Martha Castaneda v. FP Store, Inc.

Plaintiff: Martha Castaneda
Defendant: FP Store, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv03030
Filed: April 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Office: Western Division - Los Angeles Office
Presiding Judge: Cormac J Carney
Referring Judge: Alka Sagar
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:1104
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2019 Filing 4 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from California Eastern
April 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
April 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (lh)
April 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RECEIPT OF CASE TRANSFERRED IN: Formerly Case Number: 1:19-cv-00486-DAD-BAM, from U.S. District Court Eastern District of California (Fresno). The above-referenced case has been transferred to this district and assigned the above civil case number 2:19-cv-03030-CJC (ASx). (lh)
April 18, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order, Case Transferred Out to Another District served on Martha Castaneda. (Sant Agata, S) [Transferred from California Eastern on 4/19/2019.]
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Central District of California signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/18/2019. (Sant Agata, S) [Transferred from California Eastern on 4/19/2019.]
April 16, 2019 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Action Required. (Sant Agata, S) [Transferred from California Eastern on 4/19/2019.]
April 15, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Martha Castaneda. (Sant Agata, S) [Transferred from California Eastern on 4/19/2019.] Modified on 4/19/2019 (lh).
April 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FP Store, Inc. by Martha Castaneda. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sant Agata, S) [Transferred from California Eastern on 4/19/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martha Castaneda v. FP Store, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FP Store, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Castaneda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?