Metals, Inc.. Steven J. Elie will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Reisner Metals, Inc.. (Elie, Steven)
March 26, 2021 Filing 420 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Third Party Complaint,,,, #419 filed by Third-Party Plaintiff TW Tedesco Properties, L.P.((as to Third Party Complaint Doc No. 173 filed 11/15/2019)). (Poole, Jeff)
March 26, 2021 Filing 419 First THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Third-Party Plaintiff Ameron International Corporation, Armstrong Flooring, Inc., Azalea Joint Venture, LLC, BETTY R. ANGEL, TRUSTEE OF TRUST B UNDER THE ANGEL TRUST dated December 8, 1987, BOWERS-BAM, LLC, BOWERS-MM, LLC, Brenntag Pacific, Inc., CUDAHY ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION, Carerncar, LLC, Julie Dykstra, Fantastic Plating, G and N Product Development, General Inspection Laboratories, Greggs Honda Service, International Torque, JACKSON IRON WORKS, INC., Jet Custom Chrome, Mistras Group, Inc., LYNCHBURG L.P., M STEPHENS MANUFACTURING, INC., Mondo Chrome, On Atlantic, LLC, PATATA INVESTMENT, LLC, PRATT & WHITNEY TOOL, CO., QUALA (f/n/a QUALAWASH HOLDINGS, LLC, a Florida Liability company), QUALA SYSTEMS, INC., Reisner Metals, Inc., Shultz Steel Company, Advanced Grinding, All State Welding Alloy, Alloy Precision Grinding Co, Technical Trade Institute, Tsay J & R, LLC, VICKSBURG L.P., WINSOME ENTERPRISES, INC. (dba QUALITY CARRIERS, a subsidiary of QUALITY DISTRIBUTION, INC.) ; Yes, filed by Defendant, Counter-Claimant, Cross-Claimant, and Third-Party Plaintiff TW Tedesco Properties, L.P..(Poole, Jeff)
March 26, 2021 Filing 418 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendants Jervis B. Webb Company, Jervis B. Webb Company of California filed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Vineyard, Daniel)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 417 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANTS 5211 SOUTHERN AVENUE, LLC AND JOYCE MENDELL BRODY PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41(a)(2) by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The Court GRANTS the Joint Stipulation of Dismissal #416 as follows: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2), the claims and causes of action by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group against Defendants 5211 Southern Avenue, LLC and Joyce Mendell Brody only in the action, including the Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, are dismissed without prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs. (gk)
March 11, 2021 Filing 416 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendants Joyce Mendell Brody, 5211 Southern Avenue, LLC filed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Vineyard, Daniel)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 415 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL OF SASOL (USA) CORPORATION, SASOL CHEMICALS (USA) LLC, SASOL WAX AMERICAS, INC., AND SASOL WAX NORTH AMERICA CORPORATION PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41 (a)(2) and F.R.C.P. 41(c) by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Upon Stipulation #413 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 41(,)(2) and 4l(c), the claims and causes of action by Defendant, Counter-Claimant, Cross-Claimant, and Third-Party Plaintiff TW Tedesco Properties, L.P. against Cross-Defendants Sasol (USA) Corporation, Sasol Chemicals (USA) LLC, Sasol Wax Americas, Inc., and Sasol Wax North America Corporation in the action, including Tedesco's First Amended Cross-Claim, are dismissed without prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs. (gk)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 414 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINES IN THE COURT'S SCHEDULE OF PRETRIAL AND TRIAL DATES #412 by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. The Court GRANTS the stipulation and modifies the Scheduling Order governing this case as set forth in the Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates chart below. See attached - SCHEDULE OF PRETRIAL AND TRIAL DATES WORKSHEET for new dates/ deadlines and hearings. (lom)
March 4, 2021 Filing 413 STIPULATION to Dismiss Cross-Defendants SASOL CHEMICALS (USA) LLC, Sasol (USA) Corporation((as to Cross-Claim Doc No. 172-1 filed 11/15/2019, Amended Doc No. 275-1 filed 8/26/2020)), Sasol (USA) Corporation((as to Cross-Claim Doc No. 172-1 filed 11/15/2019)), Sasol Chemicals USA LLC, Sasol Wax Americas, Inc.((as to Cross-Claim Doc No. 172-1 filed 11/15/2019)), Sasol Wax North America Corporation((as to Cross-Claim Doc No. 172-1 filed 11/15/2019)) filed by Defendant, Counter-Claimant, Cross-Claimant, and Third-Party Plaintiff TW Tedesco Properties, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Poole, Jeff)
March 3, 2021 Filing 412 Joint STIPULATION to AMEND Scheduling Order,,,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,,, #210 filed by defendants and counterclaimants Henkel Consumer Goods, Inc., Henkel Consumer Goods, Inc., Viad Corporation, Viad Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Parseghian, Berj)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 411 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order GRANTING Defendant and Cross-Defendants Jervis B. Webb Company ("JBW") and Jervis B. Webb Company of California's ("Webb California") Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement and Order Barring Claims by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The Court GRANTS the Webb Parties' Motion for the Determination of Good Faith Settlement and Order Barring Claims #385 . Accordingly, the Court ORDERS that: The Settlement Agreement between and among JBW, Webb California, and Cooper Drum is approved as a good faith settlement. All pending cross-claims against JBW and Webb California shall be dismissed with prejudice. Any claims or cross-claims for indemnity, contribution, or cost recovery against the Webb Parties by any non-settling party regarding matters addressed in the Settlement Agreement are barred. See document for further details. Court Reporter: N/A. (gk)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 410 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT ROHM & HAAS COMPANY PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41(a)(2) by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Upon Stipulation #409 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2), the claims and causes of action by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group against Defendant Rohm & Haas Company only in the action, including the Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, are dismissed. Each party shall bear its own costs. (gk)
February 16, 2021 Filing 409 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant Rohm and Haas Company filed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Vineyard, Daniel)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 408 TEXT ONLY ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The hearing on the MOTION for Order for Determination of Good Faith Settlement and Order Barring Claims #385 set for 2/12/2021 at 10:00 am is hereby vacated and taken off calendar. The motion is suitable for decision without oral argument and stands SUBMITTED. No appearance necessary on 2/12/2021. The Court's ruling wil issue. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jre) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 407 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT SASOL CHEMICALS (USA) LLC PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41(a)(2) by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Upon Stipulation #406 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2), the claims and causes of action by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group against Defendant Sasol Chemicals (USA) LLC in the action, including the Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, are dismissed. Each party shall bear its own costs. (gk)
February 3, 2021 Filing 406 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant SASOL CHEMICALS (USA) LLC filed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Vineyard, Daniel)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 405 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT ON ATLANTIC, LLC PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41(a)(2) by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The Court GRANTS the Stipulation #400 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2), the claims and causes of action by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group (the "Group") against Defendant On Atlantic, LLC in the action, including those in the Group's Second Amended Complaint, (Dkt. No. 258), are dismissed. Each party shall bear its own costs. (gk)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 404 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL OF THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANT MISTRAS GROUP, INC., PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41(c) by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The Stipulation #401 is granted. Defendant and Third-Party Plaintiff On Atlantic, LLC's ("On Atlantic") Third Party Complaint #342 , including all claims and causes of action set forth therein, is dismissed against Defendant Mistras Group, Inc. ("Mistras"). On Atlantic and Mistras shall bear their own costs. (gk)
January 29, 2021 Filing 403 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Determination of Good Faith Settlement and Order Barring Claims; Memorandum of Points and Authorities #385 filed by Defendants Jervis B. Webb Company, Jervis B. Webb Company of California. (Romey, Michael)
January 28, 2021 Filing 402 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Defendant and Third-Party Plaintiff On Atlantic, LLC pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Julie Dykstra. (Aspis, Norman)
January 28, 2021 Filing 401 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Third-Party Defendant Mistras Group, Inc. filed by Defendant and Third-Party Plaintiff On Atlantic, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL OF THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANT MISTRAS GROUP, INC., PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41(c))(Aspis, Norman)
January 28, 2021 Filing 400 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant On Atlantic, LLC filed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Vineyard, Daniel)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 399 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANTS CARERNCAR, LLC; ARMSTRONG FLOORING, INC.; REISNER METALS, INC.; AND SHULTZ STEEL COMPANY PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41(a)(2) by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Upon Stipulations #389 , #391 , #392 , #393 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2), the claims and causes of action against Defendants CARERNCAR, LLC, Armstrong Flooring, Inc., sued as Armstrong World Industries, Inc., Wyman-Gordon, as Successor In Interest to Reisner Metals, Inc., and Shultz Steel Company, including the Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, are dismissed. Each party shall bear its own costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Defendant CARERNCAR, LLC #381 and the Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Defendant Armstrong World Industries, Inc. #382 are hereby DENIED as MOOT. (gk)
January 27, 2021 Filing 398 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant, Counter-Claimant, Cross-Claimant, and Third-Party Plaintiff TW Tedesco Properties, L.P., TW Tedesco Properties, L.P., TW Tedesco Properties, L.P., TW Tedesco Properties, L.P.((as to Cross-Claim Doc No. 273 filed 8/25/2020)) for Court Reporter. Court will contact Sara Justice at sjustice@hamricklaw.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Poole, Jeff)
January 22, 2021 Filing 397 ELG METALS, INC.S JOINDER IN TW TEDESCO PROPERTIES, L.P.S LIMITED OPPOSITION [ECF 390] TO JERVIS B. WEBB COMPANY AND JERVIS B. WEBB COMPANY OF CALIFORNIAS MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT AND ORDER BARRING CLAIMS in opposition to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Determination of Good Faith Settlement and Order Barring Claims; Memorandum of Points and Authorities #385 filed by Defendant ELG Metals, Inc.. (Strong Castillo, Sophia)
January 22, 2021 Filing 396 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Monica Browner counsel for Defendant ELG Metals, Inc.. Adding Monica Browner as counsel of record for ELG Metals, Inc. (including in its capacity as successor-by-merger to ELG Metals West Coast Inc.) for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by counsel for defendant ELG Metals, Inc. (including in its capacity as successor-by-merger to ELG Metals West Coast Inc.). (Attorney Monica Browner added to party ELG Metals, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Monica Browner added to party ELG Metals, Inc.(pty:dft))(Browner, Monica)
January 22, 2021 Filing 395 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Determination of Good Faith Settlement and Order Barring Claims; Memorandum of Points and Authorities #385 filed by Defendants Henkel Consumer Goods, Inc., Viad Corporation, Counter Claimants Henkel Consumer Goods, Inc., Viad Corporation. (Parseghian, Berj)
January 22, 2021 Filing 394 ON ATLANTIC, LLC'S NOTICE OF JOINDER AND JOINDER IN TW TEDESCO PROPERTIES L.P.'S LIMITED OPPOSITION (ECF 390) re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Determination of Good Faith Settlement and Order Barring Claims; Memorandum of Points and Authorities #385 filed by Defendant On Atlantic, LLC. (Aspis, Norman)
January 22, 2021 Filing 393 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant Carerncar, LLC filed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Vineyard, Daniel)
January 22, 2021 Filing 392 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant Shultz Steel Company filed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Vineyard, Daniel)
January 22, 2021 Filing 391 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant Reisner Metals, Inc. filed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Vineyard, Daniel)
January 22, 2021 Filing 390 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Determination of Good Faith Settlement and Order Barring Claims; Memorandum of Points and Authorities #385 filed by Cross Claimant TW Tedesco Properties, L.P., ThirdParty Plaintiff TW Tedesco Properties, L.P., Defendant TW Tedesco Properties, L.P., Counter Claimant TW Tedesco Properties, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Jeff Poole)(Poole, Jeff)
January 22, 2021 Filing 389 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant Armstrong World Industries, Inc. filed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Vineyard, Daniel)
January 22, 2021 Filing 388 DEFENDANT CARERNCAR LLC'S ANSWER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT - ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,, #258 , COUNTERCLAIM against Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group filed by Defendant Carerncar, LLC.(Cohen, Albert)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 387 ORDER GRANTING THIRD STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION TO ANSWER BY DEFENDANT GENIL, INC. #386 by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Defendant GENIL, Inc. to respond to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint shall be extended from January 18, 2021 to March 15, 2021. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any deadlines for discovery between Plaintiff and this Defendant may be extended for up to 120 days following Defendant's responsive pleading. (iv)
January 20, 2021 Filing 386 Third STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to March 15, 2021 re Amended Complaint/Petition,,, #258 filed by Defendant General Inspection Laboratories. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lounsberry, Kendra)
January 15, 2021 Filing 385 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Determination of Good Faith Settlement and Order Barring Claims; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Defendants Jervis B. Webb Company, Jervis B. Webb Company of California. Motion set for hearing on 2/12/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael G. Romey, #2 Declaration of Michael J. Farley, #3 Declaration of Daniel E. Vineyard, #4 Proposed Order) (Romey, Michael)
January 15, 2021 Filing 384 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. PROC. 12(B)(6); MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES #381 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to the Pleadings Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(C) #382 Joint Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Armstrong Floorings Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and Carerncar, LLCs Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Armstrong World Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Praitis, Judith)
January 15, 2021 Filing 383 DECLARATION of Judith M. Praitis in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to the Pleadings Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(C) #382 filed by Defendant Armstrong World Industries, Inc.. (Praitis, Judith)
January 15, 2021 Filing 382 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to the Pleadings Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(C) filed by Defendant Armstrong World Industries, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 2/12/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion) (Praitis, Judith)
January 15, 2021 Filing 381 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. PROC. 12(B)(6); MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES filed by Defendant CARERNCAR, LLC Carerncar LLC, Carerncar, LLC, Carerncar, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 2/12/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint, #2 Exhibit Selected Excerpts From Documents In Request For Judicial Notice) (Cohen, Albert)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 380 ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Edward C. Lewis to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Third Party Defendant Mistras Group, Inc., designating H. Joseph Drapalski as local counsel #379 . (gk)
December 28, 2020 Filing 379 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Edward C. Lewis to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of ThirdParty Defendant Mistras Group, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-29742781) filed by Third-Party Defendant Mistras Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Drapalski, H. Joseph)
December 23, 2020 Filing 378 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Edward C. Lewis. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (gk)
December 18, 2020 Filing 377 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Third Party Defendant Mistras Group, Inc., identifying Sotirios Vahaviolos, founder and executive chairman, is the only 10% shareholder with approximately 35% of the outstanding shares. (Drapalski, H.)
December 18, 2020 Filing 376 ANSWER to Third Party Complaint, #342 filed by Third-Party Defendant Mistras Group, Inc..(Drapalski, H.)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 375 ORDER GRANTING SECOND STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION TO ANSWER BY DEFENDANT GENIL, INC. #372 by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the time for Defendant GENIL, Inc. to respond to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint shall be extended from October13, 2020 to January 18, 2021. (et)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 374 ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr: granting #371 Non-Resident Attorney Charles M. Denton APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant General Inspection Laboratories, designating Kendra B Lounsberry as local counsel. (et)
December 7, 2020 Filing 373 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Defendant, Counter-Claimant, Cross-Claimant, and Third-Party Plaintiff TW Tedesco Properties, L.P. pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Armstrong World Industries, Inc., Carerncar, LLC, On Atlantic, LLC, Reisner Metals, Inc., Shultz Steel Company((as to Cross-Claim Doc No. 273 filed 8/25/2020)). (Hamrick, Alpheus)
December 7, 2020 Filing 372 Second STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to January 18, 2021 re Amended Complaint/Petition,,, #258 filed by Defendant General Inspection Laboratories. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lounsberry, Kendra)
December 4, 2020 Filing 371 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Charles M. Denton to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant General Inspection Laboratories (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-29360235) filed by Defendant General Inspection Laboratories. (Attachments: #1 Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Lounsberry, Kendra)
November 24, 2020 Filing 370 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Timothy J. Owens & Associates, Inc.. (Vineyard, Daniel)
November 23, 2020 Filing 369 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) #367 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Stipulations > Extending Time to Answer (More than 30 days). Rule 8-3 does not apply to answers, replies or other responses to cross-claims, counterclaims, third-party complaints or any amended or supplemental pleadings. Lacking proposed order, pursuant to Local Rule 52-4.1. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 368 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT UPON RECUSAL by Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment Discovery pursuant to General Order 05-07. Case randomly reassigned from Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth to Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-3007 AB (PVCx). (esa)
November 19, 2020 Filing 367 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Mistras Group, Inc. answer now due 12/18/2020, re Third Party Complaint, #342 filed by Third-Party Defendant Mistras Group, Inc..(Drapalski, Henry)
November 19, 2020 Filing 366 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Henry J Drapalski on behalf of ThirdParty Defendant Mistras Group, Inc. (Attorney Henry J Drapalski added to party Mistras Group, Inc.(pty:3pd), Attorney Henry J Drapalski added to party Mistras Group, Inc.(pty:3pd))(Drapalski, Henry)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 365 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT MIKE PALM CLUB, LLC PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41(a)(2) by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Upon Stipulation #363 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2), the claims and causes of action by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group against Defendant Mike Palm Club, LLC in the action, including in the Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint, are dismissed. Each party shall bear its own costs. (gk)
November 12, 2020 Filing 363 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant Mike Palm Club, LLC filed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Vineyard, Daniel)
November 11, 2020 Filing 362 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Third Party Plaintiff On Atlantic, LLC, upon Third Party Defendant Mistras Group, Inc. served on 10/29/2020, answer due 11/19/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CSC Lawyers Incorporating Service, Registered Agent by Susie Vang in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Aspis, Norman)
November 11, 2020 Filing 361 Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group's ANSWER to Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), Counterclaim #341 by On Atlantic, LLC filed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group.(Vineyard, Daniel)
November 11, 2020 Filing 360 Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group's ANSWER to Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, Counterclaim, #340 by Armstrong Flooring, Inc. filed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group.(Vineyard, Daniel)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 359 ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Granting Request for Approval of Substitution of Attorney Trajan Perez for Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group in place of Attorneys Brian C. Merges and Rich ard W. Vanis, Jr. #349 . (gk)
November 9, 2020 Filing 358 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Shultz Steel Company, identifying Precision Castparts Corp. and Berkshire Hathaway Inc.. (Bradley, Donald)
November 9, 2020 Filing 357 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,, #258 filed by Defendant Shultz Steel Company.(Bradley, Donald)
November 9, 2020 Filing 356 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Reisner Metals, Inc., identifying Wyman-Gordon, Precision Castparts Corp., and Berkshire Hathaway Inc.. (Bradley, Donald)
November 9, 2020 Filing 355 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,, #258 by Wyman-Gordon, as Successor in Interest to Reisner Metals, Inc. filed by Defendant Reisner Metals, Inc..(Bradley, Donald)
November 9, 2020 Filing 354 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group, upon Defendant Air Nail Company, Inc. served on 10/20/2020, answer due 11/10/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Kanji Montalvo, Deputy, CA Secretary of State in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and no service by mail was executed.Original Summons NOT returned. (Vineyard, Daniel)
November 9, 2020 Filing 353 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group, upon Defendant International Staple & Machine Company served on 10/20/2020, answer due 11/10/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Kanji Montalvo, Deputy, CA Secretary of State in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and no service by mail was executed.Original Summons NOT returned. (Vineyard, Daniel)
November 9, 2020 Filing 352 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group, upon Defendant Pemaco, Inc. served on 10/20/2020, answer due 11/10/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Kanji Montalvo, Deputy, CA Secretary of State in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and no service by mail was executed.Original Summons NOT returned. (Vineyard, Daniel)
November 9, 2020 Filing 351 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group, upon Defendant Metal Management, Inc. served on 10/20/2020, answer due 11/10/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Kanji Montalvo, Deputy, CA Secretary of State in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and no service by mail was executed.Original Summons NOT returned. (Vineyard, Daniel)
November 6, 2020 Filing 350 Third STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to January 18, 2021 re Amended Complaint/Petition,,, #258 filed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Vineyard, Daniel)
November 3, 2020 Filing 349 REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Trajan Perez in place of attorney Brian Merges and Richard W. Vanis, Jr. of Mokri Vanis & Jones, LLP filed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Vineyard, Daniel)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 348 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION FOR DEFENDANT GENIL, INC.'S EXTENSION TO ANSWER FIRST AMENDED CROSS-CLAIM BY TW TEDESCO PROPERTIES, L.P. #346 by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. The time for Defendant GENIL, Inc. to respond to Defendant, Cross-Claimant TW Tedesco Properties, L.P.'s First Amended Cross- Claim shall be extended to and including 21 days after Defendant GENIL files and serves its Answer or other initial responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint. (iv)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 347 ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. granting #345 Non-Resident Attorney Bonnie A Barnett APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Armstrong Flooring, Inc. (erronesously sued as Armstrong World Industries, Inc.), designating Judith M Praitis as local counsel. (bm)
October 28, 2020 Filing 346 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 21-Days After Defendant GENIL Files and Serves Its Answer or Other Initial Pleading to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint re Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,,,,,,, Crossclaim,,,,,,,,,,, #275 filed by Defendant/Cross-Defendant General Inspection Laboratories((as to Amended Cross-Claim Doc No. 275-1 filed 8/26/2020)). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lounsberry, Kendra)
October 26, 2020 Filing 345 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Bonnie A. Barnett to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Armstrong World Industries, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-28711062) filed by Defendant Armstrong World Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice) (Praitis, Judith)
October 26, 2020 Filing 344 21 DAY Summons Issued re Third Party Complaint, #342 as to Third Party Defendants Julie Dykstra, Mistras Group, Inc. (bm)
October 23, 2020 Filing 343 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Third Party Complaint, #342 filed by Third-Party Plaintiff On Atlantic, LLC. (Aspis, Norman)
October 23, 2020 Filing 342 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Third-Party Defendants Mistras Group, Inc.; Julie Dykstra, as Trustee of the Restated Beverly A. Barber Trust Agreement; DOES 1-25 On Atlantic, LLC, filed by Third-Party Plaintiff On Atlantic, LLC. (Attorney Norman M Aspis added to party On Atlantic, LLC(pty:3pp), Attorney Norman M Aspis added to party On Atlantic, LLC(pty:3pp))(Aspis, Norman)
October 23, 2020 Filing 341 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,, #258 Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group's Second Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group filed by Defendant On Atlantic, LLC.(Aspis, Norman)
October 23, 2020 Filing 340 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,, #258 Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group's Second Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group filed by Defendant Armstrong World Industries, Inc..(Praitis, Judith)
October 22, 2020 Filing 339 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Amanda Semaan counsel for Defendant Armstrong World Industries, Inc.. Adding Amanda Semaan as counsel of record for Armstrong Flooring, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Armstrong Flooring, Inc.. (Attorney Amanda Semaan added to party Armstrong World Industries, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Amanda Semaan added to party Armstrong World Industries, Inc.(pty:dft))(Semaan, Amanda)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 338 ORDER GRANTING COOPER DRUM COOPERATING PARTIES GROUP'S MOTION FOR SERVICE ON THE SECRETARY OF STATE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The Court hereby GRANTS Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group's (the "Group") Motion for Service on the Secretary of State #336 and permits the Group to execute substituted service on Defendants Air Nail Company, Inc., International Staple & Machine Company, Pemaco, Inc., Metal Management, Inc., and ACME Kustom Fit, Inc. by hand delivery of the requisite copy of process to be served, a copy of the Court Order, and payment of the Secretary of State's fee to the Secretary of State's office. (gk)
October 14, 2020 Filing 337 NOTICE filed by Defendant CARERNCAR, LLC Carerncar LLC, Carerncar, LLC, Carerncar, LLC. Certification and Notice of Interested Parties (Local Rule 7.1-1) (Cohen, Albert)
October 13, 2020 Filing 336 Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group's Motion for Service on the Secretary of State (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(Vineyard, Daniel)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 335 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION FOR DEFENDANT GENIL, INC.'S EXTENSION TO ANSWER FIRST AMENDED CROSS-CLAIM BY TW TEDESCO PROPERTIES, L.P. #329 by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. The time for Defendant GENIL, Inc. to respond to Defendant, Cross-Claimant TW Tedesco Properties, L.P.'s First Amended Cross- Claim shall be extended to and including October 31, 2020. (iv)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 334 ORDER TO SECOND STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT SERVED UPON DEFENDANT SHULTZ STEEL COMPANY by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Upon Stipulation #327 , the deadline for Defendant Shultz Steel Company to respond to the Second Amended Complaint #258 is extended to 11/9/2020. (gk)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 333 ORDER TO SECOND STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT SERVED UPON DEFENDANTS REISNER METALS, INC. by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Upon Stipulation #326 , the deadline for Defendant Reisner Metals, Inc. to respond to the Second Amended Complaint #258 is extended to 11/9/2020. (gk)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 332 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND TW TEDESCO PROPERTIES, L.P.'S FIRST AMENDED CROSSCLAIM by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Upon Stipulation #325 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the time for Defendant CARERNCAR, LLC, to respond to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint #258 and TW Tedesco's First Amended Counterclaim #275 shall be extended to 11/9/2020. (gk)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 331 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION TO ANSWER BY DEFENDANT GENIL, INC. by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Upon Stipulation #299 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the time for Defendant GENIL, Inc. to respond to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint #258 shall be extended to 10/13/2020. (gk)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 330 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The Joint Stipulation #323 is granted. Defendant Armstrong World Industries, Inc.'s deadline to respond to the Second Amended Complaint #258 is extended until and including 10/7/2020. (gk)
October 6, 2020 Filing 329 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to October 31, 2020 re Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,,,,,,, Crossclaim,,,,,,,,,,, #275 filed by Defendant/Cross-Defendant General Inspection Laboratories((as to Amended Cross-Claim Doc No. 275-1 filed 8/26/2020)). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Kendra B Lounsberry added to party General Inspection Laboratories(pty:crd), Attorney Kendra B Lounsberry added to party General Inspection Laboratories(pty:crd))(Lounsberry, Kendra)
October 6, 2020 Filing 328 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Bonnie A. Barnett. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (gk)
October 5, 2020 Filing 327 Second STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 11/09/2020 re Amended Complaint/Petition,,, #258 filed by Defendant Shultz Steel Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Elie, Steven)
October 5, 2020 Filing 326 Second STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 11/09/2020 re Amended Complaint/Petition,,, #258 filed by Defendant Reisner Metals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Elie, Steven)
October 5, 2020 Filing 325 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to November 9, 2020 filed by Defendant CARERNCAR, LLC Carerncar LLC, Carerncar, LLC, Carerncar, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Stipulation to Extend)(Cohen, Albert)
October 2, 2020 Filing 324 Corporate Disclosure Statement and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Armstrong World Industries, Inc., identifying Armstrong Flooring, Inc.. (Praitis, Judith)
October 2, 2020 Filing 323 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to October 23, 2020 re Amended Complaint/Petition,,, #258 filed by Defendant Armstrong World Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Judith Maria Praitis added to party Armstrong World Industries, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Judith Maria Praitis added to party Armstrong World Industries, Inc.(pty:dft))(Praitis, Judith)
October 1, 2020 Filing 322 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, #299 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lounsberry, Kendra)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 321 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION BY PLAINTIFF COOPER DRUM COOPERATING PARTIES GROUP AND DEFENDANT ON ATLANTIC, LLC TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT BY 30 DAYS by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Upon Stipulation #319 , On Atlantic shall have an extension of time, up to and including 10/23/2020 to file its response to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint #258 . (gk)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 320 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TW TEDESCO PROPERTIES, L.P.'S FIRST AMENDED CROSSCLAIM by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Upon Stipulation #313 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the time for Defendant Carerncar, LLC, to respond to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint #258 shall be extended to 10/9/2020. (gk)
September 22, 2020 Filing 319 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to On Atlantic, LLC answer now due 10/23/2020, re Amended Complaint/Petition,,, #258 filed by Defendant On Atlantic, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Aspis, Norman)
September 22, 2020 Filing 318 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Norman M Aspis counsel for Defendant On Atlantic, LLC. Adding Norman M. Aspis as counsel of record for On Atlantic, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant On Atlantic, LLC. (Attorney Norman M Aspis added to party On Atlantic, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Norman M Aspis added to party On Atlantic, LLC(pty:dft))(Aspis, Norman)
September 22, 2020 Filing 317 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tim C Hsu counsel for Cross Defendant On Atlantic LLC. Adding Tim C. Hsu as counsel of record for On Atlantic, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant On Atlantic, LLC. (Attorney Tim C Hsu added to party On Atlantic LLC(pty:crd), Attorney Tim C Hsu added to party On Atlantic LLC(pty:crd))(Hsu, Tim)
September 21, 2020 Filing 316 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group, upon Defendant Air Nail Company, Inc. served on 9/11/2020, answer due 10/2/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Mark A. Kania, Secretary, in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Vineyard, Daniel)
September 21, 2020 Filing 315 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group, upon Defendant International Staple & Machine Company served on 9/11/2020, answer due 10/2/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Mark A. Kania, Secretary, in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Vineyard, Daniel)
September 21, 2020 Filing 314 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group, upon Defendant Acme Kustom Fit, Inc. served on 9/11/2020, answer due 10/2/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Mycal Cardenas, Deputy, Secretary of State in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Vineyard, Daniel)
September 18, 2020 Filing 313 STIPULATION to Continue Defendant's CareRNCar, LLC's time to respond to TW Tedesco's First Amended Cross-Claim from September 11, 2020 to October 9, 2020 filed by Defendant CARERNCAR, LLC Carerncar LLC, Carerncar, LLC, Carerncar, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Stipulation to Extend)(Cohen, Albert)
September 17, 2020 Filing 312 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to W.R. Grace & Company. (Vineyard, Daniel)
September 15, 2020 Filing 311 ANSWER to Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,,,,,,, Crossclaim,,,,,,,,,,, #275 filed by Cross-Defendant Reliable Steel Building Products, Inc.((as to Cross-Claim Doc No. 172-1 filed 11/15/2019, Amended Doc No. 275-1 filed 8/26/2020)).(Hogan, Brian)
September 15, 2020 Filing 310 ANSWER to Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,,,,,,, Crossclaim,,,,,,,,,,, #275 filed by Cross-Defendant Jeffrey M. Palmer((as to Cross-Claim Doc No. 172-1 filed 11/15/2019, Amended Doc No. 275-1 filed 8/26/2020)).(Hogan, Brian)
September 15, 2020 Filing 309 ANSWER to Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,,,,,,, Crossclaim,,,,,,,,,,, #275 filed by Cross-Defendant Nikki Reagan((as to Cross-Claim Doc No. 172-1 filed 11/15/2019, Amended Doc No. 275-1 filed 8/26/2020)).(Hogan, Brian)
September 15, 2020 Filing 308 ANSWER to Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,,,,,,, Crossclaim,,,,,,,,,,, #275 filed by Defendant and Cross-Defendant Angeles Chemical Co., Inc.((as to Cross-Claim Doc No. 273 filed 8/25/2020)), Angeles Chemical Co., Inc..(Caufield, Jeffery)
September 15, 2020 Filing 307 ANSWER to Amended Counterclaim, #269 by ELG Metals, Inc. filed by Counter-Defendant Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group.(Vineyard, Daniel)
September 15, 2020 Filing 306 ANSWER to Amended Counterclaim, #264 by Viad Corp filed by Counter-Defendant Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group.(Vineyard, Daniel)
September 15, 2020 Filing 305 ANSWER to Amended Counterclaim, #263 by Henkel Consumer Goods filed by Counter-Defendant Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group.(Vineyard, Daniel)
September 15, 2020 Filing 304 ANSWER to Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,,,,,,, Crossclaim,,,,,,,,,,, #275 filed by Defebndant and Cross-Defendant Joyce Mendell Brody((as to Cross-Claim Doc No. 172-1 filed 11/15/2019)).(Attorney Mark B Gilmartin added to party Joyce Mendell Brody(pty:crd), Attorney Mark B Gilmartin added to party Joyce Mendell Brody(pty:crd))(Gilmartin, Mark)
September 15, 2020 Filing 303 ANSWER to Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,,,,,,, Crossclaim,,,,,,,,,,, #275 filed by Defendant and Cross-Defendant 5211 Southern Avenue, LLC((as to Cross-Claim Doc No. 172-1 filed 11/15/2019, Amended Doc No. 275-1 filed 8/26/2020)).(Gilmartin, Mark)
September 15, 2020 Filing 301 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Shultz Steel Company answer now due 10/9/2020, re Amended Complaint/Petition,,, #258 filed by Defendant Shultz Steel Company.(Attorney Steven J Elie added to party Shultz Steel Company(pty:dft), Attorney Steven J Elie added to party Shultz Steel Company(pty:dft))(Elie, Steven)
September 15, 2020 Filing 300 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Reisner Metals, Inc. answer now due 10/9/2020, re Amended Complaint/Petition,,, #258 filed by Defendant Reisner Metals, Inc..(Attorney Steven J Elie added to party Reisner Metals, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Steven J Elie added to party Reisner Metals, Inc.(pty:dft))(Elie, Steven)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 302 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT SERVED UPON DEFENDANT CARERNCAR, LLC BY NOT MORE THAN 30 DAYS by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Upon Stipulation #298 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the time for Defendant Carerncar, LLC to respond to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint #258 shall be extended to 10/9/2020. (gk)
September 11, 2020 Filing 299 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer as to Amended Complaint/Petition,,, #258 filed by Defendant General Inspection Laboratories.(Attorney Kendra B Lounsberry added to party General Inspection Laboratories(pty:dft), Attorney Kendra B Lounsberry added to party General Inspection Laboratories(pty:dft))(Lounsberry, Kendra)
September 11, 2020 Filing 298 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Carerncar LLC answer now due 10/9/2020, re Amended Complaint/Petition,,, #258 filed by Defendant CARERNCAR, LLC Carerncar LLC; Carerncar, LLC; Carerncar, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Stipulation to Extend)(Attorney Albert Martin Cohen added to party Carerncar LLC(pty:crd), Attorney Albert Martin Cohen added to party Carerncar LLC(pty:crd), Attorney Albert Martin Cohen added to party Carerncar, LLC(pty:crd), Attorney Albert Martin Cohen added to party Carerncar, LLC(pty:crd), Attorney Albert Martin Cohen added to party Carerncar, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Albert Martin Cohen added to party Carerncar, LLC(pty:dft))(Cohen, Albert)
September 9, 2020 Filing 297 JOINT ANSWER OF SASOL (USA) CORPORATION AND SASOL CHEMICALS (USA) LLC TO TW TEDESCO PROPERTIES, L.P.S AMENDED CROSS-CLAIM ANSWER to Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,,,,,,, Crossclaim,,,,,,,,,,, #275 filed by Defendant Sasol (USA) Corporation.(Smith, Gary)
September 8, 2020 Filing 296 ANSWER to Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,,,,,,, Crossclaim,,,,,,,,,,, #275 filed by Defendant Jervis B. Webb Company of California.(Romey, Michael)
September 8, 2020 Filing 295 ANSWER to Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,,,,,,, Crossclaim,,,,,,,,,,, #275 filed by Defendant Jervis B. Webb Company.(Romey, Michael)
September 3, 2020 Filing 294 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group, upon Defendant On Atlantic, LLC served on 9/2/2020, answer due 9/23/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Lauren Cain, Secretary, in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Vineyard, Daniel)
September 1, 2020 Filing 293 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,, #258 filed by Defendant Reliable Steel Building Products, Inc..(Hogan, Brian)
September 1, 2020 Filing 292 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,, #258 filed by Defendant Jeffrey M. Palmer.(Hogan, Brian)
September 1, 2020 Filing 291 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,, #258 filed by Defendant Nikki Reagan.(Hogan, Brian)
September 1, 2020 Filing 290 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group, upon Defendant Metal Management, Inc. served on 8/19/2020, answer due 9/9/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Corporation Service Company, Registered Agent, in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Vineyard, Daniel)
August 28, 2020 Filing 289 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group, upon Defendant W.R. Grace & Company served on 8/19/2020, answer due 9/9/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Corporation Service Company, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Vineyard, Daniel)
August 28, 2020 Filing 288 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group, upon Defendant Carerncar, LLC served on 8/21/2020, answer due 9/11/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Vicky Herrera, Operations Manager, in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Vineyard, Daniel)
August 28, 2020 Filing 287 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group, upon Defendant General Inspection Laboratories served on 8/19/2020, answer due 9/9/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Corporation Service Company, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Vineyard, Daniel)
August 28, 2020 Filing 286 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group, upon Defendant Armstrong World Industries, Inc. served on 8/19/2020, answer due 9/9/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Corporation Service Company, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Vineyard, Daniel)
August 28, 2020 Filing 285 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group, upon Defendant Reisner Metals, Inc. served on 8/19/2020, answer due 9/9/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Vineyard, Daniel)
August 28, 2020 Filing 284 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group, upon Defendant Air Nail Company, Inc. served on 8/19/2020, answer due 9/9/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Vineyard, Daniel)
August 28, 2020 Filing 283 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group, upon Defendant Shultz Steel Company served on 8/19/2020, answer due 9/9/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Vineyard, Daniel)
August 28, 2020 Filing 282 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group, upon Defendant International Staple & Machine Company served on 8/19/2020, answer due 9/9/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Vineyard, Daniel)
August 28, 2020 Filing 281 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group, upon Defendant Acme Kustom Fit, Inc. served on 8/19/2020, answer due 9/9/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Ronald D. Belk, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Vineyard, Daniel)
August 28, 2020 Filing 280 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group, upon Defendant Timothy J. Owens & Associates, Inc. served on 8/19/2020, answer due 9/9/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Terri Yin, Paracorp, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Vineyard, Daniel)
August 27, 2020 Filing 279 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Joseph K Lee counsel for Defendant American Polymers Corporation, Cross Defendant American Polymers Corporation. Joseph K. Lee will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Cross-Defendant AMERICAN POLYMERS CORPORATION. (Attorney Joseph K Lee added to party American Polymers Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph K Lee added to party American Polymers Corporation(pty:dft))(Lee, Joseph)
August 27, 2020 Filing 278 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Brian M Wheeler counsel for Defendant American Polymers Corporation, Cross Defendant American Polymers Corporation. Brian M. Wheeler will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Cross-Defendant AMERICAN POLYMERS CORPORATION. (Wheeler, Brian)
August 27, 2020 Filing 277 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,, #258 filed by Defendant Joyce Mendell Brody.(Gilmartin, Mark)
August 27, 2020 Filing 276 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,, #258 filed by Defendant 5211 Southern Avenue, LLC.(Gilmartin, Mark)
August 26, 2020 Filing 275 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,, #258 , Amended CROSSCLAIM against 5211 Southern Avenue, LLC((as to Cross-Claim Doc No. 172-1 filed 11/15/2019)), AFC Cable Systems, Inc.((as to Cross-Claim Doc No. 172-1 filed 11/15/2019)), Acme Kustom Fit, Inc.((as to Cross-Claim Doc No. 172-1 filed 11/15/2019)), Air Nail Company, Inc., Angeles Chemical Co., Inc.((as to Cross-Claim Doc No. 172-1 filed 11/15/2019)), Armstrong World Industries, Inc., B. Stephen Cooperage, Inc.((as to Cross-Claim Doc No. 172-1 filed 11/15/2019)), Beatrice Companies, Inc.((as to Cross-Claim Doc No. 172-1 filed 11/15/2019)), Bristol Industries, Inc.((as to Cross-Claim Doc No. 172-1 filed 11/15/2019)), Joyce Mendell Brody((as to Cross-Claim Doc No. 172-1 filed 11/15/2019)), Shirley R. Bruck((as to Cross-Claim Doc No. 172-1 filed 11/15/2019)), William W. Bruck((as to Cross-Claim Doc No. 172-1 filed 11/15/2019)), Carerncar, LLC, Jeannette M. Compas((as to Cross-Claim Doc No. 172-1 filed 11/15/2019)), Conagra Brands, Inc.((as to Cross-Claim Doc No. 172-1 filed 11/15/2019)), Far-Best Corporation((as to Cross-Claim Doc No. 172-1 filed 11/15/2019)), Louise C. Gatfield((as to Cross-Claim Doc No. 172-1 filed 11/15/2019)), Walter Gatfield((as to Cross-Claim Doc No. 172-1 filed 11/15/2019)), General Inspection Laboratories, International Fastener Research Corp.((as to Cross-Claim Doc No. 172-1 filed 11/15/2019)), International Staple & Machine Company, Ellen Gay Jacobs((as to Cross-Claim Doc No. 172-1 filed 11/15/2019)), Jervis B. Webb Company((as to Cross-Claim Doc No. 172-1 filed 11/15/2019)), Jervis B. Webb Company of California((as to Cross-Claim Doc No. 172-1 filed 11/15/2019)), Lux International Corporation((as to Cross-Claim Doc No. 172-1 filed 11/15/2019)), M.O. Dion and Sons, Inc.((as to Cross-Claim Doc No. 172-1 filed 11/15/2019)), Mike Palm Club, LLC((as to Cross-Claim Doc No. 172-1 filed 11/15/2019)), Jorge Molina, Maria A. Molina((as to Cross-Claim Doc No. 172-1 filed 11/15/2019)), Nortek, Inc.((as to Cross-Claim Doc No. 172-1 filed 11/15/2019)), On Atlantic, LLC, Jeffrey M. Palmer((as to Cross-Claim Doc No. 172-1 filed 11/15/2019)), Pemaco, Inc.((as to Cross-Claim Doc No. 172-1 filed 11/15/2019)), Jose Ramirez((as to Cross-Claim Doc No. 172-1 filed 11/15/2019)), Nikki Reagan((as to Cross-Claim Doc No. 172-1 filed 11/15/2019)), Reisner Metals, Inc., Reliable Steel Building Products, Inc.((as to Cross-Claim Doc No. 172-1 filed 11/15/2019)), SASOL CHEMICALS (USA) LLC, Sasol (USA) Corporation((as to Cross-Claim Doc No. 172-1 filed 11/15/2019)), Sasol Wax Americas, Inc.((as to Cross-Claim Doc No. 172-1 filed 11/15/2019)), Shultz Steel Company, Timothy J. Owens & Associates, Inc., W.R. Grace & Company, Zoes(1 through 10 (as to Cross-Claim Doc No. 172-1 filed 11/15/2019)) filed by Defendant TW Tedesco Properties, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 First Amended Cross-Claim)(Hamrick, Alpheus)
August 26, 2020 Filing 274 Notice of Withdrawal of Crossclaim,,, #273 , Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #272 filed by Defendant TW Tedesco Properties, L.P.. (Hamrick, Alpheus)
August 25, 2020 (DUPLICATE ENTRY) AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM against Counterdefendant Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group; amending Amended Counterclaim #122 ; with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant ELG Metals, Inc. (including in its capacity as successor-by-merger to ELG Metals West Coast Inc.). (Answer to Second Amended Complaint and Counterclaim filed as one document, see document number 269). (gk)
August 25, 2020 (DUPLICATE ENTRY) [AMENDED] COUNTERCLAIMS against Counterdefendant Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group; amending Counterclaims #131 ; with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant Henkel Consumer Goods, Inc. as successor by merger to The Dial Corporation. (Answer to Second Amended Complaint and Counterclaims filed as one document, see document number 263). (gk)
August 25, 2020 (DUPLICATE ENTRY) [AMENDED] COUNTERCLAIMS against Counterdefendant Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group; amending Counterclaims #132 ; with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant Viad Corp. (Answer to Second Amended Complaint and Counterclaims filed as one document, see document number 264). (gk)
August 25, 2020 Filing 273 CROSSCLAIM against Defendant 5211 Southern Avenue, LLC, AFC Cable Systems, Inc., Acme Kustom Fit, Inc., Angeles Chemical Co., Inc., B. Stephen Cooperage, Inc., Beatrice Companies, Inc., Bristol Industries, Inc., Joyce Mendell Brody, Shirley R. Bruck, William W. Bruck, Jeannette M. Compas, Stephen A. Compas, Conagra Brands, Inc., Far-Best Corporation, Louise C. Gatfield, Walter Gatfield, International Fastener Research Corp., Ellen Gay Jacobs, Jervis B. Webb Company, Jervis B. Webb Company of California, Lux International Corporation, M.O. Dion and Sons, Inc., Metal Management, Inc., Mike Palm Club, LLC, Maria A. Molina, Nortek, Inc., Jeffrey M. Palmer, Pemaco, Inc., Jose Ramirez, Nikki Reagan, Reliable Steel Building Products, Inc., Sasol (USA) Corporation, Sasol Wax Americas, Inc., Sasol Wax North America Corporation, Zoes; Tedesco, filed by Defendant TW Tedesco Properties, L.P., TW Tedesco Properties, L.P., TW Tedesco Properties, L.P..(Hamrick, Alpheus)
August 25, 2020 Filing 272 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant TW Tedesco Properties, L.P., TW Tedesco Properties, L.P., TW Tedesco Properties, L.P., TW Tedesco Properties, L.P..(Hamrick, Alpheus)
August 25, 2020 Filing 271 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,, #258 TO COOPER DRUM COOPERATING PARTIES GROUPS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Defendant SASOL CHEMICALS (USA) LLC.(Smith, Gary)
August 25, 2020 Filing 270 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,, #258 filed by Defendant Crown Beverage Packaging, LLC.(Hoch, Steven)
August 25, 2020 Filing 269 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,, #258 Second Amended Complaint, Amended Counterclaim and Demand for Jury Trial filed by Defendant ELG Metals, Inc..(Goldberg, Steven)
August 25, 2020 Filing 268 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,, #258 Answer to Second Amended Complaint filed by Defendants Best Tape, Inc. and Traxx Corporation.(Spitser, Andrew)
August 25, 2020 Filing 267 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,, #258 filed by Defendant Angeles Chemical Co., Inc..(Caufield, Jeffery)
August 25, 2020 Filing 266 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,, #258 filed by Defendant Jervis B. Webb Company of California.(Romey, Michael)
August 25, 2020 Filing 265 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,, #258 filed by Defendant Jervis B. Webb Company.(Romey, Michael)
August 25, 2020 Filing 264 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,, #258 and counterclaims filed by Defendant Viad Corporation, Viad Corporation.(Parseghian, Berj)
August 25, 2020 Filing 263 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,, #258 and counterclaims filed by Defendant Henkel Consumer Goods, Inc., Henkel Consumer Goods, Inc..(Parseghian, Berj)
August 24, 2020 Filing 262 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,, #258 filed by Defendant Rohm and Haas Company.(Ciccone, Karen)
August 19, 2020 Filing 261 NOTICE of Settling Defendant Dismissal With Prejudice filed by Defendant B. Stephen Cooperage, Inc.. (Lounsberry, Kendra)
August 13, 2020 Filing 260 21-Day Summons Issued re Second Amended Complaint #258 as to Defendants Air Nail Company, Inc., Reisner Metals, Inc., Shultz Steel Company, International Staple & Machine Company, W.R. Grace & Company, Carerncar, LLC, Armstrong World Industries, Inc., General Inspection Laboratories n/k/a GENIL, Inc., On Atlantic, LLC, Timothy J. Owens & Associates, Inc., Acme Kustom Fit, Inc., Metal Management, Inc. (gk)
August 12, 2020 Filing 259 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition,,, #258 filed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group. (Vineyard, Daniel)
August 11, 2020 Filing 258 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants 5211 Southern Avenue, LLC, Acme Kustom Fit, Inc., Angeles Chemical Co., Inc., Best Tape, Inc., Joyce Mendell Brody, Crown Beverage Packaging, LLC, ELG Metals, Inc., Henkel Consumer Goods, Inc., Jervis B. Webb Company, Jervis B. Webb Company of California, M.O. Dion and Sons, Inc., Metal Management, Inc., Mike Palm Club, LLC, Jeffrey M. Palmer, Pemaco, Inc., Nikki Reagan, Reliable Steel Building Products, Inc., Rohm and Haas Company, TW Tedesco Properties, L.P., Traxx Corporation, Viad Corporation, SASOL CHEMICALS (USA) LLC, Air Nail Company, Inc., Reisner Metals, Inc., Shultz Steel Company, International Staple & Machine Company, W.R. Grace & Company, Carerncar, LLC, Armstrong World Industries, Inc., General Inspection Laboratories, On Atlantic, LLC, Timothy J. Owens & Associates, Inc. amending Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,, #93 , filed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Vineyard, Daniel)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 257 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order GRANTING Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The Court GRANTS Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group's Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint ("SAC") #254 . The Court ORDERS that Plaintiff re-file its SAC, which adds and removes certain parties as defendants in this case, as a separate docket entry within three days of the issuance of this Order. Court Reporter: N/A. (gk)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 256 *NOTE: CHANGES MADE BY THE COURT* AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (see document for details.) (es)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 255 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Protective Order and Taking Hearing Off Calendar by Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth: The protective order will issue separately. The hearing set for August 6, 2020, is ORDERED off calendar. (see document for details.) (es)
July 10, 2020 Filing 254 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file Second Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group. Motion set for hearing on 8/14/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order) (Vineyard, Daniel)
July 7, 2020 Filing 253 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Protective Order for Disclosure of Confidential Information filed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group. Motion set for hearing on 8/6/2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Vineyard, Daniel)
July 6, 2020 Filing 252 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF CASE due to Unavailability of Judicial Officer filed. The previously assigned Magistrate Judge is no longer available. Pursuant to directive of the Chief Magistrate Judge and in accordance with the rules of this Court, the case has been returned to the Clerk for reassignment. This case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth for any discovery and/or post-judgment matters that may be referred. Case number will now read as 2:19-cv-03007 AB(JPRx). (rn)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 251 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order GRANTING Defendant and Cross-Defendant American Polymers's Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement and Order Barring Claims by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The Court GRANTS American Polymers's Motion for the Determination of Good Faith Settlement and Order Barring Claims #232 . the Court ORDERS that: The Settlement Agreement between and among American Polymers and Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group is approved as a good faith settlement. All pending cross-claims against American Polymers shall be dismissed with prejudice. Any claims or cross-claims for indemnity, contribution, or cost recovery against American Polymers by any non-settling party regarding matters addressed in the Settlement Agreement are barred. See document for further details. Court Reporter: N/A. (gk)
May 12, 2020 Filing 250 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 5/1/20, 9:04 A.M re Transcript #249 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Jui, Chia) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 12, 2020 Filing 249 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 5/1/20, 9:04 A.M. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Chia Mei Jui, CSR, cmjui.csr@gmail.com, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through COURT REPORTER: Chia Mei Jui, CSR, cmjui.csr@gmail.com or PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 6/2/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/12/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/10/2020. (Jui, Chia)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Granting Request for Approval of Substitution of Attorney Andrew C. Spitser for Defendant Traxx Corporation in place of Attorneys Matthew Clark Bures and Christopher T. Johnson #246 . (gk)
May 5, 2020 Filing 247 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Miscellaneous Document #246 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Applications/Ex Parte Applications/Motions/Petitions/Requests > Substitute Attorney (G-01). The filer used the event, Miscellaneous Document, for docketing this filing. For this one-time only, clerk shall convert the docketing event. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
May 4, 2020 Filing 246 Request for Approval of Substitution or Withdrawal of Counsel filed by Defendant Best Tape, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Request or Approval of Substitution or Withdrawal of Attorney)(Spitser, Andrew) Modified on 5/5/2020 (gk).
May 1, 2020 Filing 245 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendants Jervis B. Webb Company, Jervis B. Webb Company of California for Court Reporter. Court will contact Shirin Behrooz at shirin.behrooz@lw.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Romey, Michael)
May 1, 2020 Filing 244 MINUTES OF MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT AND ORDER BARRING CLAIMS #232 (Telephonic) Hearing held before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. The Court having carefully considered the papers and the evidence submitted by the parties, and having heard the oral argument of counsel, hereby takes the motion under submission. Court Reporter: Chia Mei Jui. (lom)
April 29, 2020 Filing 243 OBJECTION TO DECLARATION OF ASHISH DHULDHOYA re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Determination Of Good Faith Settlement And Order Barring Claims (Notice Of Motion And Motion For Determination Of Good Faith Settlement And Order Barring Claims; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities) #232 filed by ThirdParty Plaintiff TW Tedesco Properties, L.P.. (Hamrick, Alpheus)
April 29, 2020 Filing 242 Objection TO DECLARATION OF BRIAN M. WHEELER re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Determination Of Good Faith Settlement And Order Barring Claims (Notice Of Motion And Motion For Determination Of Good Faith Settlement And Order Barring Claims; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities) #232 filed by ThirdParty Plaintiff TW Tedesco Properties, L.P.. (Hamrick, Alpheus)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 241 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER ADVANCING HEARING TIME RE MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT AND ORDER BARRING CLAIMS #232 by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. This Court, on its own motion, hereby advances the hearing time regarding this motion from 10:00 a.m. to 9:00 a.m. on May 1, 2020 before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. The hearing will remain telephonic. IT IS SO ORDERED.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cb) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 24, 2020 Filing 240 SUPPLEMENT to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Determination Of Good Faith Settlement And Order Barring Claims (Notice Of Motion And Motion For Determination Of Good Faith Settlement And Order Barring Claims; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities) #232 American Polymers Corporations Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement and Order Barring Claims filed by Cross Defendant American Polymers Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Declaration of Brian M. Wheeler in Support of Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement and Order Barring Claims, #2 Declaration of Ashish Dhuldhoya in Support of Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement and Order Barring Claims)(Wheeler, Brian)
April 24, 2020 Filing 239 DECLARATION of Chevazz G. Brown in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Determination Of Good Faith Settlement And Order Barring Claims (Notice Of Motion And Motion For Determination Of Good Faith Settlement And Order Barring Claims; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities) #232 filed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group. (Vineyard, Daniel)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 238 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order Regarding 5/1/2020 Hearing on Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement and Order Barring Claims by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The evidence before the Court is insufficient for it to make a determination of a good faith settlement at this time. The Court ORDERS Defendant and Cross-Defendant American Polymers Corporation to provide additional evidence to the Court regarding an approximation of Cooper Drum's total recovery and American Polymers' proportionate liability in connection with its Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement and Order Barring Claims #232 on or before 4/24/2020, and converts the hearing regarding this Motion for 5/1/2020 at 10:00 AM to a telephonic hearing. See document for further details. Court Reporter: N/A. (gk)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 237 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER CONTINUING MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT AND ORDER BARRING CLAIMS #232 by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. This Court, on its own motion, hereby continues the hearing date regarding this motion from April 10, 2020 to May 1, 2020, at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. IT IS SO ORDERED.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cb) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 3, 2020 Filing 236 SASOL (USA) CORPORATIONS ANSWER TO TW TEDESCO PROPERTIES, L.P.'S CROSS-CLAIM ANSWER to Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,, Crossclaim,,,,,, Counterclaim,,,,, #172 filed by Defendant Sasol (USA) Corporation.(Smith, Gary)
March 27, 2020 Filing 235 REPLY in support of a motion NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Determination Of Good Faith Settlement And Order Barring Claims (Notice Of Motion And Motion For Determination Of Good Faith Settlement And Order Barring Claims; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities) #232 filed by Cross Defendant American Polymers Corporation. (Wheeler, Brian)
March 20, 2020 Filing 234 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Determination Of Good Faith Settlement And Order Barring Claims (Notice Of Motion And Motion For Determination Of Good Faith Settlement And Order Barring Claims; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities) #232 filed by Defendants Henkel Consumer Goods, Inc., Viad Corporation, Counter Claimants Henkel Consumer Goods, Inc., Viad Corporation. (Parseghian, Berj)
March 20, 2020 Filing 233 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Determination Of Good Faith Settlement And Order Barring Claims (Notice Of Motion And Motion For Determination Of Good Faith Settlement And Order Barring Claims; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities) #232 filed by ThirdParty Plaintiff TW Tedesco Properties, L.P., Defendant TW Tedesco Properties, L.P., Counter Claimant TW Tedesco Properties, L.P., Cross Claimant TW Tedesco Properties, L.P.. (Hamrick, Alpheus)
March 13, 2020 Filing 232 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Determination Of Good Faith Settlement And Order Barring Claims (Notice Of Motion And Motion For Determination Of Good Faith Settlement And Order Barring Claims; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities) filed by Cross-Defendant American Polymers Corporation. Motion set for hearing on 4/10/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brian M. Wheeler in Support of Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement and Order Barring Claims, #2 Declaration of Chevazz G. Brown in Support of Good-Faith Determination, #3 Proposed Order) (Wheeler, Brian)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 231 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr: The Court hereby STRIKES Dkt. No. 28, Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application to Extend the Time for Service Under Rule 4(m), as MOOT, given that Plaintiff's proofs of service have been filed in this case. IT IS SO ORDERED. (cb)
January 31, 2020 Filing 230 Cross-Defendant American Polymers Corporations Answer To Crossclaim; Affirmative Defenses ANSWER to Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,, Crossclaim,,,,,, Counterclaim,,,,, #172 filed by Cross-Defendant American Polymers Corporation.(Wheeler, Brian)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT BEATRICE COMPANIES, INC. c/o CONAGRA BRANDS, INC. PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41(a)(2)by Judge Andre Birotte Jr, #228 , Beatrice Companies, Inc. terminated. (yl)
January 28, 2020 Filing 228 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendants Beatrice Companies, Inc., Conagra Brands, Inc. filed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Vineyard, Daniel)
January 20, 2020 Filing 227 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Third-Party Plaintiff TW Tedesco Properties, L.P. pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Best Tape, Inc., Crown Beverage Packaging, LLC, ELG Metals West Coast, Inc., ELG Metals, Inc., Henkel Consumer Goods, Inc., Purex Corporation, Rohm and Haas Company, The Dial Corporation, Traxx Corporation, Viad Corporation. (Hamrick, Alpheus)
January 7, 2020 Filing 226 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,, #93 filed by Defendant M.O. Dion and Sons, Inc..(Attorney David F Wood added to party M.O. Dion and Sons, Inc.(pty:dft))(Wood, David)
January 6, 2020 Filing 225 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Brian C Merges counsel for Counter Defendants Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group, Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group, Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group, Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group, Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group, Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group, Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group, Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group, Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group. Adding Brian C. Merges as counsel of record for Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff and Counter Defendant Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties. (Attorney Brian C Merges added to party Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group(pty:cd), Attorney Brian C Merges added to party Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group(pty:cd), Attorney Brian C Merges added to party Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group(pty:cd), Attorney Brian C Merges added to party Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group(pty:cd), Attorney Brian C Merges added to party Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group(pty:cd), Attorney Brian C Merges added to party Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group(pty:cd), Attorney Brian C Merges added to party Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group(pty:cd), Attorney Brian C Merges added to party Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group(pty:cd), Attorney Brian C Merges added to party Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group(pty:pla))(Merges, Brian)
January 6, 2020 Filing 224 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by SUCCESOR IN INTEREST TO DEFENDANTS LUX INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION AND SASOL WAX NORTH AMERICA CORPORATION SASOL CHEMICALS (USA) LLC, (Smith, Gary)
January 6, 2020 Filing 223 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,, #93 filed by SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO DEFENDANTS LUX INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION AND SASOL WAX NORTH AMERICA CORPORATION SASOL CHEMICALS (USA) LLC.(Attorney Gary J Smith added to party SASOL CHEMICALS (USA) LLC(pty:bkmov))(Smith, Gary)
December 30, 2019 Filing 222 RESPONSE filed by Counter Defendant Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Groupto Answer to Complaint #219 re Counterclaim by Joyce Mendell Brody (Vineyard, Daniel)
December 30, 2019 Filing 221 Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group's ANSWER to Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), Counterclaim #220 of 5211 Southern Avenue LLC filed by Counter-Defendant Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group.(Vineyard, Daniel)
December 11, 2019 Filing 220 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,, #93 , First COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs filed by Defendant 5211 Southern Avenue, LLC.(Attorney Mark B Gilmartin added to party 5211 Southern Avenue, LLC(pty:dft))(Gilmartin, Mark)
December 11, 2019 Filing 219 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,, #93 and Counterclaim filed by Defendant Joyce Mendell Brody.(Attorney Mark B Gilmartin added to party Joyce Mendell Brody(pty:dft))(Gilmartin, Mark)
December 11, 2019 Filing 218 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group, upon Defendant Lux International Corporation served on 12/9/2019, answer due 12/30/2019; Sasol Wax North America Corporation served on 12/9/2019, answer due 12/30/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System, Registered Agent, in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Vineyard, Daniel)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR CROSS-DEFENDANT AMERICAN POLYMERS CORPORATION TO RESPOND TO TW TEDESCO PROPERTIES, L.P.'S CROSS-CLAIM by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Upon Stipulation #209 , the time for Cross-Defendant American Polymers Corporation to respond to TW Tedesco Properties, L.P.'s Cross-Claim #172 -1 is extended to and including 1/31/2020. (gk)
December 10, 2019 Filing 216 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR Re: Order Extending Time for Certain Cross-Defendants to Respond to TW Tedesco Properties, L.P.'s Cross-Claim filed 12/19/2019 #215 . Due to clerical error, the docket entry was linked to the wrong Stipulation, document number 209, and should have been linked to document number 204. The cross-defendants to whom the extension was granted are Crown Beverage Packaging, LLC, Henkel Consumer Goods, Inc. as successor by merger to The Dial Corporation, Viad Corp (incorrectly named as Purex Corporation), ELG Metals, Inc. and ELG Metals West Coast, Inc., Rohm and Haas Company, Traxx Corporation, and Best Tape, Inc. (gk)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR CERTAIN CROSS-DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO TW TEDESCO PROPERTIES, L.P.'S CROSS-CLAIM by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Upon Stipulation #209 , the time for Cross-Defendant American Polymers Corporation to respond to TW Tedesco Properties, L.P.'s Cross-Claim #172 -1 is extended to and including 1/15/2020. (gk)
December 9, 2019 Filing 214 ANSWER to Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,, Crossclaim,,,,,, Counterclaim,,,,, #172 filed by Defendant Angeles Chemical Co., Inc..(Tropea, Santino)
December 6, 2019 Filing 213 ANSWER to Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,, Crossclaim,,,,,, Counterclaim,,,,, #172 filed by Defendant Jervis B. Webb Company.(Romey, Michael)
December 6, 2019 Filing 212 ANSWER to Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,, Crossclaim,,,,,, Counterclaim,,,,, #172 filed by Defendant Jervis B. Webb Company of California.(Romey, Michael)
December 6, 2019 Filing 211 INITIAL DISCLOSURE of PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 26(a)(1)(A) filed by ThirdParty Plaintiff TW Tedesco Properties, L.P., Defendant TW Tedesco Properties, L.P., Counter Claimant TW Tedesco Properties, L.P., Cross Claimant TW Tedesco Properties, L.P. (Evans, David)
December 6, 2019 Filing 209 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response filed by Cross-Defendant American Polymers Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Extending Time for Cross-Defendant American Polymers Corporation to Respond to TW Tedesco Properties, L.P.'s Cross-Claim)(Wheeler, Brian)
December 6, 2019 Filing 208 INITIAL DISCLOSURE of Pursuant to Federal Rule 26(a)(1)(A) filed by Defendant Crown Beverage Packaging, LLC (Hoch, Steven)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 4/1/2022. (cb)
December 6, 2019 Filing 206 INITIAL DISCLOSURE PURSUANT TO FRCP 26 filed by Defendant Best Tape, Inc. (Spitser, Andrew)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER RE JURY/COURT TRIAL: I. SCHEDULE; II. TRIAL PREPARATION; III. CONDUCT OF ATTORNEYS AND PARTIES by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Jury Trial set for 7/5/2022 08:30 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Final Pretrial Conference and Hearing on Motions In Limine set for 6/10/2022 11:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Last Date to Hear Motion to Amend Pleadings/Add Parties 7/10/2020. Non-Expert Discovery cut-off 3/19/2021. Last Date to Hear Motions 3/4/2022. Deadline to Complete Settlement Conference 4/1/2022. Trial Filings (first round): Motions In Limine, Memoranda of Contentions of Fact and Law, Witness Lists, Joint Exhibit List, Joint Status Report Regarding Settlement due by 4/15/2022. Trial Filings (second round): Oppositions to Motions In Limine, Joint Proposed Final Pretrial Conference Order due by 5/13/2022. See document for further details. (gk)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 205 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The Court has reviewed the Joint Rule 26(f) Report submitted by the parties, and determines that an in-person Scheduling Conference is unnecessary. Accordingly, the Court VACATES the 12/13/2019 Scheduling Conference. Order re Jury/Court Trial to issue. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jre) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 5, 2019 Filing 204 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 01/15/2020 re Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,, Crossclaim,,,,,, Counterclaim,,,,, #172 filed by Cross-Complainant TW Tedesco Properties, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hamrick, Alpheus)
December 5, 2019 Filing 203 Initial DISCLOSURE Under Rule 26(a) filed by Defendant Mike Palm Club, LLC (Shapero, Steven)
December 5, 2019 Filing 201 Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group's ANSWER to Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,, Crossclaim,,,,,, Counterclaim,,,,, #172 of TW Tedesco Properties, L.P. filed by Counter-Defendant Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group((as to Counterclaim Doc No. 172-2 filed 11/15/2019)).(Vineyard, Daniel)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney David L. Isabel to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Crown Beverage Packaging, LLC, designating Steven L. Hoch as local counsel #195 , #196 . (gk)
December 4, 2019 Filing 200 21-Day Summons Issued re Third Party Complaint #173 as to Third Party Defendants Advanced Grinding aka SGT Advanced Grinding Co., All State Welding Alloy, Alloy Precision Grinding Co., Technical Trade Institute, G & N Product Development, Gregg's Honda Service, Fantastic Plating aka Fantastic Custom Chrome aka Fantastic Customer Chrome Plating, Jet Custom Chrome, Mondo Chrome aka Mondo Custom Chrome aka Mondo's Show Chrime aka Mando's Custom Chrome, International Torque aka Torques International. (gk)
December 3, 2019 Filing 199 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney David L. Isabel to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Crown Beverage Packaging, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 12/2/2019, Receipt No. 0973-24872606) APPLICATION for Order for Proposed Order on Application of Non Resident Attorney to Appear Pro Hac Vice #196 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect document attached to the docket entry. (lt)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Chevazz G. Brown to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group, designating Richard W. Vanis, Jr. as local counsel #190 , #193 . (gk)
December 2, 2019 Filing 197 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Third Party Complaint,, #173 filed by Third Party Plaintiff TW Tedesco Properties, L.P.. (Hamrick, Alpheus)
December 2, 2019 Filing 196 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney David L. Isabel to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Crown Beverage Packaging, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 12/2/2019, Receipt No. 0973-24872606), APPLICATION for Order for Proposed Order on Application of Non Resident Attorney to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Defendant Crown Beverage Packaging, LLC. (Hoch, Steven)
December 2, 2019 Filing 195 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney David L. Isabel to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Crown Beverage Packaging, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24872606) filed by Defendant Crown Beverage Packaging, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing Supreme Court of New Jersey, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing District of New Jersey) (Hoch, Steven)
December 2, 2019 Filing 193 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Chevazz G. Brown to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 11/21/2019, Receipt No. 26LM0MQH) filed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Vanis, Richard)
November 29, 2019 Filing 192 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 21, filed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Attachment B, #3 Attachment C, #4 Attachment D, #5 Attachment E, #6 Attachment F)(Vineyard, Daniel)
November 27, 2019 Filing 191 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Chevazz G. Brown to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 11/21/2019, Receipt No. 26LM0MQH) #190 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event is Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Other error(s) with document(s): Document is an Application, not an EX PARTE. (lt)
November 27, 2019 Filing 190 EX PARTE APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Chevazz G. Brown to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 11/21/2019, Receipt No. 26LM0MQH) filed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Vanis, Richard)
November 26, 2019 Filing 188 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Carolyn L. Campion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 11/21/2019, Receipt No. 26LM03C8) filed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Vanis, Richard)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER RE: STIPULATiN FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Upon Stipulation #159 , the Court hereby orders that the last day on which Defendants 5211 Southern Avenue, LLC and Joyce Mendell Brody may file a response to the First Amended Complaint #93 is 12/11/2019. (gk)
November 25, 2019 Filing 187 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Clerk RE: Pro Hac Vice Applications filed 11/21/2019 #180 , #181 . The document is stricken. (gk)
November 25, 2019 Filing 186 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Third Party Complaint #173 . The following error(s) was found: The time to answer for federal governmental agencies is 60 days. All other parties must receive 21 days. This form indicates 20 days to file a response. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (gk)
November 25, 2019 Filing 185 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Carolyn L. Campion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24826601) #180 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Chevazz G. Brown to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24827145) #181 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(a) Application not complete: state and/or federal courts to which the applicant has been admitted are not listed. Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Other error(s) with document(s): Please note that electronic, image or stamp signatures are not allowed. (lt)
November 22, 2019 Filing 183 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant Crown Beverage Packaging, LLC. correcting APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Eric E. Tomaszewski to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Crown Beverage Packaging, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24812601) #178 (Attachments: #1 Signed Application Application of Non Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice)(Hoch, Steven)
November 22, 2019 Filing 182 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 12/11/2019 re Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,, #93 filed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Vineyard, Daniel)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Eric E. Tomaszewski to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Crown Beverage Packaging, LLC, designating Steven L. Hoch as local counsel #178 . (gk)
November 21, 2019 Filing 181 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Chevazz G. Brown to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24827145) filed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Vanis, Richard)
November 21, 2019 Filing 180 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Carolyn L. Campion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24826601) filed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Richard W Vanis, Jr added to party Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group(pty:pla)) (Vanis, Richard)
November 20, 2019 Filing 179 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney John C Heintz counsel for Cross Defendant Jervis B. Webb Company of California, Defendant Jervis B. Webb Company of California. Adding John C. Heintz as counsel of record for Jervis B. Webb Company of California for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant and Cross-Defendant Jervis B. Webb Company of California. (Attorney John C Heintz added to party Jervis B. Webb Company of California(pty:crd), Attorney John C Heintz added to party Jervis B. Webb Company of California(pty:dft))(Heintz, John)
November 19, 2019 Filing 178 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Eric E. Tomaszewski to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Crown Beverage Packaging, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24812601) filed by Defendant Crown Beverage Packaging, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - District of New Jersey, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - Supreme Court New Jersey) (Hoch, Steven)
November 19, 2019 Filing 177 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Third Party Complaint,, #173 filed by Third Party Plaintiff TW Tedesco Properties, L.P.. (Hamrick, Alpheus)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT AMERICAN POLYMERS CORPORATION PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41(a)(2) by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Upon Joint Stipulation #169 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2), the claims and causes of action by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group against Defendant American Polymers Corporation doing business as Polycoat Products in the action, including the Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, are dismissed with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs. (gk)
November 18, 2019 Filing 175 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Third Party Complaint #173 . The following error(s) was found: Form AO-440 was used for a Summons on Third Party Complaint. Please resubmit the Summons Request on Form AO-441. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (gk)
November 15, 2019 Filing 174 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Third Party Complaint,, #173 filed by Third Party Plaintiff Advanced Grinding aka SGT Advanced Grinding Co, All State Welding Alloy, Alloy Precision Grinding Co, FANTASTIC PLATING aka FANTASTIC CUSTOM CHROME aka FANTASTIC CUSTOMER CHROME PLATING, G&N PRODUCT DEVELOPMENT, GREGGS HONDA SERVICE, INTERNATIONAL TORQUE aka TORQUES INTERNATIONAL, JET CUSTOM CHROME, MONDO CHROME aka MONDO CUSTOM CHROME aka MONDOS SHOW CHRIME aka MANDOS CUSTOM CHROME, Technical Trade Institute. (Hamrick, Alpheus)
November 15, 2019 Filing 173 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Third Party Defendant Advanced Grinding aka SGT Advanced Grinding Co, All State Welding Alloy, Alloy Precision Grinding Co, Technical Trade Institute, G&N PRODUCT DEVELOPMENT, GREGGS HONDA SERVICE, FANTASTIC PLATING aka FANTASTIC CUSTOM CHROME aka FANTASTIC CUSTOMER CHROME PLATING, JET CUSTOM CHROME, MONDO CHROME aka MONDO CUSTOM CHROME aka MONDOS SHOW CHRIME aka MANDOS CUSTOM CHROME, INTERNATIONAL TORQUE aka TORQUES INTERNATIONAL ; Jury Demand, filed by Defendant, Counter-Claimant, Cross-Claimant and Third Party Plaintiff- TW Tedesco Properties, L.P..(Hamrick, Alpheus)
November 15, 2019 Filing 172 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,, #93 , CROSSCLAIM against Rohm and Haas Company, Purex Corporation, Sasol Wax North America Corporation, Beatrice Companies, Inc., Crown Beverage Packaging, LLC, Nortek, Inc., Pemaco, Inc., Jeffrey M. Palmer, Joyce Mendell Brody, The Dial Corporation, Bristol Industries, Inc., Jose Ramirez, Sasol Wax Americas, Inc., Far Best Corporation, Jervis B. Webb Company, Best Tape, Inc., AFC Cable Systems, Inc., ELG Metals West Coast, Inc., Viad Corporation, Lux International Corporation, Reliable Steel Building Products, Inc., 5211 Southern Avenue, LLC, American Polymers Corporation, Reliable Steel Building Products, Inc., Maria A. Molina, Metal Management, Inc., Acme Kustom Fit, Inc., ELG Metals, Inc., International Fastener Research Corp., Henkel Consumer Goods, Inc., Sasol (USA) Corporation, Jeannette M. Compas, Walter Gatfield, Conagra Brands, Inc., Jorge Molina, M.O. Dion and Sons, Inc., Ellen Gay Jacobs, Louise C. Gatfield, Mike Palm Club, LLC, Jervis B. Webb Company of California, Angeles Chemical Co., Inc., B. Stephen Cooperage, Inc., William W. Bruck, Nikki Reagan, Stephen A. Compas, Traxx Corporation, Doe Corporations, Shirley R. Bruck, COUNTERCLAIM against Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group filed by Defendant TW Tedesco Properties, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Cross Claim, #2 Counter Claim)(Attorney Alpheus Raymond Hamrick, III added to party TW Tedesco Properties, L.P.(pty:dft))(Hamrick, Alpheus)
November 13, 2019 Filing 170 Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group's ANSWER to Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), Counterclaim #156 of Traxx Corporation filed by Counter-Defendant Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group.(Vineyard, Daniel)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Granting Request for Approval of Substitution of Attorney Brian M. Wheeler for Defendant American Polymers Corporation in place of Attorney Edward S. Orchon #168 . (gk)
November 12, 2019 Filing 169 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant American Polymers Corporation filed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Vineyard, Daniel)
November 6, 2019 Filing 168 REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Brian M. Wheeler in place of attorney Edward S. Orchon filed by Defendant American Polymers Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Request for Approval of Substitution or Withdrawal of Attorney) (Attorney Brian M Wheeler added to party American Polymers Corporation(pty:dft)) (Wheeler, Brian)
November 4, 2019 Filing 167 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Sasol (USA) Corporation, identifying Sasol Investment Company, Sasol Holdings (USA) (PTY) Limited, and Sasol Limited. (Smith, Gary)
October 30, 2019 Filing 166 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,, #93 CORRECTION OF DOCKET #1 #6 #3 filed by Defendant Reliable Steel Building Products, Inc..(Attorney Brian John Hogan added to party Reliable Steel Building Products, Inc.(pty:dft))(Hogan, Brian)
October 30, 2019 Filing 165 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,, #93 filed by Defendant Nikki Reagan.(Attorney Brian John Hogan added to party Nikki Reagan(pty:dft))(Hogan, Brian)
October 30, 2019 Filing 164 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,, #93 filed by Defendant Jeffrey M. Palmer.(Attorney Brian John Hogan added to party Jeffrey M. Palmer(pty:dft))(Hogan, Brian)
October 30, 2019 Filing 163 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Reliable Steel Building Products, Inc..(Attorney Brian John Hogan added to party Reliable Steel Building Products, Inc.(pty:dft))(Hogan, Brian)
October 30, 2019 Filing 162 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,, #93 SASOL (USA) CORPORATION'S ANSWER TO COOPER DRUM COOPERATING PARTIES GROUP'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Defendant Sasol (USA) Corporation.(Attorney Gary J Smith added to party Sasol (USA) Corporation(pty:dft))(Smith, Gary)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER RE: STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Upon Stipulation #159 , the Court hereby orders that the last day on which Defendant 5211 Southern Avenue, LLC may file a response to the First Amended Complaint #93 is 11/25/2019. (gk)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER RE STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Upon Stipulation #155 , the Court hereby Orders that the last day on which Defendants Reliable Steel Building Products, Inc., Jeffrey M. Palmer and Nikki Reagan may file a response to the Amended Complaint #93 is 11/1/2019. (gk)
October 23, 2019 Filing 159 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 11/25/2019 re Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,, #93 filed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Vineyard, Daniel)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT BY 45 DAYS #154 by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. The Court hereby orders that the deadline for Defendant TW Tedesco Properties, L.P. to respond to the First Amended Complaint is extended by forty-five (45) days to November 15, 2019. (lom)
October 23, 2019 Filing 157 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Traxx Corporation, identifying Traxx Corporation. (Bures, Matthew)
October 23, 2019 Filing 156 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,, #93 , COUNTERCLAIM against Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group filed by Defendant Traxx Corporation.(Bures, Matthew)
October 22, 2019 Filing 155 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Jeffrey M. Palmer answer now due 11/1/2019; Nikki Reagan answer now due 11/1/2019; Reliable Steel Building Products, Inc. answer now due 11/1/2019, re Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,, #93 filed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Vineyard, Daniel)
October 21, 2019 Filing 154 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 11/15/2019 re Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,, #93 filed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Vineyard, Daniel)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER ORDER OF DISMISSAL AGAINST DEFENDANT B. STEPHEN COOPERAGE, INC. PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41(a)(2) by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, pursuant to Federal Rule of CivilProcedure 41(a)(2), the claims and causes of action by the Group against Defendantin the above-captioned action, including the Plaintiffs Amended Complaint, aredismissed without prejudice. Dismissal shall be deemed with prejudice uponDefendants satisfaction of its financial obligations pursuant to the partiessettlement agreement. Each party shall bear its own costs.IT IS SO ORDERED., re Stipulation to Dismiss Party #149 (yl)
October 15, 2019 Filing 152 Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group's ANSWER to Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), Counterclaim #140 of Mike Palm Club, LLC filed by Counter-Defendant Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group.(Vineyard, Daniel)
October 15, 2019 Filing 151 Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group's ANSWER to Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, Counterclaim, #132 of Viad Corp filed by Counter-Defendant Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group.(Vineyard, Daniel)
October 15, 2019 Filing 150 Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group's ANSWER to Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, Counterclaim, #131 of Henkel Consumer Goods Inc. filed by Counter-Defendant Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group.(Vineyard, Daniel)
October 14, 2019 Filing 149 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant B. Stephen Cooperage, Inc. filed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Vineyard, Daniel)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER RE: STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Upon Stipulation #135 , the Court hereby orders that the last day on which Defendants Beatrice Companies, Inc. and Conagra Brands, Inc. may file a response to the First Amended Complaint #93 is 10/15/2019. (gk)
October 3, 2019 Filing 147 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group, upon Defendant Beatrice Companies, Inc. served on 10/2/2019, answer due 10/23/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon California Secretary of State in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and no service by mail was executed.Original Summons NOT returned. (Vineyard, Daniel)
October 2, 2019 Filing 146 Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group's ANSWER to Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), Counterclaim #122 of ELG Metals, Inc. and ELG Metals West Coast Inc. filed by Counter-Defendant Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group.(Vineyard, Daniel)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER RE: STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Upon Stipulation #133 , the Court hereby orders that the last day on which Defendant Sasol (USA) Corporation may file a response to the First Amended Complaint #93 is 10/30/2019. (gk)
October 1, 2019 Filing 144 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Meghan Quinn on behalf of Counter Claimants ELG Metals West Coast, Inc., ELG Metals, Inc., ELG Metals, Inc., Defendants ELG Metals West Coast, Inc., ELG Metals, Inc. (Attorney Meghan Quinn added to party ELG Metals West Coast, Inc.(pty:cc), Attorney Meghan Quinn added to party ELG Metals West Coast, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Meghan Quinn added to party ELG Metals, Inc.(pty:cc), Attorney Meghan Quinn added to party ELG Metals, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Meghan Quinn added to party ELG Metals, Inc.(pty:cc))(Quinn, Meghan)
October 1, 2019 Filing 143 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Sophia Benson Strong Castillo on behalf of Counter Claimants ELG Metals West Coast, Inc., ELG Metals, Inc., ELG Metals, Inc., Defendants ELG Metals West Coast, Inc., ELG Metals, Inc. (Attorney Sophia Benson Strong Castillo added to party ELG Metals West Coast, Inc.(pty:cc), Attorney Sophia Benson Strong Castillo added to party ELG Metals West Coast, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Sophia Benson Strong Castillo added to party ELG Metals, Inc.(pty:cc), Attorney Sophia Benson Strong Castillo added to party ELG Metals, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Sophia Benson Strong Castillo added to party ELG Metals, Inc.(pty:cc))(Strong Castillo, Sophia)
October 1, 2019 Filing 142 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Donald E Sobelman counsel for Counter Claimants ELG Metals West Coast, Inc., ELG Metals, Inc., ELG Metals, Inc., Defendants ELG Metals West Coast, Inc., ELG Metals, Inc.. Donald E. Sobelman is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants and Counter Claimants ELG Metals, Inc., ELG Metals West Coast, Inc., ELG Metals, Inc. (including in its capacity as successor-by-merger to ELG Metals West Coast, Inc.). (Sobelman, Donald)
October 1, 2019 Filing 141 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Mike Palm Club, LLC, (Shapero, Steven)
October 1, 2019 Filing 140 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,, #93 with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs filed by Defendant Mike Palm Club, LLC.(Attorney Steven J Shapero added to party Mike Palm Club, LLC(pty:dft))(Shapero, Steven)
October 1, 2019 Filing 139 Notice of Appearance filed by Defendant Henkel Consumer Goods, Inc. (Geocaris, James)
September 30, 2019 Filing 138 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Steven H Goldberg on behalf of Counter Claimants ELG Metals West Coast, Inc., ELG Metals, Inc., ELG Metals, Inc., Defendants ELG Metals West Coast, Inc., ELG Metals, Inc. (Attorney Steven H Goldberg added to party ELG Metals West Coast, Inc.(pty:cc), Attorney Steven H Goldberg added to party ELG Metals West Coast, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Steven H Goldberg added to party ELG Metals, Inc.(pty:cc), Attorney Steven H Goldberg added to party ELG Metals, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Steven H Goldberg added to party ELG Metals, Inc.(pty:cc))(Goldberg, Steven)
September 30, 2019 Filing 137 NOTICE of Errata filed by Defendant Best Tape, Inc.. (Spitser, Andrew)
September 30, 2019 Filing 136 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group, upon Defendant 5211 Southern Avenue, LLC served on 9/22/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon John Doe, Person Apparently in Charge, in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Vineyard, Daniel)
September 30, 2019 Filing 135 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Beatrice Companies, Inc. answer now due 10/15/2019; Conagra Brands, Inc. answer now due 10/15/2019, re Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,, #93 filed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Vineyard, Daniel)
September 27, 2019 Filing 134 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,, #93 filed by Defendant Best Tape, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Interested Parties and Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Attorney Andrew Culp Spitser added to party Best Tape, Inc.(pty:dft))(Spitser, Andrew)
September 27, 2019 Filing 133 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Sasol (USA) Corporation answer now due 10/30/2019, re Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,, #93 filed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Vineyard, Daniel)
September 27, 2019 Filing 132 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,, #93 with JURY DEMAND, COUNTERCLAIM against Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group filed by Defendant Purex Corporation, Viad Corporation.(Attorney Berj K Parseghian added to party Viad Corporation(pty:dft))(Parseghian, Berj)
September 27, 2019 Filing 131 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,, #93 with JURY DEMAND, COUNTERCLAIM against Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group filed by Defendant The Dial Corporation, Henkel Consumer Goods, Inc..(Attorney Berj K Parseghian added to party Henkel Consumer Goods, Inc.(pty:dft))(Parseghian, Berj)
September 24, 2019 Filing 130 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group, upon Defendant Nikki Reagan served on 9/23/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Nikki Reagan, self, in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Vineyard, Daniel)
September 19, 2019 Filing 129 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Traxx Corporation answer now due 10/23/2019, filed by Defendant Traxx Corporation.(Attorney Matthew Clark Bures added to party Traxx Corporation(pty:dft))(Bures, Matthew)
September 19, 2019 Filing 128 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group, upon Defendant Jeffrey M. Palmer served on 9/18/2019, answer due 10/9/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jeffrey Palmer, self, in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Vineyard, Daniel)
September 19, 2019 Filing 127 NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES/CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Rohm and Haas Company, identifying Rohm & Haas Company, a wholly-owned subsidiary of Dow International Holdings Company, which is majority owned by The Dow Chemical Company, which is a wholly-owned subsidiary of Dow, Inc.. (Cermak, John)
September 19, 2019 Filing 126 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,, #93 filed by Defendant Rohm and Haas Company.(Cermak, John)
September 17, 2019 Filing 125 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group, upon Defendant M.O. Dion and Sons, Inc. served on 9/16/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Susana Wheeler, Office Manager, in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Vineyard, Daniel)
September 12, 2019 Filing 124 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group, upon Defendant Traxx Corporation served on 9/11/2019, answer due 10/2/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Brittany Reyes, Person in Charge, in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Vineyard, Daniel)
September 12, 2019 Filing 123 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group, upon Defendant TW Tedesco Properties, L.P. served on 9/11/2019, answer due 10/2/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Christina Petrova, Receptionist, in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Vineyard, Daniel)
September 11, 2019 Filing 122 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,, #93 with JURY DEMAND, Amended COUNTERCLAIM against Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group filed by Defendants ELG Metals, Inc., ELG Metals West Coast, Inc..(Sobelman, Donald)
September 11, 2019 Filing 121 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (AMENDED) filed by Defendants ELG Metals West Coast, Inc., ELG Metals, Inc. (Sobelman, Donald)
September 11, 2019 Filing 120 AMENDED NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants ELG Metals West Coast, Inc., ELG Metals, Inc., identifying ELG Haniel Metals Corporation and ELG Haniel GmbH. (Attorney Donald E Sobelman added to party ELG Metals West Coast, Inc.(pty:dft))(Sobelman, Donald)
September 11, 2019 Filing 119 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,, #93 filed by Defendant Jervis B. Webb Company of California.(Romey, Michael)
September 11, 2019 Filing 118 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,, #93 filed by Defendant Jervis B. Webb Company.(Romey, Michael)
September 11, 2019 Filing 117 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,, #93 filed by Defendant Angeles Chemical Co., Inc..(Tropea, Santino)
September 11, 2019 Filing 116 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group, upon Defendant Pemaco, Inc. served on 9/10/2019, answer due 10/1/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon California Secretary of State in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and no service by mail was executed.Original Summons NOT returned. (Vineyard, Daniel)
September 11, 2019 Filing 115 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group, upon Defendant Acme Kustom Fit, Inc. served on 9/10/2019, answer due 10/1/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon California Secretary of State in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and no service by mail was executed.Original Summons NOT returned. (Vineyard, Daniel)
September 11, 2019 Filing 114 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group, upon Defendant Mike Palm Club, LLC served on 9/10/2019, answer due 10/1/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Kathleen Presser, Secretary, in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Vineyard, Daniel)
September 11, 2019 Filing 113 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group, upon Defendant Sasol (USA) Corporation served on 9/9/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System, Registered Agent, in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Vineyard, Daniel)
September 11, 2019 Filing 112 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group, upon Defendant Conagra Brands, Inc. served on 9/9/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Corporation Service Company, Registered Agent, in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Vineyard, Daniel)
September 11, 2019 Filing 111 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group, upon Defendant Best Tape, Inc. served on 9/9/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Kimberly McIney, Assistant to Steven Vidor, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Vineyard, Daniel)
September 11, 2019 Filing 110 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group, upon Defendant Beatrice Companies, Inc. served on 9/10/2019, answer due 10/1/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon California Secretary of State in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and no service by mail was executed.Original Summons NOT returned. (Vineyard, Daniel)
September 11, 2019 Filing 109 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group, upon Defendant Sasol Wax North America Corporation served on 9/10/2019, answer due 10/1/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon California Secretary of State in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and no service by mail was executed.Original Summons NOT returned. (Vineyard, Daniel)
September 11, 2019 Filing 108 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group, upon Defendant Sasol Wax Americas, Inc. served on 9/10/2019, answer due 10/1/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon California Secretary of State in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and no service by mail was executed.Original Summons NOT returned. (Vineyard, Daniel)
September 11, 2019 Filing 107 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group, upon Defendant Metal Management, Inc. served on 9/10/2019, answer due 10/1/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon California Secretary of State in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and no service by mail was executed.Original Summons NOT returned. (Vineyard, Daniel)
September 11, 2019 Filing 106 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group, upon Defendant Purex Corporation served on 9/10/2019, answer due 10/1/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon California Secretary of State in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and no service by mail was executed.Original Summons NOT returned. (Vineyard, Daniel)
September 11, 2019 Filing 105 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group, upon Defendant The Dial Corporation served on 9/10/2019, answer due 10/1/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon California Secretary of State in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and no service by mail was executed.Original Summons NOT returned. (Vineyard, Daniel)
September 11, 2019 Filing 104 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group, upon Defendant ELG Metals West Coast, Inc. served on 9/10/2019, answer due 10/1/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon California Secretary of State in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and no service by mail was executed.Original Summons NOT returned. (Vineyard, Daniel)
September 11, 2019 Filing 103 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,, #93 filed by Defendant B. Stephen Cooperage, Inc..(Lounsberry, Kendra)
September 9, 2019 Filing 102 Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group's ANSWER to Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), Counterclaim #84 of ELG Metals, Inc. filed by Counter-Defendant Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group.(Vineyard, Daniel)
September 6, 2019 Filing 101 DISCLOSURE of Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Crown Beverage Packaging, LLC (Hoch, Steven)
September 6, 2019 Filing 100 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,, #93 Answer to First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Crown Beverage Packaging, LLC.(Hoch, Steven)
September 4, 2019 Filing 99 21-Day Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint #93 as to Defendants Beatrice Companies, Inc., Conagra Brands, Inc., Far-Best Corporation, Lux International Corporation, M.O. Dion and Sons, Inc., Pemaco, Inc., Sasol Wax Americas, Inc., Sasol Wax North America Corporation, Sasol (USA) Corporation, 5211 Southern Avenue, LLC, Acme Kustom Fit, Inc., Best Tape, Inc., ELG Metals West Coast, Inc., Metal Management, Inc., TW Tedesco Properties, L.P., Traxx Corporation, Joyce Mendell Brody, Jorge Molina, Maria A. Molina, Walter Gatfield, Louise C. Gatfield, William W. Bruck, Shirley R. Bruck, Nortek, Inc., Bristol Industries, Inc., AFC Cable Systems, Inc., International Fastener Research Corp., Stephen A. Compas, Jeannette M. Compas, Ellen Gay Jacobs, Reliable Steel Building Products, Inc., Jeffrey M. Palmer, Nikki Reagan, Jose Ramirez, Mike Palm Club, LLC. (gk)
August 30, 2019 Filing 98 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Sonja Ann Inglin counsel for Defendant Rohm and Haas Company. Adding Sonja A. Inglin as counsel of record for Rohm & Haas Company for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Rohm & Haas Company. (Inglin, Sonja)
August 30, 2019 Filing 97 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney John Frank Cermak, Jr counsel for Defendant Rohm and Haas Company. Adding John F. Cermak, Jr. as counsel of record for Rohm & Haas Company for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Rohm & Haas Company. (Cermak, John)
August 30, 2019 Filing 96 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,, #93 filed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group. (Vineyard, Daniel)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Upon Stipulation #90 , the Court hereby orders that Defendant Viad Corp (incorrectly named as Purex Corporation) shall have until 9/27/2019 to respond to the initial complaint. (gk)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Upon Stipulation #85 , the Court hereby orders that Defendant Henkel Consumer Goods Inc. shall have until 9/27/2019 to respond to the initial complaint. (gk)
August 28, 2019 Filing 93 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Acme Kustom Fit, Inc., American Polymers Corporation, Angeles Chemical Co., Inc., B. Stephen Cooperage, Inc., Beatrice Companies, Inc., Crown Beverage Packaging, LLC, Doe Corporations, ELG Metals West Coast, Inc., ELG Metals, Inc., Far Best Corporation, Jervis B. Webb Company, Jervis B. Webb Company of California, Lux International Corporation, M.O. Dion and Sons, Inc., Metal Management, Inc., Pemaco, Inc., Purex Corporation, Rohm and Haas Company, Sasol Wax Americas, Inc., Sasol Wax North America Corporation, The Dial Corporation, Traxx Corporation, Conagra Brands, Inc., Sasol (USA) Corporation, 5211 Southern Avenue, LLC, Best Tape, Inc., Henkel Consumer Goods, Inc., TW Tedesco Properties, L.P., Viad Corporation, Joyce Mendell Brody, Jorge Molina, Maria A. Molina, Walter Gatfield, Louise C. Gatfield, William W. Bruck, Shirley R. Bruck, Nortek, Inc., Bristol Industries, Inc., AFC Cable Systems, Inc., International Fastener Research Corp., Stephen A. Compas, Jeannette M. Compas, Ellen Gay Jacobs, Reliable Steel Building Products, Inc., Jeffrey M. Palmer, Nikki Reagan, Jose Ramirez, Mike Palm Club, LLC amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Vineyard, Daniel)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANT AMERICAN POLYMERS CORPORATION TO FILE ITS RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Upon Stipulation #85 , it is Ordered that Defendant American Polymers Corporation's response to Complaint shall be filed on or before 9/26/2019. (gk)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER RE STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Upon Stipulation #79 , the Court hereby orders that the last day on which Defendant ELG Metals, Inc. may file a response to the Complaint is 9/6/2019. (gk)
August 22, 2019 Filing 90 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 09/27/2019 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by defendant Purex Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Parseghian, Berj)
August 22, 2019 Filing 89 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 09/27/2019 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by defendant The Dial Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Parseghian, Berj)
August 21, 2019 Filing 88 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Angeles Chemical Co., Inc., (Tropea, Santino)
August 21, 2019 Filing 87 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Angeles Chemical Co., Inc..(Attorney Santino Michael Tropea added to party Angeles Chemical Co., Inc.(pty:dft))(Tropea, Santino)
August 21, 2019 Filing 86 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Chemed Corporation, Veritiv Corporation, Veritiv Operating Company. (Vineyard, Daniel)
August 20, 2019 Filing 85 First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Parties, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant American Polymers Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Order)(Attorney Edward S Orchon added to party American Polymers Corporation(pty:dft))(Orchon, Edward)
August 19, 2019 Filing 84 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 and, COUNTERCLAIM against Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group filed by Defendant ELG Metals, Inc..(Sobelman, Donald)
August 16, 2019 Filing 83 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Jervis B. Webb Company.(Romey, Michael)
August 13, 2019 Filing 82 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Rohm and Haas Company answer now due 9/20/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by defendant Rohm and Haas Company.(Attorney Karen Palladino Ciccone added to party Rohm and Haas Company(pty:dft))(Ciccone, Karen)
August 13, 2019 Filing 81 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant ELG Metals, Inc. (Sobelman, Donald)
August 13, 2019 Filing 80 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant ELG Metals, Inc., identifying ELG Haniel Metals Corporation and ELG Haniel GmbH. (Sobelman, Donald)
August 13, 2019 Filing 79 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to ELG Metals, Inc. answer now due 9/6/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant ELG Metals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Donald E. Sobelman, #2 Proposed Order)(Attorney Donald E Sobelman added to party ELG Metals, Inc.(pty:dft))(Sobelman, Donald)
August 9, 2019 Filing 78 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group, upon Defendant Beatrice Companies, Inc. served on 8/8/2019, answer due 8/29/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Tammy Rink, Deputy, CA Secretary of State in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and no service by mail was executed.Original Summons NOT returned. (Vineyard, Daniel)
August 9, 2019 Filing 77 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group, upon Defendant Metal Management, Inc. served on 8/8/2019, answer due 8/29/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Tammy Rink, Deputy, CA Secretary of State in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and no service by mail was executed.Original Summons NOT returned. (Vineyard, Daniel)
August 9, 2019 Filing 76 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group, upon Defendant Sasol Wax Americas, Inc. served on 8/8/2019, answer due 8/29/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Tammy Rink, Deputy, CA Secretary of State in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and no service by mail was executed.Original Summons NOT returned. (Vineyard, Daniel)
August 9, 2019 Filing 75 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group, upon Defendant Sasol Wax North America Corporation served on 8/8/2019, answer due 8/29/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Tammy Rink, Deputy, CA Secretary of State in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and no service by mail was executed.Original Summons NOT returned. (Vineyard, Daniel)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Scheduling Conference set for 12/13/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COOPER DRUM COOPERATING PARTIES GROUP'S COMPLAINT AGAINST CROWN BEVERAGE PACKING LLC by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Upon Stipulation #54 , the Court hereby GRANTS an extension for Crown Beverage Packing LLC to respond to Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group's Complaint up to and including 9/3/2019. (gk)
August 7, 2019 Filing 72 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Jervis B. Webb Company of California.(Romey, Michael)
August 7, 2019 Filing 71 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Jervis B. Webb Company of California, (Attorney Michael G Romey added to party Jervis B. Webb Company of California(pty:dft))(Romey, Michael)
August 7, 2019 Filing 70 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group, upon Defendant American Polymers Corporation served on 8/6/2019, answer due 8/27/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Devandra Kumar, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Vineyard, Daniel)
August 7, 2019 Filing 69 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group, upon Defendant Rohm and Haas Company served on 8/2/2019, answer due 8/23/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Vineyard, Daniel)
August 5, 2019 Filing 68 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendant Purex Corporation, identifying Blackrock, Inc.; Henkel Consumer Goods Inc.; Henkel US Operations Corporation; Henkel of America, Inc.; Henkel of America I LLC; Henkel AG & Co. KGaA. (Parseghian, Berj)
August 5, 2019 Filing 67 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Purex Corporation identifying none as Corporate Parent. (Parseghian, Berj)
August 5, 2019 Filing 66 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Purex Corporation answer now due 8/30/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by defendant Purex Corporation.(Attorney Berj K Parseghian added to party Purex Corporation(pty:dft))(Parseghian, Berj)
August 2, 2019 Filing 65 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group, upon Defendant Pemaco, Inc. served on 7/31/2019, answer due 8/21/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Pemaco, Inc. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and no service by mail was executed.Original Summons NOT returned. (Vineyard, Daniel)
August 2, 2019 Filing 64 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Lux International in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and no service by mail was executed.Original Summons NOT returned. (Vineyard, Daniel)
August 2, 2019 Filing 63 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group, upon Defendant Lux International Corporation served on 7/31/2019, answer due 8/21/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Lux International in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and no service by mail was executed.Original Summons NOT returned. (Vineyard, Daniel)
August 2, 2019 Filing 62 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group, upon Defendant Jervis B. Webb Company of California served on 7/31/2019, answer due 8/21/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jervis B Webb Company of California in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and no service by mail was executed.Original Summons returned. (Vineyard, Daniel)
August 2, 2019 Filing 61 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon ACME Kustom Fit in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and no service by mail was executed.Original Summons returned. (Vineyard, Daniel)
August 2, 2019 Filing 60 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group, upon Defendant Angeles Chemical Co., Inc. served on 7/31/2019, answer due 8/21/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Angeles Chemical Co., Inc. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and no service by mail was executed.Original Summons returned. (Vineyard, Daniel)
August 2, 2019 Filing 59 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group, upon Defendant Far Best Corporation served on 7/31/2019, answer due 8/21/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Far-Best Corporation in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and no service by mail was executed.Original Summons NOT returned. (Vineyard, Daniel)
August 1, 2019 Filing 58 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to B. Stephen Cooperage, Inc. answer now due 9/4/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant B. Stephen Cooperage, Inc..(Attorney Kendra B Lounsberry added to party B. Stephen Cooperage, Inc.(pty:dft))(Lounsberry, Kendra)
August 1, 2019 Filing 57 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendant The Dial Corporation, identifying Henkel US Operations Corporation, Henkel of America, Inc., Henkel of America I LLC, Henkel AG & Co. KGaA. (Parseghian, Berj)
August 1, 2019 Filing 56 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant The Dial Corporation identifying Henkel US Operations Corporation, Henkel of America, Inc., Henkel of America I LLC, Henkel AG & Co. KGaA as Corporate Parent. (Parseghian, Berj)
August 1, 2019 Filing 55 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to The Dial Corporation answer now due 8/29/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by defendant The Dial Corporation.(Attorney Berj K Parseghian added to party The Dial Corporation(pty:dft))(Parseghian, Berj)
July 31, 2019 Filing 54 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 9-3-2019 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Crown Beverage Packaging, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group's Complaint Against Crown Beverage Packing LLC)(Attorney Steven L Hoch added to party Crown Beverage Packaging, LLC(pty:dft))(Hoch, Steven)
July 25, 2019 Filing 53 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group, upon Defendant Jervis B. Webb Company of California served on 7/17/2019, answer due 8/7/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Susan M. Webb/Former CEO/Authorized to Accept Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Vineyard, Daniel)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER RE: STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT BY NOT MORE THAN 30 DAYS (L.R. 8-3) by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Upon Stipulation #50 , the Court hereby orders that the last day on which Defendant Jervis B. Webb Company may file a response to the Complaint is 8/16/2019. (gk)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER GRANTING THE COOPER DRUM COOPERATING PARTIES GROUP'S MOTION FOR SERVICE ON THE SECRETARY OF STATE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The Court hereby GRANTS Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group's (the "Group") Motion for Service on the Secretary of State #45 and permits the Group to execute substituted service on Defendants Angeles Chemical Co., Inc., Far-Best Corporation, Lux International Corporation, Pemaco, Inc., Jervis B. Webb Company of California, and ACME Kustom Fit, Inc. by hand delivery of the requisite copy of process to be served, a copy of the court order, and payment of the Secretary of State's fee to the Secretary of State's office. (gk)
July 18, 2019 Filing 50 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Jervis B. Webb Company answer now due 8/16/2019, re Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #14 filed by Defendant Jervis B. Webb Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Romey, Michael)
July 18, 2019 Filing 49 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Jervis B. Webb Company, (Attorney Michael G Romey added to party Jervis B. Webb Company(pty:dft))(Romey, Michael)
July 18, 2019 Filing 48 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Jervis B. Webb Company (Romey, Michael)
July 18, 2019 Filing 47 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group, upon Defendant Lux International Corporation served on 7/17/2019, answer due 8/7/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Kenneth Chen, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Vineyard, Daniel)
July 18, 2019 Filing 46 Summons Returned Unexecuted filed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group. as to Angeles Chemical Co., Inc.. (Vineyard, Daniel)
July 17, 2019 Filing 45 Motion for Service on the Secretary of State (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Service)(Vineyard, Daniel)
July 17, 2019 Filing 44 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group, upon Defendant Sasol Wax North America Corporation served on 7/16/2019, answer due 8/6/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CSC, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Vineyard, Daniel)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 NOTICE OF DOCUMENT DISCREPANCIES AND ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr., ORDERING My Answer submitted by Defendant Mondo Chrome received on 7/8/2019 is not to be filed but instead rejected. Denial based on: Local Rule 83-2.2.2 Organizations. Only individuals may represent themselves pro se. (gk)
July 16, 2019 Filing 42 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group, upon Defendant Veritiv Corporation served on 7/15/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Vineyard, Daniel)
July 16, 2019 Filing 41 Summons Returned Unexecuted filed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group. as to Sasol Wax North America Corporation. (Vineyard, Daniel)
July 16, 2019 Filing 40 Summons Returned Unexecuted filed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group. as to Pemaco, Inc.. (Vineyard, Daniel)
July 16, 2019 Filing 39 Summons Returned Unexecuted filed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group. as to Lux International Corporation. (Vineyard, Daniel)
July 16, 2019 Filing 38 Summons Returned Unexecuted filed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group. as to Far Best Corporation. (Vineyard, Daniel)
July 16, 2019 Filing 37 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group, upon Defendant B. Stephen Cooperage, Inc. served on 7/15/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Mike Stephen, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Vineyard, Daniel)
July 16, 2019 Filing 36 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group, upon Defendant Veritiv Operating Company served on 7/15/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Vineyard, Daniel)
July 16, 2019 Filing 35 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group, upon Defendant Vast Enterprises served on 7/15/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Classie Carrillo, Accounting Employee in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Vineyard, Daniel)
July 15, 2019 Filing 34 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group, upon Defendant Beatrice Companies, Inc. served on 7/11/2019, answer due 8/1/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Vineyard, Daniel)
July 15, 2019 Filing 33 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group, upon Defendant American Polymers Corporation served on 7/12/2019, answer due 8/2/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon John Doe, Manager in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Vineyard, Daniel)
July 15, 2019 Filing 32 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group, upon Defendant Acme Kustom Fit, Inc. served on 7/12/2019, answer due 8/2/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Ronald D. Belk, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Vineyard, Daniel)
July 15, 2019 Filing 31 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Joe Melgar, Administrative Assistant in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Vineyard, Daniel)
July 15, 2019 Filing 30 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group, upon Defendant The Dial Corporation served on 7/10/2019, answer due 7/31/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Joe Melgar, Administrative Assistant in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Vineyard, Daniel)
July 12, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Ex Parte Application filed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel Vineyard)(Vineyard, Daniel)
July 12, 2019 Filing 28 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File Proof of Service filed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order) (Vineyard, Daniel)
July 12, 2019 Filing 27 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group, upon Defendant M.O. Dion and Sons, Inc. served on 7/11/2019, answer due 8/1/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Susan Weeler, Employee in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Vineyard, Daniel)
July 12, 2019 Filing 26 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group, upon Defendant Sasol Wax Americas, Inc. served on 7/11/2019, answer due 8/1/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CSC, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Vineyard, Daniel)
July 11, 2019 Filing 25 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group, upon Defendant Purex Corporation served on 7/10/2019, answer due 7/31/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Vineyard, Daniel)
July 11, 2019 Filing 24 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group, upon Defendant The Dial Corporation served on 7/9/2019, answer due 7/30/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CSC, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Vineyard, Daniel)
July 5, 2019 Filing 23 21-Day Summons Issued re Complaint #1 as to Defendants American Polymers Corporation, Angeles Chemical Co., Inc. (aka "Angelus Chemical" and/or "Angeles Chemical Company, Incorporated"), Beatrice Companies, Inc., B. Stephen Cooperage, Inc., Chemed Corporation, Far-Best Corporation, Insilco Corporation, Lux International Corporation, M.O. Dion & Sons, Inc., National Drum Company, Pemaco, Inc., Sasol Wax Americas, Inc., Sasol Wax North America Corporation, Vast Enterprises, Veritiv Corporation, Veritiv Operating Company. (gk)
July 3, 2019 Filing 22 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group, upon Defendant Mondo Chrome served on 7/1/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Armondo Dorame, Owner in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Vineyard, Daniel)
July 3, 2019 Filing 21 Summons Returned Unexecuted filed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group. as to Mondo Chrome. (Vineyard, Daniel)
July 3, 2019 Filing 20 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group, upon Defendant Traxx Corporation served on 7/1/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Craig Silvers, Registered Agent in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Vineyard, Daniel)
July 2, 2019 Filing 19 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Vineyard, Daniel)
July 2, 2019 Filing 18 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group, upon Defendant The Dial Corporation served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corp, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Vineyard, Daniel)
July 2, 2019 Filing 17 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group, upon Defendant Purex Corporation served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corp, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Vineyard, Daniel)
July 2, 2019 Filing 16 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group, upon Defendant Metal Management, Inc. served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corp, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Vineyard, Daniel)
July 2, 2019 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group, upon Defendant Jervis B. Webb Company of California served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corp, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Vineyard, Daniel)
July 2, 2019 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group, upon Defendant Jervis B. Webb Company served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CSC, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Vineyard, Daniel)
July 2, 2019 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group, upon Defendant ELG Metals West Coast, Inc. served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Terry Brown, Registered Agent in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Vineyard, Daniel)
July 2, 2019 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group, upon Defendant ELG Metals, Inc. served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CSC, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Vineyard, Daniel)
July 2, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group, upon Defendant Crown Beverage Packaging, LLC served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corp, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Vineyard, Daniel)
June 26, 2019 Filing 10 21-Day Summons Issued re Complaint #1 as to Defendants Acme Kustom Fit, Inc., Crown Beverage Packaging, LLC, The Dial Corporation, ELG Metals, Inc., ELG Metals West Coast, Inc., Metal Management, Inc., Mondo Chrome, Purex Corporation, Rohm & Haas Company, Traxx Corporation, Jervis B. Webb Company, and Jervis B. Webb Company of California. (gk)
June 24, 2019 Filing 9 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Vineyard, Daniel)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:15-cv-09931 AB(FFMx). Case transferred from Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim to Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-03007 AB(FFMx). Signed by Judge Andre Birotte Jr (rn)
April 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group. Related Case(s): 2:15cv-09931 and 2:18cv00234 (Vineyard, Daniel)
April 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
April 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (esa)
April 18, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group, (Vineyard, Daniel)
April 18, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group. (Vineyard, Daniel)
April 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23574950 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group. (Attorney Daniel E Vineyard added to party Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group(pty:pla))(Vineyard, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group v. Angeles Chemical Co Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angeles Chemical Co., Inc.
Represented By: Santino Michael Tropea
Represented By: Jeffery Laun Caufield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Die Casting Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angelus Waterproofing and Restoration, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Resin Technology Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Corporations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemed Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sasol Wax North America Corporation
Represented By: Gary J Smith
Represented By: Kathryn A Tipple
Represented By: Gary J. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veritiv Operating Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELG Metals, Inc.
Represented By: Donald E Sobelman
Represented By: Steven H Goldberg
Represented By: Sophia Benson Strong Castillo
Represented By: Meghan Quinn
Represented By: Monica Browner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Dial Corporation
Represented By: Berj K Parseghian
Represented By: James Angelo Geocaris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angelus Chemical
Represented By: Santino Michael Tropea
Represented By: Jeffery Laun Caufield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELG Metals West Coast, Inc.
Represented By: Donald E Sobelman
Represented By: Steven H Goldberg
Represented By: Sophia Benson Strong Castillo
Represented By: Meghan Quinn
Represented By: Monica Browner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Traxx Corporation
Represented By: Matthew Clark Bures
Represented By: Christopher T Johnson
Represented By: Andrew Culp Spitser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jervis B. Webb Company of California
Represented By: Michael G Romey
Represented By: John C Heintz
Represented By: Sarah F Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mouren Laurens Oil Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acme Kustom Fit, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orlandini Enterprises
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rohm and Haas Company
Represented By: Karen Palladino Ciccone
Represented By: John Frank Cermak, Jr
Represented By: Sonja Ann Inglin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metal Management, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beatrice Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sasol Wax Americas, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown Beverage Packaging, LLC
Represented By: Steven L Hoch
Represented By: Eric E Tomaszewski
Represented By: David L Isabel
Represented By: Datev Dave Krikor Shenian
Represented By: David L. Isabel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Drum Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purex Corporation
Represented By: Berj K Parseghian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vast Enterprises
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Stephen Cooperage, Inc.
Represented By: Kendra B Lounsberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pemaco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veritiv Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angeles Chemical Company
Represented By: Santino Michael Tropea
Represented By: Jeffery Laun Caufield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lux International Corporation
Represented By: Gary J Smith
Represented By: Kathryn A Tipple
Represented By: Gary J. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insilco Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jervis B. Webb Company
Represented By: Michael G Romey
Represented By: John C Heintz
Represented By: Jamie Leigh Sprague
Represented By: Sarah F Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shirley R. Bruck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen A. Compas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sasol (USA) Corporation
Represented By: Gary J Smith
Represented By: Kathryn A Tipple
Represented By: Gary J. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William W. Bruck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 5211 Southern Avenue, LLC
Represented By: Mark B Gilmartin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria A. Molina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Best Tape, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Culp Spitser
Represented By: Arthur Barry Fine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joyce Mendell Brody
Represented By: Mark B Gilmartin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nortek, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nikki Reagan
Represented By: Brian John Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AFC Cable Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ellen Gay Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey M. Palmer
Represented By: Brian John Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angeles Chemical Company, Incorporated
Represented By: Santino Michael Tropea
Represented By: Jeffery Laun Caufield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Inspection Laboratories
Represented By: Kendra B Lounsberry
Represented By: Charles M. Denton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air Nail Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reisner Metals, Inc.
Represented By: Steven J Elie
Represented By: Donald E Bradley
Represented By: Donald E. Bradley
Represented By: Steven J. Elie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shultz Steel Company
Represented By: Steven J Elie
Represented By: Donald E. Bradley
Represented By: Steven J. Elie
Represented By: Donald E Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Staple & Machine Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy J. Owens & Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: On Atlantic, LLC
Represented By: Tim C Hsu
Represented By: John J Allen
Represented By: Norman M Aspis
Represented By: Tim C. Hsu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carerncar, LLC
Represented By: Albert Martin Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genil, Inc.
Represented By: Kendra B Lounsberry
Represented By: Charles M. Denton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armstrong Flooring, Inc.
Represented By: Judith Maria Praitis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERCASA, LLC
Represented By: Albert Martin Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Cooper Drum Cooperating Parties Group
Represented By: Daniel E Vineyard
Represented By: Richard W Vanis, Jr
Represented By: Carolyn L Campion
Represented By: Chevazz G Brown
Represented By: Brian C Merges
Represented By: Phillip Allan Trajan Perez
Represented By: Carolyn L. Campion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Mondo Chrome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: JET CUSTOM CHROME
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: All State Welding Alloy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: GREGGS HONDA SERVICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: INTERNATIONAL TORQUE aka TORQUES INTERNATIONAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: FANTASTIC PLATING aka FANTASTIC CUSTOM CHROME aka FANTASTIC CUSTOMER CHROME PLATING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Advanced Grinding aka SGT Advanced Grinding Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: MONDO CHROME aka MONDO CUSTOM CHROME aka MONDOS SHOW CHRIME aka MANDOS CUSTOM CHROME
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: G&N PRODUCT DEVELOPMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Technical Trade Institute
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Alloy Precision Grinding Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: International Torque
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Advanced Grinding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Fantastic Plating
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Mandos Custom Chrome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Torques International
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: G and N Product Development
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Mondo Custom Chrome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Fantastic Custom Chrome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: SGT Advanced Grinding Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Fantastic Customer Chrome Plating
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Mondos Show Chrime
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Carerncar LLC
Represented By: Albert Martin Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Reisner Metals Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Julie Dykstra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Mistras Group, Inc.
Represented By: H. Joseph Drapalski, III
Represented By: Edward C. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Does 1-25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: QUALA (f/n/a QUALAWASH HOLDINGS, LLC, a Florida Liability company)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: VICKSBURG L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: JACKSON IRON WORKS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: PATATA INVESTMENT, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: LYNCHBURG L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: BOWERS-BAM, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: CUDAHY ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Azalea Joint Venture, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Tsay J & R, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Brenntag Pacific, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: M STEPHENS MANUFACTURING, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: BETTY R. ANGEL, TRUSTEE OF TRUST B UNDER THE ANGEL TRUST dated December 8, 1987
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: WINSOME ENTERPRISES, INC. (dba QUALITY CARRIERS, a subsidiary of QUALITY DISTRIBUTION, INC.)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: BOWERS-MM, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: PRATT & WHITNEY TOOL, CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: QUALA SYSTEMS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Ameron International Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Armstrong Cork Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Mistras Group Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Quala Systems Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Brenntag Pacific Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Jackson Iron Works Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Lynchburg LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Armstrong Flooring Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: M Stephens Manufacturing Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Bowers-Bam LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Accella Polyurethane Systems LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Bowers-MM LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Betty R Angel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Vicksburg LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Patata Investment LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance |