William D. Brice v. California Faculty Association

Plaintiff: William D. Brice
Defendant: California Faculty Association
Case Number: 2:2019cv04095
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Referring Judge: Rozella A Oliver
2 Judge: Josephine L Staton
3 Judge: John F Walter
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 52 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Defendant California Faculty Association. Motion set for hearing on 9/13/2019 at 10:30 AM before Judge Josephine L. Staton. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss and for Judgment on the Pleadings, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Declaration of Paul Harris in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and for Judgment on the Pleadings) (Kronland, Scott)
July 1, 2019 Filing 51 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER CONTINUING HEARING: In light of the anticipated motion for judgment on the pleadings, the Court CONTINUES the Scheduling Conference in this matter from June 28, 2019 to October 11, 2019 at 10:30 a.m. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (tg) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 19, 2019 Filing 50 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 3, filed by Plaintiff William D. Brice.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Jennings, Jeffrey)
June 19, 2019 Filing 49 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by defendant California Faculty Association, identifying California Faculty Association, Hudson Insurance Company. (Attorney P Casey Pitts added to party California Faculty Association(pty:dft))(Pitts, P)
June 14, 2019 Filing 48 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Megan Claire Wachspress counsel for Defendant California Faculty Association. Adding Megan C. Wachspress as counsel of record for California Faculty Association for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant California Faculty Association. (Attorney Megan Claire Wachspress added to party California Faculty Association(pty:dft))(Wachspress, Megan)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton: granting #42 Non-Resident Attorney Milton L Chappell APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff William D Brice, designating Thomas O Myers as local counsel. (bm)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton: granting #41 Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey D Jennings APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff William D Brice, designating Thomas O Myers as local counsel. (bm)
May 24, 2019 Filing 45 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff and Proposed Class William D. Brice, re Complaint - (Discovery) #1 Court's Standing Order and Complaint served on May 24, 2019. (Myers, Thomas)
May 22, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff and Proposed Class William D. Brice, (Myers, Thomas)
May 22, 2019 Filing 43 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Thomas O Myers counsel for Plaintiff William D. Brice. Adding Thomas Myers as counsel of record for Plaintiff William D. Brice and Proposed Class for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff and Proposed Class William D. Brice. (Myers, Thomas)
May 21, 2019 Filing 42 First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Milton L. Chappell to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff William D. Brice (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23779402) filed by Plaintiff and Proposed Class William D. Brice. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (Proposed) Order On Application of Non-Resident Attorney to appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice) (Myers, Thomas)
May 21, 2019 Filing 41 First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey D. Jennings to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff William D. Brice (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23778901) filed by Plaintiff and Proposed Class William D. Brice. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (Proposed) Order On Application of Non-Resident Attorney to appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice) (Attorney Thomas O Myers added to party William D. Brice(pty:pla)) (Myers, Thomas)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Scheduling Conference is set for 7/5/2019 at 10:30 A.M. (tg)
May 21, 2019 Filing 39 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON (tg)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 8:13-cv-00676 JLS(CWx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver and Judge John F. Walter to Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:13-cv-00676 JLS(CWx). Signed by Judge Josephine L. Staton (rn)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv)
May 15, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by defendant California Faculty Association. Related Case(s): 2:18-cv-08999-JLS-DFM, 8:18-cv-00994-JLS-DFM, 2:18-cv-06793-JLS-DFM, 8:18-cv-01169-JLS-DFM, 2:18-cv-09531-JLS-DFM, 2:19-cv-00228-JLS-DFM, 2:19-cv-00469-JLS-DFM, 2:18-cv-01841-JLS-DFM (Pitts, P)
May 14, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Milton L Chappell. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (car)
May 14, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey D Jennings. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (car)
May 13, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
May 13, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (car)
May 13, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE OF RECEIPT OF CASE TRANSFERRED IN: Formerly Case Number: 2:18-cv-03106-MCE-EFB, from U.S. District Court Eastern District of California (Sacramento). The above-referenced case has been transferred to this district and assigned the above civil case number 2:19-cv-04095-JFW-RAOx. (car)
May 13, 2019 Filing 30 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from California Eastern
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 5/8/2019 GRANTING #16 Motion to Change Venue; CASE TRANSFERRED to District of Central District of California. The Clerk of this Court is directed to close the case once that transfer has been effectuated (Washington, S) [Transferred from California Eastern on 5/13/2019.]
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 3/28/19 GRANTING #20 Motion to Continue. The parties shall conduct their Rule 26(f) conference and file any objections to the Initial Pretrial Scheduling Order within 21 days after this court rules on #16 Motion to Transfer Venue. (Coll, A) [Transferred from California Eastern on 5/13/2019.]
February 21, 2019 Filing 27 JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT by William D. Brice. (Jennings, Jeffrey) [Transferred from California Eastern on 5/13/2019.]
February 14, 2019 Filing 26 REPLY by California Faculty Association re #16 Motion to Transfer Venue. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Scott A. Kronland)(Kronland, Scott) [Transferred from California Eastern on 5/13/2019.]
February 8, 2019 Filing 25 JOINT OBJECTIONS to initial pretrial scheduling order, by Plaintiff William D. Brice. (Jennings, Jeffrey) Modified on 2/11/2019 (Kastilahn, A). [Transferred from California Eastern on 5/13/2019.]
February 7, 2019 Filing 24 OPPOSITION by William D. Brice to #16 Motion to Transfer Venue. (Jennings, Jeffrey) [Transferred from California Eastern on 5/13/2019.]
February 7, 2019 Filing 23 STATEMENT of NON-OPPOSITION by William D. Brice to #20 Motion to Continue. (Jennings, Jeffrey) [Transferred from California Eastern on 5/13/2019.]
February 7, 2019 Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: On the Court's own motion and pursuant to Local Rule 230(g), the March 7, 2019 hearing on the unopposed Motion to Postpone Deadline for Rule 26(f) Conference and Objections to Initial Pretrial Scheduling Order (ECF No. 20) is vacated and submitted without appearance and argument. The opposition or statement of non-opposition, and reply due dates shall be filed in accordance with the original motion hearing date. If the Court determines that oral argument is needed it will be scheduled at a later date. Any outstanding request for telephonic appearance is denied as moot. (Deutsch, S) [Transferred from California Eastern on 5/13/2019.]
February 7, 2019 Filing 21 CLERK'S NOTICE of DOCKET CORRECTION as to ECF No. 18. The parties are ordered to disregard this Minute Order as docketed in error. (Deutsch, S) [Transferred from California Eastern on 5/13/2019.]
January 29, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to CONTINUE Deadline and Objections to Initial Pretrial Scheduling Order by California Faculty Association. Motion Hearing set for 3/7/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kronland, Scott) Modified on 1/30/2019 (Coll, A). [Transferred from California Eastern on 5/13/2019.]
January 28, 2019 Filing 19 ANSWER by California Faculty Association.(Kronland, Scott) [Transferred from California Eastern on 5/13/2019.]
January 18, 2019 Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: On the Court's own motion and pursuant to Local Rule 230(g), the February 21, 2019 hearing on the Motion to Appoint Receiver for Designation of Successor in Interests (ECF No. 65) is vacated and submitted without appearance and argument. The opposition or statement of non-opposition, and reply due dates shall be filed in accordance with the original motion hearing date. If the Court determines that oral argument is needed it will be scheduled at a later date. Any outstanding request for telephonic appearance is denied as moot. (Deutsch, S) [Transferred from California Eastern on 5/13/2019.]
January 18, 2019 Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: On the Court's own motion and pursuant to Local Rule 230(g), the February 21, 2019 hearing on the Motion to Change Venue (ECF No. 16) is vacated and submitted without appearance and argument. The opposition or statement of non-opposition, and reply due dates shall be filed in accordance with the original motion hearing date. If the Court determines that oral argument is needed it will be scheduled at a later date. Any outstanding request for telephonic appearance is denied as moot. (Deutsch, S) [Transferred from California Eastern on 5/13/2019.]
January 18, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to TRANSFER VENUE by California Faculty Association. Motion Hearing set for 2/21/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before District Judge Morrison C. England. Jr. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration of Scott A. Kronland, #3 Declaration of Jacqueline Tepeen, #4 Proposed Order)(Kronland, Scott) [Transferred from California Eastern on 5/13/2019.]
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 1/14/19 DECLINING to relate cases. (Coll, A) [Transferred from California Eastern on 5/13/2019.]
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 01/09/19. Added attorney Jeffrey D. Jennings, PHV for William D. Brice. (Benson, A.) [Transferred from California Eastern on 5/13/2019.]
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 01/09/19. Added attorney Milton L. Chappell, PHV for William D. Brice. (Benson, A.) [Transferred from California Eastern on 5/13/2019.]
January 3, 2019 Filing 12 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by William D. Brice for attorney Milton L. Chappell to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8040633) (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Burlingham, Steven) [Transferred from California Eastern on 5/13/2019.]
December 26, 2018 Filing 11 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint by Not More than 28 Days by California Faculty Association. (Pitts, Patrick) Modified on 12/26/2018 (Benson, A.). [Transferred from California Eastern on 5/13/2019.]
December 26, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Patrick Casey Pitts on behalf of California Faculty Association. Attorney Pitts, Patrick Casey added. (Pitts, Patrick) [Transferred from California Eastern on 5/13/2019.]
December 26, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Scott A. Kronland on behalf of California Faculty Association. Attorney Kronland, Scott A. added. (Kronland, Scott) [Transferred from California Eastern on 5/13/2019.]
December 21, 2018 Filing 8 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by William D. Brice for attorney Jeffrey D. Jennings to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8030397) (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Burlingham, Steven) [Transferred from California Eastern on 5/13/2019.]
December 12, 2018 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by William D. Brice re #2 Notice. (Burlingham, Steven) Modified on 12/12/2018 (Kaminski, H). [Transferred from California Eastern on 5/13/2019.]
December 12, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: William D. Brice served on 12/10/2018, answer due 12/31/2018. (Burlingham, Steven) [Transferred from California Eastern on 5/13/2019.]
December 7, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of RELATED CASE 2:18-cv-02419, 2:18-cv-02574, 2:18-cv-02961, 2:18-cv-02230 by William D. Brice. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Burlingham, Steven) Modified on 12/10/2018 (Kaminski, H). [Transferred from California Eastern on 5/13/2019.]
November 30, 2018 Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Mena-Sanchez, L) [Transferred from California Eastern on 5/13/2019.]
November 30, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *California Faculty Association* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Steven R. Burlingham* *Gary, Till, Burlingham & Lynch* *1380 Lead Hill Blvd. Suite 200* *Roseville, CA 95661*. (Mena-Sanchez, L) [Transferred from California Eastern on 5/13/2019.]
November 30, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Claim of Unconstitutionality by William D. Brice re #1 Complaint. (Burlingham, Steven) [Transferred from California Eastern on 5/13/2019.]
November 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against California Faculty Association by William D. Brice. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-7994489) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Burlingham, Steven) [Transferred from California Eastern on 5/13/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: William D. Brice v. California Faculty Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Faculty Association
Represented By: Scott A Kronland
Represented By: Patrick Casey Pitts
Represented By: P Casey Pitts
Represented By: Megan Claire Wachspress
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William D. Brice
Represented By: Milton L Chappell
Represented By: Steven R Burlingham
Represented By: Jeffrey D Jennings
Represented By: Thomas O Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?