Frank George Petas v. Avon Products, Inc.
Plaintiff: Susan Doody, Laura Marie Lara, Frank George Petas and Ulissa Ann Aaspacia Lindsey
Defendant: Whittaker Clark and Daniels, Inc., Imerys Talc America, Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, Valeant Pharmaceuticals North America LLC, Johnson and Johnson Consumer Inc., Does 1-450 Inclusive, Valeant Pharmaceuticals International Corporation, Brenntag Specialties, Inc., Johnson and Johnson, Avon Products, Inc., Cogate-Palmolive Company Cyprus Amax Minerals Company, Brenntag North America, Inc. and Cogate-Palmolive Company Cyprus Amax Minerals Company sued individually, doing business as, and as successor to American Talc Company, Metropolitan Talc Co. Inc. and Charles Mathieu Inc. and Sierra Talc Company and United Talc Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv03460
Filed: April 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Fernando M Olguin
Referring Judge: Michael R Wilner
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2019 Filing 13 Receipt of Copy of Remand Transmittal Letter from Los Angeles Superior Court, Case No. BC701665/JCCP 4674, acknowledged on 5/6/2019. (iv)
May 2, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Transferring Case purs GO 19-03 (Related Case)(CV-34), #11 Pursuant to the remanding of the case to the Los Angeles Superior Court prior to the transfer of the case to Judge Carney, the transfer has been vacated and the case returned to Judge Olguin and Wilner. Case now reads as 2:19-cv-03460 FMO(MRWx). (rn)
May 2, 2019 Filing 10 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles Superior Court. (iv)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: REMAND by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The above- captioned action shall be remanded to the Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Los Angeles, 111 N. Hill St., Los Angeles, CA 90012, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1452(b). All pending motions are denied as moot. Case Terminated. Made JS-6 (iv)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:19-cv-03036 CJC(JCx). Case transferred from Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner to Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-03460 CJC(JCx). Signed by Judge Cormac J. Carney (rn)
May 1, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Movant Johnson and Johnson, Johnson and Johnson Consumer Inc., re Notice (Other) #5 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #3 served on April 26, 2019. (Stewart, Jennifer)
April 28, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
April 28, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (lh)
April 26, 2019 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to First Amended Complaint, filed by Defendants Johnson and Johnson, Johnson and Johnson Consumer Inc. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT, CASE NUMBER BC701665 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT B TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 )(Attorney Bryan Lawrence King added to party Johnson and Johnson(pty:dft), Attorney Bryan Lawrence King added to party Johnson and Johnson Consumer Inc.(pty:dft))(lh)
April 26, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Avon Products, Inc., Brenntag North America, Inc., Brenntag Specialties, Inc., Cogate-Palmolive Company Cyprus Amax Minerals Company, Does 1-450, Imerys Talc America, Inc., Johnson and Johnson, Johnson and Johnson Consumer Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, Valeant Pharmaceuticals International Corporation, Valeant Pharmaceuticals North America LLC, Whittaker Clark and Daniels, Inc., filed by Plaintiffs Ulissa Ann Aaspacia Lindsey, Frank George Petas, Susan Doody, Laura Marie Lara. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT, CASE NUMBER BC701665 ON 7/30/2018 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 )(lh)
April 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE Of Pendency Of Other Actions Or Proceedings [L.R. 83-1.4] And Requests For Stay of Proceedings filed by Movant Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Stewart, Jennifer)
April 26, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Movant Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., (Stewart, Jennifer)
April 26, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Movants Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (Stewart, Jennifer)
April 26, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movants Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Stewart, Jennifer)
April 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number BC701665 Receipt No: 0973-23629371 - Fee: $400, filed by Movant Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C Part 1, #4 Exhibit C Part 2, #5 Exhibit C Part 3, #6 Exhibit C Part 4, #7 Exhibit C Part 5, #8 Exhibit C Part 6, #9 Exhibit D) (Attorney Jennifer Taylor Stewart added to party Johnson & Johnson(pty:bkmov), Attorney Jennifer Taylor Stewart added to party Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.(pty:bkmov))(Stewart, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frank George Petas v. Avon Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Doody
Represented By: Albert Oganesyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Marie Lara
Represented By: Albert Oganesyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank George Petas
Represented By: Albert Oganesyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ulissa Ann Aaspacia Lindsey
Represented By: Albert Oganesyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whittaker Clark and Daniels, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imerys Talc America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valeant Pharmaceuticals North America LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson and Johnson Consumer Inc.
Represented By: Alexander G Calfo
Represented By: Bryan Lawrence King
Represented By: Jennifer Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Julia Elizabeth Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-450 Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valeant Pharmaceuticals International Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenntag Specialties, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson and Johnson
Represented By: Alexander G Calfo
Represented By: Bryan Lawrence King
Represented By: Jennifer Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Julia Elizabeth Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avon Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cogate-Palmolive Company Cyprus Amax Minerals Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenntag North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cogate-Palmolive Company Cyprus Amax Minerals Company sued individually, doing business as, and as successor to American Talc Company, Metropolitan Talc Co. Inc. and Charles Mathieu Inc. and Sierra Talc Company and United Talc Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?