Ellen Marshall v. Travelers et al

Plaintiff: Ellen Marshall
Defendant: DOES 1 - 100, inclusive, John Braddock, The Travelers Indemnity Company, The Travelers Companies, Inc., The Traveleres Indemnity Company, Travelers, Does 1 through 100, inclusive and Travelers Companies Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv03929
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John E McDermott
Referring Judge: Manuel L Real
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR Re: Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed 6/28/2019 #17 . Due to clerical error, the docket entry did not reflect the correct signing judge. The docket text shall be modified to reflect the signing judge as Judge R. Gary Klausner. (gk)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge R. Gary Klausner: This Court deems Plaintiff's failure to oppose consent to grant the motion. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' Motion to Dismiss #8 is GRANTED. ( MD JS-6. Case Terminated ) (gk) Modified on 7/1/2019 (gk).
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ONLY SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Manuel L. Real, The Court has determined that Motion to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants John Braddock, Does, The Traveleres Indemnity Company, Travelers, Travelers Companies Inc #8 set for hearing on June 17, 2019 at 10:00 A.M. is suitable for a decision on the papers as filed by all parties without the need for oral argument. Therefore, the said motion is taken UNDER SUBMISSION on the papers as filed and the hearing date of June 17, 2019 is VACATED and TAKEN OFF CALENDAR. The Court will issue its ruling on the matter in due course. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dbu) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 3, 2019 Filing 15 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #8 and Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by Defendants John Braddock, Does, The Traveleres Indemnity Company, Travelers, Travelers Companies Inc. (O'Malley, Joel)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER RE: NOTICE TO COUNSEL upon filing of the complaint by Judge Manuel L. Real. READ CAREFULLY - FAILURE TO COMPLY MAY LEAD TO SANCTIONS. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (cch)
May 13, 2019 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #8 and Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by Defendants John Braddock, Does, The Traveleres Indemnity Company, Travelers, Travelers Companies Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(O'Malley, Joel)
May 13, 2019 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Daniel Riggott in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #8 and Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by Defendants John Braddock, Does, The Traveleres Indemnity Company, Travelers, Travelers Companies Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(O'Malley, Joel)
May 13, 2019 Filing 11 DECLARATION of Cecil Murphy in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #8 filed by Defendants John Braddock, Does, The Traveleres Indemnity Company, Travelers, Travelers Companies Inc. (O'Malley, Joel)
May 13, 2019 Filing 10 DECLARATION of Joel O'Malley in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #8 and Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by Defendants John Braddock, Does, The Traveleres Indemnity Company, Travelers, Travelers Companies Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(O'Malley, Joel)
May 13, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #8 and Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by Defendants John Braddock, Does, The Traveleres Indemnity Company, Travelers, Travelers Companies Inc. (O'Malley, Joel)
May 13, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants John Braddock, Does, The Traveleres Indemnity Company, Travelers, Travelers Companies Inc. Motion set for hearing on 6/17/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Manuel L. Real. (Attorney Joel D O'Malley added to party Does(pty:dft)) (O'Malley, Joel)
May 7, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Manuel L. Real and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (lh)
May 6, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants John Braddock, Does 1 through 100, The Traveleres Indemnity Company, Travelers, Travelers Companies Inc. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Ellen Marshall. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 3/27/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL, DOCUMENT 1-1 #1 ) (lh)
May 6, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants John Braddock, DOES 1 - 100, inclusive, The Travelers Companies, Inc., The Travelers Indemnity Company, identifying None. (O'Malley, Joel)
May 6, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants John Braddock, DOES 1 - 100, inclusive, The Travelers Companies, Inc., The Travelers Indemnity Company. (O'Malley, Joel)
May 6, 2019 Filing 4 DECLARATION of Wendy C. Skjerven re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Defendants John Braddock, DOES 1 - 100, inclusive, The Travelers Companies, Inc., The Travelers Indemnity Company. (O'Malley, Joel)
May 6, 2019 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Ann B. Mulcahy re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Defendants John Braddock, DOES 1 - 100, inclusive, The Travelers Companies, Inc., The Travelers Indemnity Company. (O'Malley, Joel)
May 6, 2019 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Joel O'Malley re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Defendants John Braddock, DOES 1 - 100, inclusive, The Travelers Companies, Inc., The Travelers Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(O'Malley, Joel)
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 19STCV10686 Receipt No: 0973-23680204 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants John Braddock, The Travelers Companies, Inc., The Travelers Indemnity Company, DOES 1 - 100, inclusive. (Attachments: #1 State Court Record) (Attorney Joel D O'Malley added to party John Braddock(pty:dft), Attorney Joel D O'Malley added to party DOES 1 - 100, inclusive(pty:dft), Attorney Joel D O'Malley added to party The Travelers Companies, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Joel D O'Malley added to party The Travelers Indemnity Company(pty:dft))(O'Malley, Joel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ellen Marshall v. Travelers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 - 100, inclusive
Represented By: Joel D O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Braddock
Represented By: Joel D O'Malley
Represented By: Nicole Feliciano Dailo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Travelers Indemnity Company
Represented By: Joel D O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Travelers Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Joel D O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Traveleres Indemnity Company
Represented By: Nicole Feliciano Dailo
Represented By: Joel D O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers
Represented By: Nicole Feliciano Dailo
Represented By: Joel D O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100, inclusive
Represented By: Joel D O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Companies Inc
Represented By: Nicole Feliciano Dailo
Represented By: Joel D O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ellen Marshall
Represented By: MaryAnn P Gallagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?