Lafonzo R. Turner v. A. Gaffney et al
Plaintiff: Lafonzo R. Turner
Defendant: A. Gaffney, A. Junes, J. Coleman, D. Taylor, D. Lewis and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2019cv03081
Filed: April 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael W Fitzgerald
Referring Judge: Jean P Rosenbluth
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 23 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant J. Coleman, A. Gaffney, A. Junes, D. Lewis, D. Taylor amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Lafonzo R. Turner. (iv)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER #21 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint shall be deemed served on the date this Order is signed. Defendants shall file an Answer or Motion to Dismiss on or before July 31, 2019. (iv)
July 1, 2019 Filing 21 Joint STIPULATION to AMEND Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Lafonzo R. Turner. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit First Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit 1 To First Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit 2 To First Amended Complaint, #5 Exhibit 3 To First Amended Complaint)(Ngo, Tina)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER #19 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The Stipulation of the Parties Extending Defendants Deadline to File a Responsive Pleading to Plaintiffs Complaint is GRANTED. Defendants shall respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before July 1, 2019. (lom)
May 30, 2019 Filing 19 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File A Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendants J. Coleman(in his capacity as Correctional Officer at CDCR), J. Coleman(Individually), A. Gaffney(in his capacity as Lieutenant at CDCR), A. Gaffney(Individually), A. Junes(in his capacity as Correctional Officer at CDCR), A. Junes(individually), D. Lewis(in his capacity as Correctional Officer at CDCR), D. Lewis(individually), D. Taylor(individually), D. Taylor(in his capacity as Correctional Officer at CDCR). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Doernberger, Jeremy)
May 30, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants J. Coleman(in his capacity as Correctional Officer at CDCR), J. Coleman(Individually), A. Gaffney(in his capacity as Lieutenant at CDCR), A. Gaffney(Individually), A. Junes(in his capacity as Correctional Officer at CDCR), A. Junes(individually), D. Lewis(in his capacity as Correctional Officer at CDCR), D. Lewis(individually), D. Taylor(individually), D. Taylor(in his capacity as Correctional Officer at CDCR), identifying 1) D. Lewis, 2) D. Taylor, 3) J. Coleman, 4) A. Junes, 5) A. Gaffney, 6) The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation and 7) The State of California. (Attorney Jeremy C Doernberger added to party J. Coleman(pty:dft), Attorney Jeremy C Doernberger added to party J. Coleman(pty:dft), Attorney Jeremy C Doernberger added to party A. Gaffney(pty:dft), Attorney Jeremy C Doernberger added to party A. Gaffney(pty:dft), Attorney Jeremy C Doernberger added to party A. Junes(pty:dft), Attorney Jeremy C Doernberger added to party A. Junes(pty:dft), Attorney Jeremy C Doernberger added to party D. Lewis(pty:dft), Attorney Jeremy C Doernberger added to party D. Lewis(pty:dft), Attorney Jeremy C Doernberger added to party D. Taylor(pty:dft), Attorney Jeremy C Doernberger added to party D. Taylor(pty:dft))(Doernberger, Jeremy)
May 13, 2019 Filing 17 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Lafonzo R. Turner, upon Defendant J. Coleman(in his capacity as Correctional Officer at CDCR) served on 5/10/2019, answer due 5/31/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Daniel Sanchez, Litigation Coordinator at CDCR in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Stacy, Wayne)
May 13, 2019 Filing 16 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Lafonzo R. Turner, upon Defendant D. Taylor(individually) served on 5/9/2019, answer due 5/30/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Daniel Sanchez, Litigation Coordinator at CDCR in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Stacy, Wayne)
May 13, 2019 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Lafonzo R. Turner, upon Defendant D. Lewis(individually) served on 5/9/2019, answer due 5/30/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Daniel Sanchez, Litigation Coordinator at CDCR in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Stacy, Wayne)
May 13, 2019 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Lafonzo R. Turner, upon Defendant A. Gaffney(in his capacity as Lieutenant at CDCR) served on 5/9/2019, answer due 5/30/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Daniel Sanchez, Litigation Coordinator at CDCR in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Stacy, Wayne)
May 13, 2019 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Lafonzo R. Turner, upon Defendant A. Junes(in his capacity as Correctional Officer at CDCR) served on 5/9/2019, answer due 5/30/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Patricie Kamara, Litigation Coordinator at CDCR in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Stacy, Wayne)
May 9, 2019 Filing 12 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant J. Coleman. (iv)
May 9, 2019 Filing 11 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant D. Taylor. (iv)
May 9, 2019 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant D. Lewis. (iv)
May 9, 2019 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant A. Junes. (iv)
May 9, 2019 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant A. Gaffney. (iv)
May 3, 2019 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Lafonzo R. Turner. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Stacy, Wayne)
April 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Lafonzo R. Turner, (Stacy, Wayne)
April 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (esa)
April 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
April 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (esa)
April 19, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Lafonzo R. Turner. (Stacy, Wayne)
April 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23585751 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Lafonzo R. Turner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (Attorney Wayne O Stacy added to party Lafonzo R. Turner(pty:pla))(Stacy, Wayne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lafonzo R. Turner v. A. Gaffney et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Gaffney
Represented By: Jeremy C Doernberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Junes
Represented By: Jeremy C Doernberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Coleman
Represented By: Jeremy C Doernberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Taylor
Represented By: Jeremy C Doernberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Lewis
Represented By: Jeremy C Doernberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lafonzo R. Turner
Represented By: Sarah J Guske
Represented By: Wayne O Stacy
Represented By: Reilly T. Stoler
Represented By: Peter K Huston
Represented By: Tina V. Ngo
Represented By: Reilly T Stoler
Represented By: Tina Vy Ngo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?