Great American Insurance Company v. CMA CGM S.A. et al

Plaintiff: Great American Insurance Company
Defendant: CMA CGM S.A., CMA CGM (America) LLC, Does One through Ten and CMA CGM America LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv04140
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Consuelo B Marshall
Referring Judge: Jean P Rosenbluth
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 49:81
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2019 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Great American Insurance Company, upon Defendant CMA CGM America LLC served on 5/16/2019, answer due 6/6/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System - Daisy Montenegro - Person Authorized to Accept Service of Process in compliance with statute not specified by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Kirsch, Joshua)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall.READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. It controls this case and may differ in some respects from the Local Rules. (ys)
May 14, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant CMA CGM America LLC. (et)
May 14, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (et)
May 13, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Great American Insurance Company identifying American Financial Group; Great American Insurance Company as Corporate Parent. (Kirsch, Joshua)
May 13, 2019 Filing 4 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Great American Insurance Company, identifying Cotopaxi, Inc.. (Kirsch, Joshua)
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Great American Insurance Company. (Kirsch, Joshua)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Great American Insurance Company. (Kirsch, Joshua)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23728318 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Great American Insurance Company. (Attorney Joshua E Kirsch added to party Great American Insurance Company(pty:pla))(Kirsch, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Great American Insurance Company v. CMA CGM S.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CMA CGM S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CMA CGM (America) LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does One through Ten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CMA CGM America LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Great American Insurance Company
Represented By: Joshua E Kirsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?