Harley Carter v. County of Los Angeles et al
Plaintiff: Harley Carter
Defendant: FNU Chavez, FNU Goshen, Vicki Reyes, COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES,, James McDonnell, DOES 1 through 100, inclusive, FNU Valdez, Sheriff Deputy FNU Chavez, Sheriff James McDonnell, Sheriff Deputy Vicki Reyes, Sheriff Duputy FNU Goshen, County of Los Angeles, Los Angeles County Sheriff Department and Sheriff Deputy FNU Valdez
Case Number: 2:2019cv03840
Filed: May 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John E McDermott
Referring Judge: John F Walter
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 29 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File A RESPONSIVE PLEADING TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT, INCLUDING A MOTION TO DISMISS, ON OR BEFORE JULY 22, 2019 filed by DEFENDANTS County of Los Angeles, James McDonnell. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Anita S Brenner added to party County of Los Angeles(pty:dft), Attorney Anita S Brenner added to party James McDonnell(pty:dft))(Brenner, Anita)
June 7, 2019 Filing 28 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant FNU Goshen. (iv)
June 7, 2019 Filing 27 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant FNU Valdez. (iv)
June 7, 2019 Filing 26 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant James McDonnell. (iv)
June 6, 2019 Filing 25 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant FNU Chavez. (iv)
June 6, 2019 Filing 24 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Los Angeles County Sheriff Department, Vicki Reyes. (iv)
June 6, 2019 Filing 23 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Los Angeles County Sheriff Department. (iv)
June 6, 2019 Filing 22 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant County of Los Angeles. (iv)
June 6, 2019 Filing 21 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Harley Carter. (Lessem, Jeremy)
June 6, 2019 Filing 20 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Harley Carter. (Lessem, Jeremy)
June 6, 2019 Filing 19 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Harley Carter. (Lessem, Jeremy)
June 6, 2019 Filing 18 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Harley Carter. (Lessem, Jeremy)
June 6, 2019 Filing 17 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Harley Carter. (Lessem, Jeremy)
June 6, 2019 Filing 16 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Harley Carter. (Lessem, Jeremy)
June 6, 2019 Filing 15 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Harley Carter. (Lessem, Jeremy)
May 31, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #7 , #8 , #9 , #10 , #11 , #12 , #13 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write "see attached."Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (iv)
May 29, 2019 Filing 13 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Harley Carter. (Lessem, Jeremy)
May 29, 2019 Filing 12 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Harley Carter. (Lessem, Jeremy)
May 29, 2019 Filing 11 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Harley Carter. (Lessem, Jeremy)
May 29, 2019 Filing 10 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Harley Carter. (Lessem, Jeremy)
May 29, 2019 Filing 9 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Harley Carter. (Lessem, Jeremy)
May 29, 2019 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Harley Carter. (Lessem, Jeremy)
May 29, 2019 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Harley Carter. (Lessem, Jeremy)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv)
May 6, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
May 6, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (lh)
May 2, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Harley Carter, identifying County of Los Angeles, Los Angeles County Sheriff James McDonnell, Los Angeles County Sheriff Deputy Vicki Reyes, Los Angeles County Sheriff Deputy FNU Valdez, Los Angeles County Sheriff Deputy FNU Goshen, Los Angeles County Sheriff Deputy FNU Chavez. (Lessem, Jeremy)
May 2, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Harley Carter. (Lessem, Jeremy)
May 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23668561 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Harley Carter. (Attorney Jeremy Ian Lessem added to party Harley Carter(pty:pla))(Lessem, Jeremy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harley Carter v. County of Los Angeles et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Chavez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Goshen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vicki Reyes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James McDonnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Valdez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Deputy FNU Chavez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff James McDonnell
Represented By: Anita S Brenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Deputy Vicki Reyes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Duputy FNU Goshen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Los Angeles
Represented By: Anita S Brenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Los Angeles County Sheriff Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Deputy FNU Valdez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harley Carter
Represented By: Jeremy Ian Lessem
Represented By: Jamal L Tooson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?