Jesus Orlando Meja v. Union Pacific Railroad Company et al
Plaintiff: Jesus Orlando Meja
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company and Does 1 through 100, inclusive
Counter Defendant: Titan Terminal and Transport, Inc. and Roes
Case Number: 2:2019cv03024
Filed: April 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jean P Rosenbluth
Referring Judge: Stephen V Wilson
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Filing 30 Receipt of Order of Remand filed. (mrgo)
June 13, 2019 Filing 29 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Superior Court for the State of California. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Superior Court for the State of California. (lom)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MINUTES IN CHAMBERS ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S AND DEFENDANT'S MOTIONS TO REMAND #13 #18 AND DENYING THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS #10 by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. Case Remanded to Norwalk Superior Court, BC6 93579. MD JS-6. Case Terminated. (mailed 6/13/19) (lom)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 SCHEDULING NOTICE/IN CHAMBERS ORDER-TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson re: NEW CASE STATUS CONFERENCE; #10 MOTION to Dismiss Cross-Claimant Union Pacific Railroad Companys Cross-Claim Against Cross-Defendant for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Proc. Rule 12(b)(6) and 12(e). and for More Definite Statement Pursuant to FRCP 12 filed by Defendant Titan Terminal and Transport, Inc; #13 Motion to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court; #14 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by defendant/cross-complainant Union Pacific Railroad Company; and #18 MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by defendant/cross-complainant - The motions are submitted. Order to issue. The hearing date and the status conference are vacated and off-calendar. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 29, 2019 Filing 26 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Stephen V. Wilson re: NEW CASE STATUS CONFERENCE; #10 MOTION to Dismiss Cross-Claimant Union Pacific Railroad Companys Cross-Claim Against Cross-Defendant for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Proc. Rule 12(b)(6) and 12(e). and for More Definite Statement Pursuant to FRCP 12 filed by Defendant Titan Terminal and Transport, Inc; #13 Motion to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court; #14 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by defendant/cross-complainant Union Pacific Railroad Company; and #18 MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by defendant/cross-complainant - Hearing on the motions and the initial status conference previously scheduled for 06/03/2019 at 1:30 PM have been continued to 06/17/2019 at 1:30 PM. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 20, 2019 Filing 25 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Cross-Claimant Union Pacific Railroad Companys Cross-Claim Against Cross-Defendant for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Proc. Rule 12(b)(6) and 12(e). and fo #10 filed by Counter Defendant Titan Terminal and Transport, Inc.. (Minnick, Kristine)
May 20, 2019 Filing 24 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #18 filed by Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company, Counter Claimant Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Electronic Service)(Covarrubias, Mariel)
May 17, 2019 Filing 23 REPLY Reply in Support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #13 filed by Plaintiff Jesus Orlando Meja. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Supplemental Declaration of Mark Dupont)(Dupont, Mark)
May 13, 2019 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Cross-Claimant Union Pacific Railroad Companys Cross-Claim Against Cross-Defendant for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Proc. Rule 12(b)(6) and 12(e). and fo #10 filed by Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company, Counter Claimant Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Mariel Covarrubias, #2 Exhibit Exhibits 1 - 6, #3 Exhibit Exhibits 7 - 12, #4 Declaration Service)(Covarrubias, Mariel)
May 13, 2019 Filing 21 TITAN TERMINAL AND TRANSPORT, INC.S OPPOSITION TO CROSS-COMPLAINANT, UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANYS MOTION TO REMAND in Opposition to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #18 filed by Counter Defendant Titan Terminal and Transport, Inc.. (Minnick, Kristine)
May 13, 2019 Filing 20 TITAN TERMINAL AND TRANSPORT, INC.S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF JESUS MEJIAS MOTION TO REMAND in opposition to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #13 filed by Counter Defendant Titan Terminal and Transport, Inc.. (Minnick, Kristine)
May 13, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #18 . The following error(s) was/were found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (mrgo)
May 10, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by defendant/cross-complainant Union Pacific Railroad Company. Motion set for hearing on 6/3/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration Mariel Covarrubias, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Declaration E Service) (Covarrubias, Mariel)
May 9, 2019 Filing 17 SCHEDULING NOTICE re: EX PARTE APPLICATION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #14 - Hearing is set for 6/3/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 8, 2019 Filing 16 Amendment to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #14 Proposed Order filed by Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company, Counter Claimant Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Electronic)(Covarrubias, Mariel)
May 6, 2019 Filing 15 OPPOSITION to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #14 filed by Counter Defendant Titan Terminal and Transport, Inc.. (Minnick, Kristine)
May 3, 2019 Filing 14 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by defendant/cross-complainant Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Declaration Mariel Covarrubias, #4 Declaration E Service) (Covarrubias, Mariel)
May 1, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Jesus Orlando Meja. Motion set for hearing on 6/3/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Hearing, #2 Memorandum, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Declaration, #5 Exhibit 1) (Dupont, Mark)
April 26, 2019 Filing 12 Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel (Quinn, Stephanie)
April 26, 2019 Filing 11 SCHEDULING NOTICE: The Initial Status Conference set for 5/20/2019 is continued to 6/3/2019 at 1:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 25, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Cross-Claimant Union Pacific Railroad Companys Cross-Claim Against Cross-Defendant for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Proc. Rule 12(b)(6) and 12(e). and for More Definite Statement Pursuant to FRCP 12 filed by Defendant Titan Terminal and Transport, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 6/3/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Cross-Defendant Titan Terminal and Transport, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss and for more Definite Statement Pursuant to FRCP 12) (Minnick, Kristine)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE for 5/20/2019 at 3:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
April 22, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
April 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (ghap)
April 18, 2019 COUNTERCLAIM FILED AS STATE COURT AS CROSS-COMPLAINT CROSSCLAIM against Counter-Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company, Titan Terminal and Transport, Inc., Roes 1 through 10, inclusive, filed by Counter-Clainmant Union Pacific Railroad Company. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 3/19/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT B) (ghap) Modified on 4/22/2019 (ghap). Modified on 4/22/2019 (ghap).
April 18, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 100, inclusive, Union Pacific Railroad Company., filed by plaintiff Jesus Orlando Meja. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/9/2018 (ghap)
April 18, 2019 Filing 5 DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Defendant/Cross Defendant Titan Terminal and Transport Inc.. (Minnick, Kristine)
April 18, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Counter Defendant Titan Terminal and Transport Inc. (Minnick, Kristine)
April 18, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Pendency of Actions filed by Defendant/Cross Defendant Titan Terminal and Transport Inc. (Minnick, Kristine)
April 18, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Cross Defendant Titan Terminal and Transport Inc, identifying Titan Terminal and Transport Inc.. (Minnick, Kristine)
April 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Norwalk Superior Court, case number BC693579 Receipt No: 0973-23577896 - Fee: $400, filed by JESUS ORLANDO MEJIA Titan Terminal and Transport Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C) (Attorney Kristine Elizabeth Minnick added to party Titan Terminal and Transport Inc(pty:cd))(Minnick, Kristine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jesus Orlando Meja v. Union Pacific Railroad Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Represented By: Stephanie L Quinn
Represented By: Mariel Covarrubias
Represented By: Corey M Day
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Titan Terminal and Transport, Inc.
Represented By: Kristine Elizabeth Minnick
Represented By: Caitlin Royal Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Roes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Orlando Meja
Represented By: Mark P Dupont
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?