Antonio Dodds v. United States of America
Petitioner: Antonio Dodds
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2019cv03147
Filed: April 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: S James Otero
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2019 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion Under 28 U.S.C 2255 to Vacate, Set Aside, or Correct Sentence filed by Respondent United States of America. (Shiner, Max)
May 1, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of Assistant United States Attorney Max B. Shiner on behalf of Respondent United States of America. (Attorney Max B Shiner added to party United States of America(pty:res))(Shiner, Max)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge S. James Otero: The parties are advised that all future pleadings shall conform to the case caption above. The Court sets the following briefing schedule re Petitioners MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence By A Person in Federal Custody pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2255, filed on 04/23/2019 #1 . Opposition due: May 31, 2019; Reply due: July 5, 2019;The Court finds the motion suitable for disposition without oral argument, no oral argument hearing will be set. The matter will stand submit. (lc)
April 23, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge S. James Otero for motion filed under 28 U.S.C. 2255. (esa)
April 23, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence pursuant to 28 USC 2255 assigned to Judge S. James Otero. For docketing entries refer to CR Case # 2:14-cr-00338 SJO, filed by petitioner Antonio Dodds. (esa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Antonio Dodds v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Assistant 2241-2255 US Attorney LA-CR
Represented By: Max B Shiner
Represented By: Wilson Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Antonio Dodds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?