Tac Tran v. United States of America

Petitioner: Tac Tran and UNITED STATES OF AMERICA,
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2019cv04025
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Otis D Wright
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2019 Filing 8 REPLY in support of Petitioner Tac Tran's Motion for Relief Under 28 USC 2255 filed by Petitioner Tac Tran. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kim Savo dated 6/10/2019)(Burns, Todd)
May 30, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE of Assistant United States Attorney Rosalind Wang on behalf of Respondent United States of America. (Attorney Rosalind Wang added to party United States of America(pty:res))(Wang, Rosalind)
May 24, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Opposition filed by Respondent United States of America. Opposition to 2255 Motion (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Wang, Rosalind)
May 21, 2019 Filing 5 Certificate of Service filed by Petitioner Tac Tran re: Motion to Vacate, Set Aside, or Correct Sentence (28:2255) (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #2 (Burns, Todd)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: RE Motion to Vacate, Set Aside, or Correct Sentence (28:2255) (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #2 : United States Attorney file a return to the motion on or before May 28, 2019 accompanied by all records, and that respondent serve a copy of the return upon petitioner prior to the filing thereof. If the petitioner desires to file a traverse to the return, he shall do so by June 17, 2019. (lc) Modified on 5/10/2019 (lc).
May 9, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II for motion filed under 28 U.S.C. 2255. (et)
May 8, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside, or Correct Sentence, Pursuant to 28 USC 2255 in Criminal Case No. 12-cr-1016, filed by Movant Tac Tran. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibits A-G to Memorandum Supporting 28 USC 2255 Motion) (Attorney Todd W Burns added to party Tac Tran(pty:bkmov))(Burns, Todd)
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movant Tac Tran. (Burns, Todd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tac Tran v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Tac Tran
Represented By: Todd W Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Rosalind Wang
Represented By: Assistant 2241-2255 US Attorney LA-CR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?