SA Music, LLC et al v. Apple, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: SA Music, LLC and Harold Arlen Trust
Defendant: Xelon Entertainment Pty. Ltd., Blaricum C.D. Company (B.C.D.) BV, The Orchard Enterprises, Inc., Google Inc., OVC Media, Reloaded Music, Vintage Music SL, Orchard Enterprises, NY, Inc., Pink Dot, Avid Group, ROBA Music Verlag GmbH, Henry Hadaway Organization Limited, Hasmick Promotions Limited, Cugate Ltd., Lionfish Music, LLC, Classics, Best Records, Phonofile AS, Believe, SAS, Google LLC, Werner Last's Favourites Jazz, Gralin Music, Isolation Network, Inc., Entertain Me Ltd., J. Joes J. Edizioni Musicali, Naxos of America, Inc., Second Wind Digital, Amazon Digital Services LLC, Primephonic USA Inc., Jazzsential, Marathon Media Int. Ltd., Michael Bennett, Acrobat Music Ltd., Pickwick Group Limited, Shami Media Inc., Pandora Media, Inc., Defendant Believe, Apple, Inc., Broken Audio, Amazon.com, Inc., Jazz Co., Move, CTS Digital, Bacci Bros Records, Wnts, Railroad, TVP, Inc., Triton, Ideal Music, Future Noise Music Limited, Smith & Co B.V., Digital Gramophone, Cleopatra Records, Inc., Thomas Colley, Historical Jazz, Vintage Records, AP Music Ltd, The State51 Conspiracy Ltd, Microsoft Corporation, Plaza Mayor Company Limited, JOHN DOE(S) 1-10, Blue Sounds, SendDigital, Adasam Limited, Mach60 Music, DWK Records, Brisa Records, Jazz Moon, Rarity Music, Plenty Jazz Records, Cherished Records, Believe Digital SAS, Impressions, Favorite Classics, Werner Lasts Favourites Jazz, John Doe, Believe, Smith and Co B.V. and Blaricum C.D. Company B.C.D. BV
Case Number: 2:2019cv04073
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Rozella A Oliver
Referring Judge: John F Walter
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 110 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to August 19, 2019 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nadolenco, John)
July 3, 2019 Filing 109 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Emily Renda Fox counsel for Defendant Microsoft Corporation. Adding Emily R. Fox as counsel of record for Microsoft Corporation for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Microsoft Corporation. (Attorney Emily Renda Fox added to party Microsoft Corporation(pty:dft))(Fox, Emily)
July 3, 2019 Filing 108 APPLICATION for Refund of Fees Paid filed by Defendant Google LLC. (Nadolenco, John)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Gabrielle F. Levin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Apple Inc., designating Ilissa S. Samplin as local counsel #103 . (iv)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Allison L. Stillman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Google LLC, designating John Nadolenco as local counsel #90 . (iv)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney John P. Mancini to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Google LLC, designating John Nadolenco as local counsel #89 . (iv)
July 2, 2019 Filing 104 DECLARATION of A. John P. Mancini Declaration of Lead Counsel: Compliance with rules governing ECF filing filed by Defendant Google LLC. (Nadolenco, John)
June 28, 2019 Filing 103 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Gabrielle F. Levin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Apple, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24004836) filed by Defendant Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE) (Samplin, Ilissa)
June 28, 2019 Filing 102 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Harold Arlen Trust, SA Music, LLC, upon Defendant Plaza Mayor Company Limited served on 6/13/2019, answer due 7/5/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon J. Jonsons (role unknown) in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified.Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaza Mayor website contact page, #2 Exhibit Plaza Mayor corporate filing, #3 Exhibit Fedex confirmation of delivery)(Schwartz, Matthew)
June 28, 2019 Filing 101 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Harold Arlen Trust, SA Music, LLC, upon Defendant Pickwick Group Limited served on 6/13/2019, answer due 7/5/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon S. Jackson - Secretary in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified.Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Pickwick website contact page, #2 Exhibit Pickwick corporate filing, #3 Exhibit Fedex confirmation of delivery)(Schwartz, Matthew)
June 28, 2019 Filing 100 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Harold Arlen Trust, SA Music, LLC, upon Defendant Marathon Media Int. Ltd. served on 6/14/2019, answer due 7/5/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon L. Long (role unknown) in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified.Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Marathon website contact page, #2 Exhibit Marathon corporate filing, #3 Exhibit Fedex confirmation of delivery)(Schwartz, Matthew)
June 28, 2019 Filing 99 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Harold Arlen Trust, SA Music, LLC, upon Defendant Hasmick Promotions Limited served on 6/13/2019, answer due 7/5/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon J. Ford - unknown role in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified.Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Hasmick website contact page, #2 Exhibit Hasmick corporate filing, #3 Exhibit Fedex confirmation of delivery)(Schwartz, Matthew)
June 28, 2019 Filing 98 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Harold Arlen Trust, SA Music, LLC, upon Defendant Future Noise Music Limited served on 6/14/2019, answer due 7/5/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon unknown in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified.Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Future Noise corporate filing, #2 Exhibit Fedex confirmation of delivery)(Schwartz, Matthew)
June 28, 2019 Filing 97 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Harold Arlen Trust, SA Music, LLC, upon Defendant AP Music Ltd served on 6/13/2019, answer due 7/5/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon E. Lisa / unknown role in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified.Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit AP Music corporate filing, #2 Exhibit AP Music dissolution, #3 Exhibit Fedex confirmation of delivery)(Schwartz, Matthew)
June 28, 2019 Filing 96 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Harold Arlen Trust, SA Music, LLC, upon Defendant Adasam Limited served on 6/13/2019, answer due 7/5/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon C McRae - unknoiwn role in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified.Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Adasam corporate filing, #2 Exhibit Adasam corporate filing, #3 Exhibit Archived Adasam wesbite contact page, #4 Exhibit Fedex confirmation of delivery)(Schwartz, Matthew)
June 28, 2019 Filing 95 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Harold Arlen Trust, SA Music, LLC, upon Defendant Acrobat Music Ltd. served on 6/13/2019, answer due 7/5/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Paul Watts - General Manager in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified.Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Acrobat Website Contact Page, #2 Exhibit Acrobat corporate filing, #3 Exhibit Fedex confirmation of delivery)(Schwartz, Matthew)
June 28, 2019 Filing 94 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Harold Arlen Trust, SA Music, LLC, upon Defendant Pandora Media, Inc. served on 5/28/2019, answer due 7/18/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System its registered agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Schwartz, Matthew)
June 28, 2019 Filing 93 NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Harold Arlen Trust, SA Music, LLC, upon Defendant Cleopatra Records, Inc. acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 6/26/2019, answer due 7/17/2019. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Peter Anderson, Attorney. (Schwartz, Matthew)
June 28, 2019 Filing 92 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Harold Arlen Trust, SA Music, LLC, upon Defendant Naxos of America, Inc. served on 6/26/2019, answer due 7/17/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon National Registered Agents, Inc. of NJ - its registered agent in compliance with statute not specified by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Schwartz, Matthew)
June 28, 2019 Filing 91 NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Harold Arlen Trust, SA Music, LLC, upon Defendant Acknowledgment of Service signed by Peter Anderson, Attorney. (Schwartz, Matthew)
June 27, 2019 Filing 90 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Allison L. Stillman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Google LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23996250) filed by Defendant Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Nadolenco, John)
June 27, 2019 Filing 89 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney A. John P. Mancini to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Google LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23995878) filed by Defendant Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Nadolenco, John)
June 27, 2019 Filing 88 DECLARATION of Matthew F. Schwartz Declaration of Lead Counsel: Compliance with rules governing ECF filing filed by Plaintiffs Harold Arlen Trust, SA Music, LLC. (Schwartz, Matthew)
June 26, 2019 Filing 87 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff SA Music, LLC, upon Defendant Shami Media Inc. served on 5/17/2019, answer due 6/7/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Sue Zouky Authorized Agent in the office of the Secretary of State of New York, pursuant to 306 Business Corporation Code of New York in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Hyman, Allen)
June 26, 2019 Filing 86 DECLARATION of Arthur Wallace Declaration of Lead Counsel; Compliance with rules governing ECF filing filed by Defendant TVP, Inc.. (Wallace, Arthur)
June 26, 2019 Filing 85 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff SA Music, LLC, upon Defendant TVP, Inc. served on 5/17/2019, answer due 7/8/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Kaylee Person, Cheyenne, Wyoming Secretary for National Registered Agents as Registered Agent for TVP Inc. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Hyman, Allen)
June 26, 2019 Filing 84 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff SA Music, LLC, upon Defendant The Orchard Enterprises, Inc. served on 5/29/2019, answer due 7/26/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Corporation Service Company, Registered Agent in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Hyman, Allen)
June 26, 2019 Filing 83 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff SA Music, LLC, upon Defendant Orchard Enterprises, NY, Inc. served on 5/29/2019, answer due 7/26/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Corporation Service Company, Registered Agent in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Hyman, Allen)
June 25, 2019 Filing 82 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiff SA Music, LLC. upon Amazon Digital Services LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/19/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. Waiver of Service signed by Kenneth L. Steinthal. (Hyman, Allen)
June 25, 2019 Filing 81 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiff SA Music, LLC. upon Amazon.com, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/19/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. Waiver of Service signed by Kenneth L. Steinthal. (Hyman, Allen)
June 25, 2019 Filing 80 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff SA Music, LLC, upon Defendant Apple, Inc. served on 5/28/2019, answer due 7/18/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporate Systems Registered Agent in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Hyman, Allen)
June 25, 2019 Filing 79 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff SA Music, LLC, upon Defendant Google LLC served on 5/29/2019, answer due 7/19/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Corporation Service Company, Registered Agent in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Hyman, Allen)
June 25, 2019 Filing 78 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff SA Music, LLC, upon Defendant Cleopatra Records, Inc. served on 5/28/2019, answer due 6/18/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Office of Evan Cohen, Registered Agent in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Hyman, Allen)
June 25, 2019 Filing 77 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff SA Music, LLC, upon Defendant Isolation Network, Inc. served on 5/28/2019, answer due 7/18/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporate Systems in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Hyman, Allen)
June 25, 2019 Filing 76 DISCLOSURE Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Apple, Inc. (Edelman, Scott)
June 25, 2019 Filing 75 NOTICE Demand for Jury Trial filed by plaintiff SA Music, LLC. (Hyman, Allen)
June 24, 2019 Filing 74 DECLARATION of David A. Steinberg Lead Trial Counsel Re: Compliance with Local Rules Governing Electronic Filing filed by Defendant Isolation Network, Inc.. (Steinberg, David)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: granting #30 #67 Non-Resident Attorney Arthur Louis Wallace III APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of TVP, Inc, designating Anthony R Lopez as local counsel. (lom)
June 24, 2019 Filing 72 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Defendant SA Music, LLC, upon Defendant Microsoft Corporation served on 5/29/2019, answer due 7/19/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Corporation Service Company, Registered Agent in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Hyman, Allen)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT #59 by Judge John F. Walter. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the time for defendants The Orchard Enterprises, Inc., and Orchard Enterprises, NY, Inc., to respond to plaintiffs' complaint be and hereby is extended to July 26, 2019. (lom)
June 24, 2019 Filing 70 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiff SA Music, LLC. upon Lionfish Music, LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/21/2019, answer due 8/20/2019. Waiver of Service signed by Neville L. Johnson. (Hyman, Allen)
June 24, 2019 Filing 69 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Arthur Louis Wallace III to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant TVP, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 6/12/2019, Receipt No. 26I3GN2V) #67 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. (lt)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 68 Order re Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint by 30 Days #49 by Judge John F. Walter. It is hereby ordered that, for good cause shown, Microsoft Corporation's deadline to respond to the Complaint shall be July 19, 2019. (lom)
June 24, 2019 Filing 67 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Arthur Louis Wallace III to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant TVP, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 6/12/2019, Receipt No. 26I3GN2V) filed by defendant TVP, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lopez, Anthony)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER RE JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND INITIAL COMPLAINT BY NOT MORE THAN 30 DAYS #63 by Judge John F. Walter. It is hereby ordered that, for good cause shown, TVP, Inc's deadline to respond to the Complaint shall be extended to July 8, 2019. (iv)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF SUBSTITUTION OR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY #60 #61 by Judge John F. Walter. The request of SA Music, LLC and Harold Arlen Trust to substitute Allen Hyman as attorney of record instead of Henry L. Self, III, Ryan Powers is GRANTED. (iv)
June 21, 2019 Filing 64 DECLARATION of Simon J. Frankel re: Compliance with Local Rules Governing Electronic Filing filed by Defendant Microsoft Corporation. (Frankel, Simon)
June 20, 2019 Filing 63 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to TVP, Inc. answer now due 7/8/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by defendant TVP, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lopez, Anthony)
June 20, 2019 Filing 62 DECLARATION of David R. Singh (Lead Trial Counsel) re: Compliance with Local Rules Governing Electronic Filing filed by Defendant Pandora Media, Inc.. (Singh, David)
June 19, 2019 Filing 61 REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Allen Hyman in place of attorney Ryan W. Powers filed by plaintiff Harold Arlen Trust. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Powers, Ryan)
June 19, 2019 Filing 60 REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Allen Hyman in place of attorney Ryan W. Powers filed by plaintiff SA Music, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Powers, Ryan)
June 19, 2019 Filing 59 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to July 26, 2019 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by defendants Orchard Enterprises, NY, Inc., The Orchard Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Peter J Anderson added to party Orchard Enterprises, NY, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Peter J Anderson added to party The Orchard Enterprises, Inc.(pty:dft))(Anderson, Peter)
June 19, 2019 Filing 58 DECLARATION of Scott Edelman (Lead Trial Counse) Re: Compliance with Local Rules Governing Electronic Filing filed by Defendant Apple, Inc.. (Edelman, Scott)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER RE STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT BY 30 DAYS #29 by Judge John F. Walter. Pandora Media, LLC's deadline to respond to the Complaint shall be July 18, 2019. (iv)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER RE STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT BY NOT MOE THAN 30 DAYS #44 by Judge John F. Walter. Apple Inc.'s deadline to respond to the Complaint shall be extended to July 18, 2019. (iv)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER RE JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT BY NOT MORE THAN 30 DAYS #52 by Judge John F. Walter. Google LLC's deadline to respond to the Complaint shall be extended to July 19, 2019. (iv)
June 17, 2019 Filing 54 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance #48 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel G123. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
June 17, 2019 Filing 53 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Google LLC, identifying XXVI Holdings, Inc., Alphabet Inc.. (Nadolenco, John)
June 17, 2019 Filing 52 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Google LLC answer now due 7/19/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nadolenco, John)
June 17, 2019 Filing 51 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney John Nadolenco counsel for Defendant Google LLC. Adding John Nadolenco as counsel of record for Google LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Google LLC. (Attorney John Nadolenco added to party Google LLC(pty:dft))(Nadolenco, John)
June 14, 2019 Filing 50 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Microsoft Corporation identifying Microsoft Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Frankel, Simon)
June 14, 2019 Filing 49 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Microsoft Corporation answer now due 7/19/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Frankel, Simon)
June 14, 2019 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Simon J Frankel on behalf of Defendant Microsoft Corporation (Attorney Simon J Frankel added to party Microsoft Corporation(pty:dft))(Frankel, Simon)
June 14, 2019 Filing 47 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance #43 , Notice of Appearance #45 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel G123. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
June 13, 2019 Filing 46 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Arthur Louis Wallace III to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant TVP, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23905907) #30 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Other error(s) with document(s): Please note that electronic, image or stamp signatures are not allowed. (lt)
June 12, 2019 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Ilissa Stacy Samplin on behalf of Defendant Apple, Inc. (Attorney Ilissa Stacy Samplin added to party Apple, Inc.(pty:dft))(Samplin, Ilissa)
June 12, 2019 Filing 44 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to July 18, 2019 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Edelman, Scott)
June 12, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Scott A Edelman on behalf of Defendant Apple, Inc. (Attorney Scott A Edelman added to party Apple, Inc.(pty:dft))(Edelman, Scott)
June 12, 2019 Filing 41 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Isolation Network, Inc. answer now due 7/18/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Isolation Network, Inc..(Attorney Emily F Evitt added to party Isolation Network, Inc.(pty:dft))(Evitt, Emily)
June 12, 2019 Filing 30 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Arthur Louis Wallace III to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant TVP, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23905907) filed by defendant TVP, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order) (Attorney Anthony R Lopez added to party TVP, Inc.(pty:dft)) (Lopez, Anthony)
June 10, 2019 Filing 42 RECEIPT FOR FOREIGN SERVICE from U. S. Post Office for documents Re: ( Civil Cover Sheet #2 , Complaint #1 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #5 , Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint #13 , Report on Filing of Copyright Action #6 , Summons Request #3 ) mailed to Henry Hadaway Organisation Limited, Hatton House-Church Lane Waltham Cross Chestnut HE EN8 0DW on 6/10/2019. (iv)
June 10, 2019 Filing 40 RECEIPT FOR FOREIGN SERVICE from U. S. Post Office for documents Re: ( Civil Cover Sheet #2 , Complaint #1 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #5 , Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint #13 , Report on Filing of Copyright Action #6 , Summons Request #3 ) mailed to AP Music Ltd., Gable House 239 Regents Park Road London LO N3 3LFF on 6/10/2019. (iv)
June 10, 2019 Filing 39 RECEIPT FOR FOREIGN SERVICE from U. S. Post Office for documents Re: ( Civil Cover Sheet #2 , Complaint #1 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #5 , Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint #13 , Report on Filing of Copyright Action #6 , Summons Request #3 ) mailed to Marathon Media Int. Ltd., 41 St. Peters Road Croydon SR CR0 1HN on 6/10/2019. (iv)
June 10, 2019 Filing 38 RECEIPT FOR FOREIGN SERVICE from U. S. Post Office for documents Re: ( Civil Cover Sheet #2 , Complaint #1 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #5 , Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint #13 , Report on Filing of Copyright Action #6 , Summons Request #3 ) mailed to Adasam Limited, The Allbrite Building Darley Dale Rooad Corby NR NN17 2DE on 6/10/2019. (iv)
June 10, 2019 Filing 37 RECEIPT FOR FOREIGN SERVICE from U. S. Post Office for documents Re: ( Civil Cover Sheet #2 , Complaint #1 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #5 , Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint #13 , Report on Filing of Copyright Action #6 , Summons Request #3 ) mailed to Pickwick Group Limited, Merritt House, Suite 1 Second Floor Hill Avenue Amersham BU HP6 5BQ on 6/10/2019. (iv)
June 10, 2019 Filing 36 RECEIPT FOR FOREIGN SERVICE from U. S. Post Office for documents Re: ( Civil Cover Sheet #2 , Complaint #1 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #5 , Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint #13 , Report on Filing of Copyright Action #6 , Summons Request #3 ) mailed to Future Noise Music Limited, 55A Clapham Common North Side London LO SW4 9RX on 6/10/2019. (iv)
June 10, 2019 Filing 35 RECEIPT FOR FOREIGN SERVICE from U. S. Post Office for documents Re: ( Civil Cover Sheet #2 , Complaint #1 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #5 , Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint #13 , Report on Filing of Copyright Action #6 , Summons Request #3 ) mailed to Acrobat Music Ltd., 42A Cannon Lane Pinner, Pinner MI HA5 1HW on 6/10/2019. (iv)
June 10, 2019 Filing 34 RECEIPT FOR FOREIGN SERVICE from U. S. Post Office for documents Re: ( Civil Cover Sheet #2 , Complaint #1 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #5 , Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint #13 , Report on Filing of Copyright Action #6 , Summons Request #3 ) mailed to Plaza Mayor Company Limited, Lower Ground Floor One George Yard London LO EC3V 9DF on 6/10/2019. (iv)
June 10, 2019 Filing 33 RECEIPT FOR FOREIGN SERVICE from U. S. Post Office for documents Re: ( Civil Cover Sheet #2 , Complaint #1 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #5 , Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint #13 , Report on Filing of Copyright Action #6 , Summons Request #3 ) mailed to Avid Group, 15 Metro Centre Dwgiht Road Tolpits Lane Watford WD18 9SS on 6/10/2019. (iv)
June 10, 2019 Filing 32 RECEIPT FOR FOREIGN SERVICE from U. S. Post Office for documents Re: ( Civil Cover Sheet #2 , Complaint #1 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #5 , Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint #13 , Report on Filing of Copyright Action #6 , Summons Request #3 ) mailed to Hasmick Promotions Limited, Suite 2 Rutland House 44 Masons Hill Bromley KE BR2 9JG on 6/10/2019. (iv)
June 10, 2019 Filing 31 RECEIPT FOR FOREIGN SERVICE from U. S. Post Office for documents Re: ( Civil Cover Sheet #2 , Complaint #1 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #5 , Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint #13 , Report on Filing of Copyright Action #6 , Summons Request #3 ) mailed to Michael Bennett, 128 Ebury Street London LO SW1W 9QQ on 6/10/2019. (iv)
June 10, 2019 Filing 29 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response filed by defendant Pandora Media, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Singh, David)
June 10, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendant Pandora Media, Inc., identifying Sirius XM Radio Inc., Sirius XM Holdings, Inc., and Liberty Media Corporation. (Singh, David)
June 10, 2019 Filing 27 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney David Ramraj Singh counsel for Defendant Pandora Media, Inc.. Adding David R. Singh as counsel of record for Pandora Media, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Pandora Media, LLC. (Attorney David Ramraj Singh added to party Pandora Media, Inc.(pty:dft))(Singh, David)
May 28, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information (G-06), #25 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Request for Substitution of Counsel G01. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
May 24, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Ryan W Powers counsel for Plaintiffs Harold Arlen Trust, SA Music, LLC. Changing firm name to Ryan W. Powers, Attorney at Law. Changing e-mail to ryan@ryanpowerslaw.com. Filed by plaintiff SA Music, LLC and Harold Arlen Trust. (Powers, Ryan)
May 22, 2019 Filing 24 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Henry L Self, III counsel for Plaintiffs Harold Arlen Trust, SA Music, LLC. Henry L. Self III is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff SA Music, LLC and Harold Arlen Trust. (Self, Henry)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Oren S. Giskan to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff SA Music, LLC and Harold Arlen Trust, designating Henry Self as local counsel #19 . (iv)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Brian S. Levenson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff SA Music, LLC and Harold Arlen Trust, designating Henry Self as local counsel #18 . (iv)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Matthew F. Schwartz to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff SA Music, LLC and Harold Arlen Trust, designating Henry Self as local counsel #17 . (iv)
May 17, 2019 Filing 20 DECLARATION of Ryan W. Powers Regarding Joinder of Multiple Copyright Claims filed by Plaintiffs Harold Arlen Trust, SA Music, LLC. (Powers, Ryan)
May 15, 2019 Filing 19 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Oren S. Giskan to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Harold Arlen Trust, SA Music, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23744743) filed by plaintiff Harold Arlen Trust, SA Music, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Self, Henry)
May 14, 2019 Filing 18 Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Brian S. Levenson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Harold Arlen Trust, SA Music, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 5/14/2019, Receipt No. 0973-23733515 / 26HF404T) filed by plaintiff Harold Arlen Trust, SA Music, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Self, Henry)
May 14, 2019 Filing 17 Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Matthew F. Schwartz to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Harold Arlen Trust, SA Music, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 5/14/2019, Receipt No. 0973-23733280 / 26HF3VNH) filed by plaintiff Harold Arlen Trust, SA Music, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Self, Henry)
May 14, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Matthew F. Schwartz to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Harold Arlen Trust, SA Music, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23733280) #14 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Brian S. Levenson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Harold Arlen Trust, SA Music, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23733515) #15 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. (lt)
May 14, 2019 Filing 15 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Brian S. Levenson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Harold Arlen Trust, SA Music, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23733515) filed by plaintiff Harold Arlen Trust, SA Music, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Self, Henry)
May 14, 2019 Filing 14 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Matthew F. Schwartz to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Harold Arlen Trust, SA Music, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23733280) filed by plaintiff Harold Arlen Trust, SA Music, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Self, Henry)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv)
May 10, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Oren S. Giskan. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
May 10, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Brian S. Levenson. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
May 10, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Matthew F. Schwartz. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
May 10, 2019 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants AP Music Ltd, Acrobat Music Ltd., Adasam Limited, Amazon Digital Services LLC, Amazon.com, Inc., Apple, Inc., Avid Group, Bacci Bros Records, Believe, Believe Digital SAS, Believe, SAS, Michael Bennett, Best Records, Blaricum C.D. Company B.C.D. BV, Blue Sounds, Brisa Records, Broken Audio, CTS Digital, Cherished Records, Classics, Cleopatra Records, Inc., Thomas Colley, Cugate Ltd., DWK Records, Digital Gramophone, Entertain Me Ltd., Favorite Classics, Future Noise Music Limited, Google Inc., Google LLC, Gralin Music, Hasmick Promotions Limited, Henry Hadaway Organization Limited, Historical Jazz, Ideal Music, Impressions, Isolation Network, Inc., J. Joes J. Edizioni Musicali, Jazz Co., Jazz Moon, Jazzsential, Lionfish Music, LLC, Mach60 Music, Marathon Media Int. Ltd., Microsoft Corporation, Move, Naxos of America, Inc., OVC Media, Orchard Enterprises, NY, Inc., Pandora Media, Inc., Phonofile AS, Pickwick Group Limited, Pink Dot, Plaza Mayor Company Limited, Plenty Jazz Records, Primephonic USA Inc., ROBA Music Verlag GmbH, Railroad, Rarity Music, Reloaded Music, Second Wind Digital, SendDigital, Shami Media Inc., Smith and Co B.V., TVP, Inc., The Orchard Enterprises, Inc., The State51 Conspiracy Ltd, Triton, Vintage Music SL, Vintage Records, Werner Lasts Favourites Jazz, Wnts, Xelon Entertainment Pty. Ltd. (lh)
May 10, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
May 10, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (lh)
May 9, 2019 Filing 6 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Harold Arlen Trust, SA Music, LLC. (Self, Henry)
May 9, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiffs Harold Arlen Trust, SA Music, LLC (Self, Henry)
May 9, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Harold Arlen Trust, SA Music, LLC, (Self, Henry)
May 9, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff Harold Arlen Trust, SA Music, LLC. (Self, Henry)
May 9, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Harold Arlen Trust, SA Music, LLC. (Self, Henry)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23712677 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Harold Arlen Trust, SA Music, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Composition Copyright Chart, #2 Exhibit Infringement Chart, #3 Exhibit Pirate Label Chart) (Attorney Henry L Self, III added to party Harold Arlen Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Henry L Self, III added to party SA Music, LLC(pty:pla))(Self, Henry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SA Music, LLC et al v. Apple, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xelon Entertainment Pty. Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blaricum C.D. Company (B.C.D.) BV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Orchard Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Peter J Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OVC Media
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reloaded Music
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vintage Music SL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orchard Enterprises, NY, Inc.
Represented By: Peter J Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pink Dot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avid Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBA Music Verlag GmbH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Hadaway Organization Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hasmick Promotions Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cugate Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lionfish Music, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Classics
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Best Records
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phonofile AS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Believe, SAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google LLC
Represented By: Allison L Stillman
Represented By: A John P Mancini
Represented By: John Nadolenco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Werner Last's Favourites Jazz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gralin Music
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isolation Network, Inc.
Represented By: Emily F Evitt
Represented By: Russell J Frackman
Represented By: David A Steinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Entertain Me Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Joes J. Edizioni Musicali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Naxos of America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Second Wind Digital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon Digital Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Primephonic USA Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jazzsential
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marathon Media Int. Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acrobat Music Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pickwick Group Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shami Media Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pandora Media, Inc.
Represented By: David Ramraj Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendant Believe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Represented By: Ilissa Stacy Samplin
Represented By: Gabrielle F Levin
Represented By: Scott A Edelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Broken Audio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jazz Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Move
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CTS Digital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bacci Bros Records
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wnts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Railroad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TVP, Inc.
Represented By: Arthur Louis Wallace, III
Represented By: Anthony R Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Triton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ideal Music
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Future Noise Music Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith & Co B.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Digital Gramophone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleopatra Records, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Colley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Historical Jazz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vintage Records
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AP Music Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The State51 Conspiracy Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Microsoft Corporation
Represented By: Simon J Frankel
Represented By: Emily Renda Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plaza Mayor Company Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE(S) 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Sounds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SendDigital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adasam Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mach60 Music
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DWK Records
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brisa Records
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jazz Moon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rarity Music
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plenty Jazz Records
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cherished Records
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Believe Digital SAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Impressions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Favorite Classics
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Werner Lasts Favourites Jazz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Believe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith and Co B.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blaricum C.D. Company B.C.D. BV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SA Music, LLC
Represented By: Henry L Self, III
Represented By: Matthew F Schwartz
Represented By: Brian S Levenson
Represented By: Allen Hyman
Represented By: Ryan W Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold Arlen Trust
Represented By: Henry L Self, III
Represented By: Matthew F Schwartz
Represented By: Brian S Levenson
Represented By: Allen Hyman
Represented By: Ryan W Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?