Angel Chow v. Central Health Plan of California, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Angel Chow
Defendant: Allied Physicians of California, A Professional Medical Corporation, Network Medical Management, Inc., Central Health Plan of California, Inc. and Does 1 through 50, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2019cv04051
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles F Eick
Referring Judge: Fernando M Olguin
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER RE: SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER RE: JURY TRIAL by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The court deems a Scheduling Conference unnecessary and hereby vacates the hearing. Jury Trial set for 7/14/2020 at 8:45 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. *See order for dates, deadlines and requirements imposed.* (vdr)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Central Health Plan of California, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss #14 is granted. Network Medical Management, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss #18 is granted. If plaintiff still wishes to pursue this action, she is granted until 7/8/2019, to file a first amended complaint. (vdr)
June 27, 2019 Filing 36 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 10-14 days, filed by Defendant Network Medical Management, Inc... (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Trinh, Mary)
June 27, 2019 Filing 35 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #18 filed by Defendant Network Medical Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Gargalis, Christy)
June 27, 2019 Filing 34 REPLY to Opposition of Plaintiff to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #18 filed by Defendant Network Medical Management, Inc.. (Gargalis, Christy)
June 19, 2019 Filing 33 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Camille A Sespene counsel for Defendant Allied Physicians of California, A Professional Medical Corporation. Adding Camille A. Sespene as counsel of record for Allied Physicians of California for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Allied Physicians of California. (Attorney Camille A Sespene added to party Allied Physicians of California, A Professional Medical Corporation(pty:dft))(Sespene, Camille)
June 18, 2019 Filing 32 Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #18 Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant Network Medical Management Inc.'s Request for Judicial Notice in Support of its Motion to Dismiss and to Strike filed by Plaintiff Angel Chow. (Chow, David)
June 17, 2019 Filing 31 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE In Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant Network Medical Management Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss and to Strike Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Plaintiff Angel Chow. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Chow, David)
June 17, 2019 Filing 30 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #18 filed by Plaintiff Angel Chow. (Chow, David)
June 14, 2019 Filing 29 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. On the court's own motion, the Motion to Dismiss #14 and Joinder #22 are taken off the 6/20/2019 calendar and placed under submission. No appearances are required on 6/20/2019. An order with the court's ruling will issue. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 6, 2019 Filing 28 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) and Rule 12(b)(6) #14 filed by Defendant Central Health Plan of California, Inc.. (Metzidis, John)
May 29, 2019 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) and Rule 12(b)(6) #14 filed by Plaintiff Angel Chow. (Chow, David)
May 29, 2019 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Re: ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE [ECF Dkt. 16.] of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Angel Chow, (Chow, David)
May 29, 2019 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Angel Chow, identifying Central Health Plan of California, Inc., Network Medical Management, Inc., Allied Physicians of California, A Professional Medical Corporation. (Chow, David)
May 28, 2019 Filing 24 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Allied Physicians of California, A Professional Medical Corporation (Lo, Philip)
May 28, 2019 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Allied Physicians of California, A Professional Medical Corporation, identifying Central Health Plan of California, Inc., Network Medical Management, Inc., Angel Chow. (Lo, Philip)
May 28, 2019 Filing 22 JOINDER in NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) and Rule 12(b)(6) #14 filed by Defendant Allied Physicians of California, A Professional Medical Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Philip Hsing-Tsung Lo added to party Allied Physicians of California, A Professional Medical Corporation(pty:dft))(Lo, Philip)
May 28, 2019 Filing 21 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss #18 is hereby continued to 7/11/2019 at 10:00 AM. The date selected by counsel is a closed motion date. Future motions that are not in compliance may be stricken. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 24, 2019 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Network Medical Management, Inc., identifying Ironshore, Allied Physicians of California, Central Health Plan of California, and Angel Chow. (Gargalis, Christy)
May 24, 2019 Filing 19 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) and Rule 12(b)(6) #14 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #18 filed by Defendant Network Medical Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Gargalis, Christy)
May 24, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Network Medical Management, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 6/27/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Christy Gargalis added to party Network Medical Management, Inc.(pty:dft)) (Gargalis, Christy)
May 21, 2019 Filing 17 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Scheduling Conference set for 7/11/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr)
May 20, 2019 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) and Rule 12(b)(6) #14 filed by Defendant Central Health Plan of California, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jose Vega, #2 Exhibit A)(Metzidis, John)
May 20, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) and Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Defendant Central Health Plan of California, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 6/20/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Metzidis, John)
May 17, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Network Medical Management, Inc. answer now due 5/24/2019, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Network Medical Management, Inc..(Attorney Mary Chien Trinh added to party Network Medical Management, Inc.(pty:dft))(Trinh, Mary)
May 13, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance #8 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel G123. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
May 10, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
May 10, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (et)
May 9, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF E-FILED VERIFIED COMPLAINT against Defendants Allied Physicians of California, A Professional Medical Corporation, Central Health Plan of California, Inc., Does 1 through 50, inclusive, Network Medical Management, Inc. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Angel Chow. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 4/3/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 . (et)
May 9, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to filed by Defendant Central Health Plan of California, Inc..(Metzidis, John)
May 9, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Courtney Puritsky on behalf of Defendant Central Health Plan of California, Inc. (Attorney Courtney Puritsky added to party Central Health Plan of California, Inc.(pty:dft))(Puritsky, Courtney)
May 9, 2019 Filing 7 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Central Health Plan of California, Inc., Re: Notice of Removal and Related Papers served on May 9, 2019. (Metzidis, John)
May 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Compliance with 28 U.S.C. Section 1446(d) filed by Defendant Central Health Plan of California, Inc.. (Metzidis, John)
May 9, 2019 Filing 5 DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Defendant Central Health Plan of California, Inc... (Metzidis, John)
May 9, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Central Health Plan of California, Inc. identifying AHMC Central Health LLC as Corporate Parent. (Metzidis, John)
May 9, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Central Health Plan of California, Inc., identifying AHMC Central Health LLC, OneBeacon Healthcare Group. (Metzidis, John)
May 9, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Central Health Plan of California, Inc.. (Metzidis, John)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 19STCV11736 Receipt No: 0973-23707147 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Central Health Plan of California, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A [Complaint], #2 Exhibit B [Summons and Other Process, Pleadings, and Orders]) (Attorney John J Metzidis added to party Central Health Plan of California, Inc.(pty:dft))(Metzidis, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Angel Chow v. Central Health Plan of California, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel Chow
Represented By: Michael Shen
Represented By: David P Chow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied Physicians of California, A Professional Medical Corporation
Represented By: Camille A Sespene
Represented By: Philip Hsing-Tsung Lo
Represented By: Courtney C Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Network Medical Management, Inc.
Represented By: Mary Chien Trinh
Represented By: William D Naeve
Represented By: Christy Gargalis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Health Plan of California, Inc.
Represented By: John J Metzidis
Represented By: Courtney Puritsky
Represented By: Allen B Grodsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?