Amber Pardue et al v. CBC Restaurant Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Amber Pardue and Jennifer Vargas
Defendant: CBC Restaurant Corp., Juliana Zhu and Does 1 through 100, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2019cv03920
Filed: May 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley Blumenfeld
Referring Judge: Cormac J Carney
2 Judge: Steve Kim
3 Judge: Manuel L Real
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#20-116) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr., this case is transferred from Judge Cormac J. Carney to the calendar of Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-03920 SB (SKx). (rrp)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney, Granting the Parties' Joint Stipulation to Continue Filing Date on Plaintiff's Renewed Motion for Class Certification (Dkt. #51 ). SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
September 16, 2020 Filing 53 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jennifer Marie Holly counsel for Defendant CBC Restaurant Corp.. Elaisha Nandrajog is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant CBC Restaurant Corp.. (Holly, Jennifer)
September 16, 2020 Filing 52 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jennifer Marie Holly counsel for Defendant CBC Restaurant Corp.. Jenna Logoluso is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant CBC Restaurant Corp.. (Holly, Jennifer)
September 15, 2020 Filing 51 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Filing Date on Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion for Class Certification from September 28, 2020 to March 19, 2021 filed by Defendants CBC Restaurant Corp., Juliana Zhu. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Holly, Jennifer)
July 10, 2020 Filing 50 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: NOTICE TO PARTIES by District Judge Cormac J. Carney. Effective July 13, 2020, Judge Cormac J. Carney will be located in the Ronald Reagan Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, Courtroom 9B, on the 9th floor, located at 411 W. 4th Street, Santa Ana, California 92701-4516. All Court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 9B of the Ronald Reagan Federal Buiding and U.S. Courthouse unless otherwise ordered by the Court. All required mandatory chambers copies shall be delivered and placed in the drop box located on the 9th Floor of the Ronald Reagan Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse. Judge Carneys Courtroom Deputy Clerk, may be reached at CJC_Chambers@cacd.uscourts.gov. The location for filing civil and/or criminal documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing is at the Clerks Office, Ronald Reagan Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, located at 411 W. 4th Street, Santa Ana, California 92701-4516. Documents under this exemption may also be filed in the Los Angeles or Riverside courthouses. Please refer to Judge Carneys Procedures and Schedules Page on the Courts website **UPDATED AS OF JULY 9, 2020** for updated procedures regarding mandatory chambers copies. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cbr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER GRANTING THE PARTIES' JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE FILING DATE ON PLAINTIFF'S RENEWED MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION #48 by Judge Cormac J. Carney. This Court HEREBY ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: 1. Plaintiffs' deadline to file their Motion for Class Certification of May 29, 2020 is vacated. 2. Plaintiffs must re-file their Motion for Class Certification by September 28, 2020. (lom)
April 20, 2020 Filing 48 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Filing Date on Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion for Class Certification from May 29, 2020 to September 29, 2020 filed by Defendants CBC Restaurant Corp., Juliana Zhu. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Holly, Jennifer)
April 3, 2020 Filing 47 NOTICE of Change of address by Diego F Aviles attorney for Plaintiffs Amber Pardue, Jennifer Vargas. Changing attorneys address to 8484 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 500, Beverly Hills, California 90211. Filed by Plaintiffs Amber Pardue, Jennifer Vargas. (Aviles, Diego)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DENYING JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARING DATE #45 AND DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION #35 by Judge Cormac J. Carney. The Court DENIES that stipulation and DENIES WITHOUT PREJUDICE the motion for class certification. The original March 30, 2020 hearing is hereby vacated and removed from the calendar. If the parties' mediation efforts are unsuccessful, Plaintiffs shall refile their motion for class certification no later than Friday, May 29, 2020. (iv)
March 3, 2020 Filing 45 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Hearing Date on Renewed Motion for Class Certification from March 30, 2020 to May 18, 2020 filed by Defendants CBC Restaurant Corp., Juliana Zhu. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Case, Hope)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 (IN CHAMBERS) SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney re: The Court, on its own motion, hereby sets a hearing for 3/30/2020 at 01:30 p.m. on the Motion to Certify Class #35 . THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (gga) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER VACATING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL by Judge Cormac J. Carney. In light of the transfer of this action to the calendar of the Honorable Cormac J. Carney, this Court hereby VACATES all current deadlines and hearings. The Court shall issue a Scheduling Order resetting all trial related dates and deadlines. (iv)
December 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#19-084) approved by Chief Judge Virginia A. Phillips. IT IS ORDERED, with the concurrence of the Case Management and Assignment Committee, that the following cases be reassigned from the calendar of Judge Manuel L. Real to the calendar of Judge Cormac J. Carney for all further proceedings The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-03920 CJC(SKx). (rn)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 SCHEDULING NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES AND ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Amended Motion to Certify Class Action filed by plaintiff #35 calendared for hearing on January 6, 2020, has been taken under submission and off the motion calendar. No appearances by counsel are necessary. The Court will issue a ruling after full consideration of properly submitted pleadings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dbu) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 23, 2019 Filing 40 REPLY In Support of Amended NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify Class Action #35 filed by Plaintiffs Amber Pardue, Jennifer Vargas. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Bennett Berger, #2 Declaration David Bibiyan, #3 Exhibit Matern Declaration, #4 Exhibit Stahle Declaration, #5 Exhibit Paul Hicks Depo, #6 Exhibit Denise Clemens Depo, #7 Exhibit Amber Pardue Depo, #8 Supplement Evidentiary Objections, #9 Proposed Order)(Aviles, Diego)
December 16, 2019 Filing 39 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re Amended NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify Class Action #35 filed by Defendant CBC Restaurant Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K)(Case, Hope)
December 16, 2019 Filing 38 OPPOSITION to Amended NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify Class Action #35 filed by Defendant CBC Restaurant Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Compendium of Declarations, #3 Appendix of Declarations, #4 Exhibit 1 to Appendix, #5 Exhibit 2 to Appendix, #6 Exhibit 3 to Appendix, #7 Exhibit 4 to Appendix, #8 Exhibit 5 to Appendix, #9 Exhibit 6 to Appendix, #10 Exhibit 7 to Appendix, #11 Exhibit 8 to Appendix, #12 Exhibit 9 to Appendix, #13 Exhibit 10 to Appendix, #14 Exhibit 11 to Appendix, #15 Exhibit 12 to Appendix, #16 Exhibit 13 to Appendix, #17 Exhibit 14 to Appendix, #18 Exhibit 15 to Appenix, #19 Exhibit 16 to Appendix, #20 Exhibit 17 to Appendix, #21 Exhibit 18 to Appendix, #22 Declaration of Hope Anne Case, #23 Exhibit A to Case Declaration, #24 Exhibit B to Case Declaration, #25 Exhibit C to Case Declaration, #26 Exhibit D to Case Declaration, #27 Exhibit E to Case Declaration, #28 Declaration of Juliana Zhu, #29 Declaration of Paul Hicks, #30 Declaration of Denise Clemens, #31 Exhibit A to Clemens Declaration, #32 Exhibit B to Clemens Declaration, #33 Exhibit C to Clemens Declaration, #34 Exhibit D to Clemens Declaration, #35 Exhibit E to Clemens Declaration, #36 Exhibit F to Clemens Declaration, #37 Exhibit G to Clemens Declaration, #38 Exhibit H to Clemens Declaration, #39 Declaration of Robert W. Crandall, #40 Objections to Plaintiffs' Materials)(Case, Hope)
December 12, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 12/2/19 9:30 A.M. re Transcript #36 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lca) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 12, 2019 Filing 36 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 12/2/19 9:30 A.M.. Court Reporter: SHERI S. KLEEGER, CSR, e-mail address: mykuippo@aol.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 1/2/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/13/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/11/2020. (lca)
December 8, 2019 Filing 35 Amended NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify Class Action filed by plaintiff Amber Pardue, Jennifer Vargas. Motion set for hearing on 1/6/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Manuel L. Real. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Exhibit David D. Bibiyan Decl., #3 Exhibit Paul Hicks Depo, #4 Exhibit Denise Clemens Depo, #5 Exhibit Dominique Chavez Decl., #6 Exhibit Michael Munoz Decl., #7 Exhibit Charity Trask Decl., #8 Exhibit Jennifer Vargas Decl., #9 Exhibit Amber Pardue Decl., #10 Exhibit Bennett S. Berger Exp. Decl., #11 Proposed Order) (Aviles, Diego)
December 4, 2019 Filing 34 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant CBC Restaurant Corp. for Court Reporter. Court will contact Kathleen Fischer at kfischer@srclaw.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Case, Hope)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than July 24, 2020. (cch)
December 2, 2019 Filing 32 MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge R. Gary Klausner. Amended Pleadings due by 2/15/2020. Discovery cut-off 6/10/2020. Motions due by 6/24/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/24/2020 at 09:00 AM. Jury Trial set for 9/8/2020 at 09:00 AM. Court Reporter: Sheri Kleeger. (cch)
November 30, 2019 Filing 31 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Mikael Hans Stahle counsel for Plaintiff Amber Pardue. Adding Tagore O. Subramaniam as counsel of record for Amber Pardue, Jennifer Vargas for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Amber Pardue. (Stahle, Mikael)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner: Counsel and parties are hereby notified that this matter is set for a Scheduling Conference on Monday, December 2, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. before the Honorable R. Gary Klausner in Courtroom 880 of the Roybal Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, 255 East Temple Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012. Counsel must be present and telephonic appearances are not permitted. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cch) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order Re: Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification by Judge R. Gary Klausner: Because the Court finds the Plaintiffs failed to meet their meet and confer obligations with respect to the precise relief sought in their Motion in violation of Local Rule 7-3, the Court DENIES Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification #16 WITHOUT PREJUDICE. See document for further details. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
October 2, 2019 Filing 28 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE in Support of Defendant CBC Restaurant Corp.'s Objections to Plaintiffs' Materials on Reply [Dkt. 27] filed by Defendant CBC Restaurant Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Case, Hope)
October 2, 2019 Filing 27 OBJECTIONS to Reply (Motion related),, #21 Objections to Materials Offered by Plaintiffs in Reply in Support of their Motion for Class Certification filed by Defendant CBC Restaurant Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jennifer Holly)(Case, Hope)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 SCHEDULING NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES AND ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification #16 calendared for hearing on October 7, 2019, has been taken under submission and off the motion calendar. No appearances by counsel are necessary. The Court will issue a ruling after full consideration of properly submitted pleadings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dbu) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 27, 2019 Filing 25 AMENDED DOCUMENT filed by Plaintiffs Amber Pardue, Jennifer Vargas. Amendment to Notice of Association of Counsel, #22 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Matthew J. Matern, #2 Exhibit Mikael H. Stahle)(Aviles, Diego)
September 27, 2019 Filing 24 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS. The document is stricken and counsel is ordered to file an amended or corrected document by 5:00 p.m. of September 30, 2019. (cch)
September 26, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Association of Counsel, #22 . The following error(s) was/were found: Notice of Association not signed the firm Matern Law Group PC. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
September 26, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Association of Counsel associating attorney Matthew J. Matern and Mikael H. Stahle on behalf of Plaintiffs Amber Pardue, Jennifer Vargas. Filed by Plaintiffs Amber Pardue, Jennifer Vargas (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Matthew J. Matern, #2 Exhibit Mikael H. Stahle)(Aviles, Diego)
September 23, 2019 Filing 21 REPLY In Support Of First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify Class Action #16 filed by Plaintiffs Amber Pardue, Jennifer Vargas. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of David D. Bibiyan, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Matthew J. Matern, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Mikael H. Stahle, #4 Exhibit Deposition of Paul Hicks, #5 Exhibit Deposition of Denise Clemens, #6 Exhibit Deposition of Amber Pardue, #7 Declaration Declaration of Bennett S. Berger, #8 Exhibit Evidentiary Objections)(Aviles, Diego)
September 16, 2019 Filing 20 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE in Support of Defendant CBC Restaurant Corp.'s Opposition to Motion for Class Certification [Dkt 19] filed by Defendant CBC Restaurant Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Case, Hope)
September 16, 2019 Filing 19 OPPOSITION to First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify Class Action #16 filed by Defendant CBC Restaurant Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Compendium of Declarations, #3 Appendix of Declarations, #4 Exhibit 1 to Appendix, #5 Exhibit 2 to Appendix, #6 Exhibit 3 to Appendix, #7 Exhibit 4 to Appendix, #8 Exhibit 5 to Appendix, #9 Exhibit 6 to Appendix, #10 Exhibit 7 to Appendix, #11 Exhibit 8 to Appendix, #12 Exhibit 9 to Appendix, #13 Exhibit 10 to Appendix, #14 Exhibit 11 to Appendix, #15 Exhibit 12 to Appendix, #16 Exhibit 13 to Appendix, #17 Exhibit 14 to Appendix, #18 Exhibit 15 to Appendix, #19 Exhibit 16 to Appendix, #20 Exhibit 17 to Appendix, #21 Exhibit 18 to Appendix, #22 Declaration of Hope Anne Case, #23 Exhibit A to Case Declaration, #24 Exhibit B to Case Declaration, #25 Exhibit C to Case Declaration, #26 Exhibit D to Case Declaration, #27 Declaration of Juliana Zhu, #28 Declaration of Paul Hicks, #29 Declaration of Denise Clemens, #30 Exhibit A to Clemens Declaration, #31 Exhibit B to Clemens Declaration, #32 Exhibit C to Clemens Declaration, #33 Exhibit D to Clemens Declaration, #34 Exhibit E to Clemens Declaration, #35 Exhibit F to Clemens Declaration, #36 Exhibit G to Clemens Declaration, #37 Exhibit H to Clemens Declaration, #38 Declaration of Robert W. Crandall, #39 Objections to Plaintiffs' Materials)(Case, Hope)
September 8, 2019 Filing 18 Amendment to First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify Class Action #16 Exhibit 1 to Compendium of Evidence - Declaration of David D. Bibiyan filed by Plaintiffs Amber Pardue, Jennifer Vargas. (Aviles, Diego)
September 6, 2019 Filing 17 Amendment to First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify Class Action #16 Amended Proposed Order filed by Plaintiffs Amber Pardue, Jennifer Vargas. (Aviles, Diego)
September 6, 2019 Filing 16 First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify Class Action filed by plaintiff Amber Pardue, Jennifer Vargas. Motion set for hearing on 10/7/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Manuel L. Real. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Compendium of Evidence, #2 Exhibit Declaration of David D. Bibiyan, #3 Exhibit Deposition of Paul Hicks, #4 Exhibit Deposition of Denise Clemens, #5 Declaration Declaration of Dominique Chavez, #6 Declaration Declaration of Michael Munoz, #7 Declaration Declaration of Charity Trask, #8 Declaration Declaration of Jennifer Vargas, #9 Declaration Declaration of Amber Pardue, #10 Declaration Expert Declaration of Bennett S. Berger, #11 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Aviles, Diego)
August 21, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: The Honorable R. Gary Klausner, United States District Judge, will be handling this case pending reassignment. However, all appropriate oral and written communication shall continue to be directed to Christine Chung, Courtroom Deputy Clerk to Judge Real, at 213-894-5696. Until reassignment of this case, counsel and parties shall continue to send mandatory chambers copies of all electronically filed documents, to courtroom 880 on the 8th Floor of the Roybal Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, 255 East Temple Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012, and send proposed orders to R_chambers@cacd.uscourts.gov. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cch) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 15, 2019 Filing 14 Pursuant to General Order 05-07, all discovery-related motions should be noticed for hearing before the assigned magistrate judge. Any pending discovery matters are hereby transferred to the assigned magistrate judge. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrey) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 29, 2019 Filing 13 STATUS REPORT Rule 26(f) Joint Statement filed by Defendants CBC Restaurant Corp., Juliana Zhu. (Holly, Jennifer)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION OF ALL PARTIES FOR RELIEF FROM COMPLIANCE WITH LOCAL RULE 23-3 #11 by Judge Manuel L. Real. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The time frame set forth in Local Rule 23-3 shall be extended. The last day for Plaintiffs to file their Motion for Class Certification is September 6, 2019. The hearing for the Motion for Class Certification shall be set no later than October 7, 2019. (lom)
May 31, 2019 Filing 11 First STIPULATION for Relief from Local Rule 23-3 filed by plaintiff Amber Pardue. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of David D. Bibiyan, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order PDF)(Aviles, Diego)
May 15, 2019 Filing 10 TEXT ONLY SCHEDULING NOTICE RE EARLY MEETING REPORT/JOINT RULE 26(f) REPORT. Pursuant to Judge Real's Order Re: Notice to Counsel, the early meeting report / joint rule 26(f) report is due on or before June 29, 2019. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cch) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE: NOTICE TO COUNSEL upon filing of the complaint by Judge Manuel L. Real. READ CAREFULLY - FAILURE TO COMPLY MAY LEAD TO SANCTIONS. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (cch)
May 7, 2019 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants CBC Restaurant Corp., Juliana Zhu, re Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #7 served on 05/07/2019. (Case, Hope)
May 7, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Manuel L. Real and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (et)
May 6, 2019 Filing 6 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants CBC Restaurant Corp., Juliana Zhu, re Errata, #5 served on 05/06/2019. (Case, Hope)
May 6, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendants CBC Restaurant Corp., Juliana Zhu. correcting Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,, #1 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D - Declaration of Denise Clemens, #2 Declaration of Hope Anne Case)(Case, Hope)
May 6, 2019 Filing 4 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants CBC Restaurant Corp., Juliana Zhu, re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,, #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 served on 05/03/2019. (Case, Hope)
May 3, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER THIRD AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed by Defendants CBC Restaurant Corp., Juliana Zhu. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 5/3/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT C AS ATTACHMENT NO. 60 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 . (Attorney Jenna W Logoluso added to party CBC Restaurant Corp.(pty:dft), Attorney Jenna W Logoluso added to party Juliana Zhu(pty:dft)) (et)
May 3, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF THIRD AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Defendants CBC Restaurant Corp., Does 1 through 100, inclusive, Juliana Zhu. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiffs Amber Pardue, Jennifer Vargas [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 4/30/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT A AS ATTACHMENT NO. 1 #1 .(et)
May 3, 2019 CONFORMED COPY ORIGINAL FILED OF ANSWER TO SECOND AMENDED CLASS ACTION filed by Defendants CBC Restaurant Corp., Juliana Zhu. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 9/17/2018 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT B-38 AS ATTACHMENT NO. 39 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 . (et)
May 3, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF SECOND AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Defendants CBC Restaurant Corp., Does 1 through 100, inclusive, Juliana Zhu. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiffs Amber Pardue, Jennifer Vargas. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 8/22/2018 SUBMITTED TO EXHIBIT B-37 AS ATTACHMENT NO. 38 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 . (et)
May 3, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Amber Pardue, Jennifer Vargas, upon Defendant Juliana Zhu acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 6/26/2018, answer due 7/17/2018. Acknowledgment of Service signed by David D. Bibiyan, Defendant Juliana Zhu. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 7/31/2018 SUBMITTED TO EXHIBIT B-30 AS ATTACHMENT NO. 31 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 . (et)
May 3, 2019 CONFORMED COPY ORIGINAL FILED ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Defendant CBC Restaurant Corp. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 6/28/2018 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT B-24 AS ATTACHMENT NO. 25 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 . (et)
May 3, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND AMENDED COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Amber Pardue, Jennifer Vargas, upon Defendant CBC Restaurant Corp. served on 5/11/2018, answer due 6/1/2018. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 6/8/2018 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT B-17 AS ATTACHMENT NO. 18 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 . (et)
May 3, 2019 CONFORMED COPY ORIGINAL FILED FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Defendants CBC Restaurant Corp., Does 1 through 100, inclusive, Juliana Zhu. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiffs Amber Pardue, Jennifer Vargas [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 5/9/2018 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT B-13 AS ATTACHMENT NO. 14 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 . (et)
May 3, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Amber Pardue, Jennifer Vargas, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Becky DeGeorge (CSC)-Agent for Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 4/13/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT B-10 AS ATTACHMENT NO. 11 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 . (et)
May 3, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Amber Pardue, Jennifer Vargas, upon Defendant CBC Restaurant Corp. served on 2/13/2018, answer due 3/6/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Becky DeGeorge (CSC)-Agent for Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 3/1/2018 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT B-8 AS ATTACHMENT NO. 9 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 . (et)
May 3, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Defendants CBC Restaurant Corp., Does 1 through 100, inclusive. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiffs Amber Pardue, Jennifer Vargas. {FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/7/2018 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT B-3 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL AS ATTACHMENT NO. 4 #1 . (et)
May 3, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants CBC Restaurant Corp., Juliana Zhu, identifying Il Fornaio (America) Corp.. (Case, Hope)
May 3, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants CBC Restaurant Corp., Juliana Zhu. (Case, Hope)
May 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, Los Angeles County, case number BC693274 Receipt No: 0973-23677651 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants Juliana Zhu, CBC Restaurant Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Third Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-1, #3 Exhibit B-2, #4 Exhibit B-3, #5 Exhibit B-4, #6 Exhibit B-5, #7 Exhibit B-6, #8 Exhibit B-7, #9 Exhibit B-8, #10 Exhibit B-9, #11 Exhibit B-10, #12 Exhibit B-11, #13 Exhibit B-12, #14 Exhibit B-13, #15 Exhibit B-14, #16 Exhibit B-15, #17 Exhibit B-16, #18 Exhibit B-17, #19 Exhibit B-18, #20 Exhibit B-19, #21 Exhibit B-20, #22 Exhibit B-21, #23 Exhibit B-22, #24 Exhibit B-23, #25 Exhibit B-24, #26 Exhibit B-25, #27 Exhibit B-26, #28 Exhibit B-27, #29 Exhibit B-28, #30 Exhibit B-29, #31 Exhibit B-30, #32 Exhibit B-31, #33 Exhibit B-32, #34 Exhibit B-33, #35 Exhibit B-34, #36 Exhibit B-35, #37 Exhibit B-36, #38 Exhibit B-37, #39 Exhibit B-38, #40 Exhibit B-39, #41 Exhibit B-40, #42 Exhibit B-41, #43 Exhibit B-42, #44 Exhibit B-43, #45 Exhibit B-44, #46 Exhibit B-45, #47 Exhibit B-46, #48 Exhibit B-47, #49 Exhibit B-48, #50 Exhibit B-49, #51 Exhibit B-50, #52 Exhibit B-51, #53 Exhibit B-52, #54 Exhibit B-53, #55 Exhibit B-54, #56 Exhibit B-55, #57 Exhibit B-56, #58 Exhibit B-57, #59 Exhibit B-58, #60 Exhibit C - Answer to Third Amended Complaint, #61 Exhibit D - Declaration of Denise Clemens, #62 Exhibit E - Pardue's Amended PAGA Notice) (Attorney Hope Anne Case added to party CBC Restaurant Corp.(pty:dft), Attorney Hope Anne Case added to party Juliana Zhu(pty:dft))(Case, Hope)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amber Pardue et al v. CBC Restaurant Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBC Restaurant Corp.
Represented By: Hope Anne Case
Represented By: Jennifer Marie Holly
Represented By: Elaisha Nandrajog
Represented By: Luanne Sacks
Represented By: Jenna W Logoluso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juliana Zhu
Represented By: Hope Anne Case
Represented By: Jennifer Marie Holly
Represented By: Elaisha Nandrajog
Represented By: Luanne Sacks
Represented By: Jenna W Logoluso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amber Pardue
Represented By: Diego F Aviles
Represented By: David D Bibiyan
Represented By: Mikael Hans Stahle
Represented By: Tagore Subramaniam
Represented By: Matthew John Matern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Vargas
Represented By: Diego F Aviles
Represented By: David D Bibiyan
Represented By: Tagore Subramaniam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?