Fortino Sanchez v. Nancy A. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Fortino Sanchez
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 2:2019cv04017
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Valerie Baker Fairbank
Referring Judge: Rozella A Oliver
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Attorney Jean M Turk added to party Nancy A. Berryhill(pty:dft))(Turk, Jean)
May 21, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Fortino Sanchez, upon Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill served on 5/10/2019, answer due 7/9/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Leidner, Suzanne)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE: PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL by Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. Plaintiff will promptly serve the summons and complaint on the government in accordance with Rule 4(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Plaintiff will file1 an appropriate proof of service within 30 days of the date of this Order. Government counsel must file a notice of appearance within 30 days of service of the action. See Order for details. (dml)
May 9, 2019 Filing 8 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (dml)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver: granting #5 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (dml)
May 8, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Valerie Baker Fairbank and referred to Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (et)
May 8, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by plaintiff Fortino Sanchez. (Leidner, Suzanne)
May 8, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Fortino Sanchez. (Leidner, Suzanne)
May 8, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Fortino Sanchez, (Leidner, Suzanne)
May 8, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Fortino Sanchez. (Leidner, Suzanne)
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by plaintiff Fortino Sanchez. (Attorney Suzanne C Leidner added to party Fortino Sanchez(pty:pla))(Leidner, Suzanne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fortino Sanchez v. Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Jean M Turk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fortino Sanchez
Represented By: Suzanne C Leidner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?