Marvin Lee Jackson v. Ideas Submission NIKE Inc et al
Plaintiff: Marvin Lee. Jackson
Defendant: Barrett Inman, NIKE, Inc. and Ideas Submission NIKE Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv03278
Filed: April 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale S Fischer
Referring Judge: Karen L Stevenson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Ideas Submission NIKE Inc, Barrett Inman, NIKE, Inc., re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #9 , Memorandum in Support of Motion #10 served on May 31, 2019. (Panikowski, Stanley)
May 31, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #9 filed by Defendants Ideas Submission NIKE Inc, Barrett Inman, NIKE, Inc.. (Panikowski, Stanley)
May 31, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Ideas Submission NIKE Inc, Barrett Inman, NIKE, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 8/5/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Stanley J Panikowski, III added to party Ideas Submission NIKE Inc(pty:dft)) (Panikowski, Stanley)
April 29, 2019 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Ideas Submission NIKE Inc, Barrett Inman, NIKE, Inc., re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only,, #7 served on April 29, 2019. (Panikowski, Stanley)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (pg)
April 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
April 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (esa)
April 24, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Ideas Submission NIKE Inc, Barrett Inman, filed by plaintiff Marvin Lee. Jackson. (Filed in state court 3/11/19, submitted as document 1, attachment 1) (esa)
April 24, 2019 Filing 4 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Ideas Submission NIKE Inc, Barrett Inman, served on April 24, 2019. (Panikowski, Stanley)
April 24, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Ideas Submission NIKE Inc, Barrett Inman, (Panikowski, Stanley)
April 24, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Ideas Submission NIKE Inc, Barrett Inman. (Panikowski, Stanley)
April 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 19STCV08131 Receipt No: 0973-23611913 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants Barrett Inman, Ideas Submission NIKE Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit C to Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit D to Notice of Removal, #5 Exhibit E to Notice of Removal, #6 Exhibit F to Notice of Removal, #7 Exhibit G to Notice of Removal) (Attorney Stanley J Panikowski, III added to party Ideas Submission NIKE Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Stanley J Panikowski, III added to party Barrett Inman(pty:dft))(Panikowski, Stanley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marvin Lee Jackson v. Ideas Submission NIKE Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marvin Lee. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barrett Inman
Represented By: Stanley J Panikowski, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NIKE, Inc.
Represented By: Stanley J Panikowski, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ideas Submission NIKE Inc
Represented By: Stanley J Panikowski, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?