Kevin Caballero et al v. Kimball Tirey and St. John, LLP et al

Plaintiff: Stephanie Caballero and Kevin Caballero
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc, Trans Union LLC, Kimball Tirey & St. John, LLP and Kimball Tirey and St. John, LLP
Case Number: 2:2019cv04164
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John E McDermott
Referring Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge George H. Wu: ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. A Joint 26(f) Report shall be filed with the Court no later than July 25, 2019. See Local Rule 26-1. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/25/2019., Scheduling Conference set for 8/8/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
June 21, 2019 Filing 18 CERTIFICATION and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Trans Union LLC, identifying Trans Union LLC is a wholly-owned subsidiary of TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., is wholly-owned by TransUnion.. (Bradley, Donald)
June 20, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 and DEFENSES to Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Defendant Trans Union LLC.(Attorney Donald E Bradley added to party Trans Union LLC(pty:dft))(Bradley, Donald)
June 20, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc, identifying Experian plc; Central Source LLC; Online Data Exchange LLC; New Management Services LLC; VantageScore Solutions LLC; Opt-Out Services LLC. (Luong, Thanh-Thuy)
June 20, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.(Attorney Thanh-Thuy Thi Luong added to party Experian Information Solutions, Inc(pty:dft))(Luong, Thanh-Thuy)
June 19, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Settlement as to Kimball Tirey & St. John ONLY filed by Plaintiffs Kevin Caballero, Stephanie Caballero. (Kent, Trinette)
June 7, 2019 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Kevin Caballero, Stephanie Caballero, upon Defendant Kimball Tirey and St. John, LLP served on 6/3/2019, answer due 6/24/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Joy Lewis, employee authorized to accept service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Kent, Trinette)
May 31, 2019 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Kevin Caballero, Stephanie Caballero, upon Defendant Trans Union LLC served on 5/30/2019, answer due 6/20/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Adam James Process Specialist in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Kent, Trinette)
May 31, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Kevin Caballero, Stephanie Caballero, upon Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc served on 5/30/2019, answer due 6/20/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Ross Depina, Process Specialist+ in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Kent, Trinette)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Standing Order Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trials by Judge George H. Wu. (lom)
May 15, 2019 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Trans Union LLC. (ghap)
May 15, 2019 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (ghap)
May 15, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Kimball Tirey and St. John, LLP. (ghap)
May 15, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
May 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (ghap)
May 14, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Kevin Caballero, Stephanie Caballero. (Attachments: #1 Second Summons, #2 Third Summons)(Kent, Trinette)
May 14, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Kevin Caballero, Stephanie Caballero, (Kent, Trinette)
May 14, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Kevin Caballero, Stephanie Caballero. (Kent, Trinette)
May 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23732858 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Kevin Caballero, Stephanie Caballero. (Attorney Trinette Gragirena Kent added to party Kevin Caballero(pty:pla), Attorney Trinette Gragirena Kent added to party Stephanie Caballero(pty:pla))(Kent, Trinette)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kevin Caballero et al v. Kimball Tirey and St. John, LLP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Caballero
Represented By: Trinette Gragirena Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Caballero
Represented By: Trinette Gragirena Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc
Represented By: Thanh-Thuy Thi Luong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union LLC
Represented By: Donald E Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimball Tirey & St. John, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimball Tirey and St. John, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?