Oliver B Mitchell III v. Octapharma AG et al
Plaintiff: Oliver B Mitchell, III
Defendant: Stafford, Owens, Piller, Murane, Kelleher and Trombley, PLLC and Octapharma AG
Case Number: 2:2019cv03610
Filed: April 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Percy Anderson
Referring Judge: Jean P Rosenbluth
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2019 Filing 14 JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL by Judge Percy Anderson, Related to: Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, #13 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that the action filed by Plaintiff is dismissed without prejudice. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (mrgo)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. For all of these reasons, the Court concludes that Plaintiff's Complaint is frivolous and fails to state a claim. Plaintiff's Complaint is therefore subject to dismissal pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e). Plaintiff has failed to indicate how he could amend his Complaint to state a viable federal claim against Octapharma or Stafford Owens. The Court therefore concludes that leave to amend would be futile and dismisses this Complaint without leave to amend. The Court has not considered what, if any, remedies Plaintiff may possess under state law in state court. The Court therefore dismisses this action without prejudice. The Court will issue a Judgment of Dismissal consistent with this Order. (mrgo)
May 15, 2019 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Oliver B Mitchell, III, re Response #11 served on 5/14/2019. (mrgo)
May 15, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by Plaintiff Oliver B Mitchell, III re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, Set/Reset Deadlines, #9 . (mrgo)
May 3, 2019 Filing 10 30 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery), #1 as to Defendants Octapharma AG, Stafford, Owens, Piller, Murane, Kelleher and Trombley, PLLC. (sbou)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. Because Plaintiff has brought FOIA claims against Octapharma and Stafford Owens, neither of which appears to be an "agency" for purposes of FOIA, this action appears to be "frivolous" for purposes of 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). The Court therefore orders Plaintiff to show cause in writing why: (1) his permission to proceed in forma pauperis should not be revoked and why he should not be required to pay the full filing fee before being allowed to continue to pursue this action; and (2) why this action should not be dismissed as frivolous. Plaintiff's response to this Order to Show Cause shall be filed no later than May 20, 2019. (mrgo)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SELF-REPRESENTATION ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. (See document for details) (mrgo)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (mrgo)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth: granting #3 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (sbou)
April 30, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jp)
April 30, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (jp)
April 30, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis With Declaration in Support filed by plaintiff Oliver B Mitchell, III. (jp)
April 30, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Oliver B Mitchell, III. (jp)
April 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Defendants Octapharma AG, Stafford, Owens, Piller, Murane, Kelleher and Trombley, PLLC. Case assigned to Judge Percy Anderson for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth, filed by plaintiff Oliver B Mitchell, III. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 30 Days Summon not issue). (jp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oliver B Mitchell III v. Octapharma AG et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stafford, Owens, Piller, Murane, Kelleher and Trombley, PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Octapharma AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oliver B Mitchell, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?