Raul Lopez-Alvarez v. United States of America

Petitioner: Raul Lopez-Alvarez
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2019cv03436
Filed: April 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John A Kronstadt
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE GOVERNMENTS UNOPPOSED EX PARTE MOTION FOR TWO WEEK CONTINUANCE FOR FILING OF OPPOSITION TO 28 U.S.C. SECTION 2255 MOTION (DKT. 7) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: The Request is GRANTED. Accordingly, the Court amends the SchedulingOrder (Dkts. 4, 6) as follows: - July 18, 2019: Governments response to the Motion. August 13, 2019: Petitioners reply to the Motion. Upon receipt of the Petitioners reply, the Motion to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct a Sentence pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 2255 will be taken UNDER SUBMISSION and a ruling will be issued. (shb)
June 27, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN GOVERNMENT'S UNOPPOSED EX PARTE MOTION FOR TWO WEEK CONTINUANCE FOR FILING OPPOSITION TO 2255 MOTION (DKT. #7 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: Please take notice that pursuant to Local Rule 6-1 and 7, motions are briefed and set for hearing. The Court will accept the Unopposed Motion as filed. However, any future matter that is agreed upon shall be brought to the Courts attention by way of a stipulation and proposed order. If it is a matter that is disputed, an application or request with a proposed order shall be filed. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ake) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 25, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Continue FOR TWO WEEK CONTINUANCE FOR FILING OF OPPOSITION TO 28 U.S.C. 2255 MOTION filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Searight, Timothy)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER RE GOVERNMENTS UNOPPOSED EX PARTE MOTION FOR ONE MONTH CONTINUANCE FOR FILING OF OPPOSITION TO 2255 MOTION (DKT. 5) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: The Court APPROVES the Governments Ex Parte Motion. The Ex Parte Motion is not opposed by Petitioner. Accordingly, the Court amends the Scheduling Order (Dkt. 4) as follows: July 3, 2019: Governments response to the Motion. July 29, 2019: Respondents reply to the Motion. Upon receipt of the Respondents reply, the Motion to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct a Sentence pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 2255 will be taken UNDER SUBMISSION and a ruling will be issued. (shb)
May 31, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Continue FOR ONE MONTH CONTINUANCE FOR FILING OF OPPOSITION TO 28 U.S.C. 2255 MOTION; DECLARATION OF TIMOTHY J. SEARIGHT filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Timothy J Searight added to party United States of America(pty:res)) (Searight, Timothy)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge John A. Kronstadt: re: Motion to Vacate, Set Aside, or Correct Sentence (28:2255) (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The Court, having received Petitioners Motion to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct a Sentence by a Person in Federal Custody, pursuant to Title 28 USC 2255 (the Motion), hereby Orders the Government to respond to the Motion by June 3, 2019. Petitioner shall file and serve a reply no later than June 17, 2019. The Motion will be taken UNDER SUBMISISON on June 17, 2019 and a ruling will be issued. (shb)
April 29, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt for motion filed under 28 U.S.C. 2255. (et)
April 26, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movant Raul Lopez-Alvarez. (Kim, Gia)
April 26, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside, or Correct Sentence, Pursuant to 28 USC 2255 in Criminal Case No. 2:87-CR-00422-JAK-5, filed by Petitioner Raul Lopez-Alvarez. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support of Motion to Vacate Sentence Under 28 U.S.C. 2255, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C) (Attorney Gia Kim added to party Raul Lopez-Alvarez(pty:mov))(Kim, Gia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Raul Lopez-Alvarez v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Raul Lopez-Alvarez
Represented By: Gia Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Timothy J Searight
Represented By: Assistant 2241-2255 US Attorney LA-CR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?