Yolanda Rios v. UNUM Life Insurance Company of America et al
Plaintiff: Yolanda Rios
Defendant: Provident Life Provident Life and Accident Insurance Company, Individual Disability Income Policy e policy, Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer L.L.P Welfare Benefit Plan, UNUM UNUM Life Insurance Company of America, Arnold and Porter Kaye Scholer, L.L.P Welfare Benefit Plan, Individual Disability Income Policy, Does 1-10, inclusive, Provident Life and Accident Insurance Company and UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 2:2019cv04100
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Steve Kim
Referring Judge: Manuel L Real
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1451
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Filing 18 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Yolanda Rios, re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #5 Order Re: Notice to Counsel served on 06/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Bohan, Anthony)
June 24, 2019 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Individual Disability Income Policy (Hess, Robert)
June 24, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Individual Disability Income Policy, (Hess, Robert)
June 24, 2019 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Arnold and Porter Kaye Scholer, L.L.P Welfare Benefit Plan (Hess, Robert)
June 24, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Arnold and Porter Kaye Scholer, L.L.P Welfare Benefit Plan, (Hess, Robert)
June 24, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendants Arnold and Porter Kaye Scholer, L.L.P Welfare Benefit Plan, Does, Individual Disability Income Policy.(Attorney Robert E Hess added to party Arnold and Porter Kaye Scholer, L.L.P Welfare Benefit Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Robert E Hess added to party Individual Disability Income Policy(pty:dft))(Hess, Robert)
June 21, 2019 Filing 12 SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Yolanda Rios, upon Defendant Individual Disability Income Policy served on 5/21/2019, answer due 6/11/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Plaintiffs Attorney (Bohan, Anthony)
June 21, 2019 Filing 11 SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Yolanda Rios, upon Defendant Arnold and Porter Kaye Scholer, L.L.P Welfare Benefit Plan served on 5/21/2019, answer due 6/11/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Plaintiffs Attorney (Bohan, Anthony)
June 21, 2019 Filing 10 SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Yolanda Rios, upon Defendant Provident Life and Accident Insurance Company served on 5/28/2019, answer due 6/18/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Plaintiffs Attorney (Bohan, Anthony)
June 21, 2019 Filing 9 SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Yolanda Rios, upon Defendant UNUM Life Insurance Company of America served on 5/16/2019, answer due 6/6/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Plaintiffs Attorney (Bohan, Anthony)
June 18, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants Provident Life and Accident Insurance Company, UNUM Life Insurance Company of America identifying Defendants as Corporate Parent. (Hess, Robert)
June 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Provident Life and Accident Insurance Company, UNUM Life Insurance Company of America, (Hess, Robert)
June 18, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendants Provident Life and Accident Insurance Company, UNUM Life Insurance Company of America.(Attorney Robert E Hess added to party Provident Life and Accident Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Robert E Hess added to party UNUM Life Insurance Company of America(pty:dft))(Hess, Robert)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER RE: NOTICE TO COUNSEL upon filing of the complaint by Judge Manuel L. Real. READ CAREFULLY - FAILURE TO COMPLY MAY LEAD TO SANCTIONS. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (cch)
May 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachments No. 1 Civil Cover Sheet, No. 2 Notice of Interested Parties, and No. 3 Summons should not have been attached to Docket Entry No. 1. Each document should have been filed separately. You are not required to take any action to correct this deficiency unless the Court so directs. (lh)
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants Arnold and Porter Kaye Scholer, L.L.P Welfare Benefit Plan, Individual Disability Income Policy, Provident Life and Accident Insurance Company, UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. (lh)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Manuel L. Real and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (lh)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23718698 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Yolanda Rios. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Interested Parties, #3 Summons) (Attorney Anthony Bohan added to party Yolanda Rios (pty:pla))(Bohan, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yolanda Rios v. UNUM Life Insurance Company of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Provident Life Provident Life and Accident Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Individual Disability Income Policy e policy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer L.L.P Welfare Benefit Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNUM UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arnold and Porter Kaye Scholer, L.L.P Welfare Benefit Plan
Represented By: Robert E Hess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Individual Disability Income Policy
Represented By: Robert E Hess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Provident Life and Accident Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert E Hess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Robert E Hess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yolanda Rios
Represented By: Anthony Bohan
Represented By: Peter A Bohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?