Gary Frisby v. Sony Music Entertainment, et al

Plaintiff: Gary Frisby
Defendant: Matthew Samuels, Anderson Hernandez, Cortez Bryant, Dreamville Records NY, Inc., Universal Music Group, Inc., Bryson Tiller, Jermaine Cole, Sony Music Entertainment, ROC Nation Records, LLC and Michael Hernandez
Case Number: 2:2019cv04167
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Alicia G Rosenberg
Referring Judge: Karen L Stevenson
2 Judge: John F Walter
3 Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Filing 45 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney William Archer counsel for Defendants Jermaine Cole, Dreamville Records NY, Inc.. Adding William Archer as counsel of record for Jermaine Cole, p/k/a J. Cole and Dreamville Records NY, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Jermaine Cole, p/k/a J. Cole and Dreamville Records NY, Inc.. (Attorney William Archer added to party Jermaine Cole(pty:dft), Attorney William Archer added to party Dreamville Records NY, Inc.(pty:dft))(Archer, William)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge George H. Wu: ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. A Joint 26(f) Report shall be filed with the Court no later than July 25, 2019. See Local Rule 26-1. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/25/2019., Scheduling Conference set for 8/8/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
June 24, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Bryson Tiller, identifying Sony Music Entertainment; Sony Corporation. (Anderson, Peter)
June 24, 2019 Filing 42 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by defendant Bryson Tiller.(Attorney Peter J Anderson added to party Bryson Tiller(pty:dft))(Anderson, Peter)
June 21, 2019 Filing 41 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Gary Frisby, upon Defendant Bryson Tiller served on 6/1/2019, answer due 6/24/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Bryson Tiller in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Watson, Coleman)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER ON NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANTS MATTHEW SAMUELS AND ANDERSON HERNANDEZ by Judge George H. Wu, re Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Party(ies) (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1)) #36 . Anderson Hernandez (pka Vinylz, an individual) and Matthew Samuels (pka Boilda, an individual) terminated. (mrgo)
June 3, 2019 Filing 39 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Gary Frisby, upon Defendant Cortez Bryant served on 5/23/2019, answer due 6/13/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Danielle Walls, as Assistant to Cortez Bryant, at Defendant's Usual Place of Abode in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Watson, Coleman)
June 3, 2019 Filing 38 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Gary Frisby. upon Dreamville Records NY, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 5/22/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. Waiver of Service signed by William Archer, Esq.. (Watson, Coleman)
June 3, 2019 Filing 37 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Gary Frisby. upon Jermaine Cole waiver sent by Plaintiff on 5/22/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. Waiver of Service signed by William Archer, Esq.. (Watson, Coleman)
June 3, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Gary Frisby pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Anderson Hernandez, Matthew Samuels. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Watson, Coleman)
May 28, 2019 Filing 35 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Gary Frisby, upon Defendant Michael Hernandez served on 5/23/2019, answer due 6/13/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Sahi Hernandez, as Mother of Michael Hernandez, at Defendant's Usual Place of Abode in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Watson, Coleman)
May 24, 2019 Filing 34 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Gary Frisby. upon Anderson Hernandez waiver sent by Plaintiff on 5/15/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. Waiver of Service signed by Edwin F. McPherson. (Watson, Coleman)
May 23, 2019 Filing 33 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Gary Frisby. upon Universal Music Group, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 5/15/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. Waiver of Service signed by Michael J. Niborski, Esq.. (Watson, Coleman)
May 23, 2019 Filing 32 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Gary Frisby. upon ROC Nation Records, LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 5/15/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. Waiver of Service signed by Michael J. Niborski, Esq.. (Watson, Coleman)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Standing Order Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trials by Judge George H. Wu. (lom)
May 22, 2019 Filing 30 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Gary Frisby. upon Sony Music Entertainment waiver sent by Plaintiff on 5/15/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. Waiver of Service signed by Peter Anderson, Esq.. (Watson, Coleman)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:19-cv-01712 GW(AGRx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson and Judge John F. Walter to Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-4167 GW(AGRx). Signed by Judge George H. Wu (rn)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv)
May 14, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Gary Frisby. Related Case(s): 2:19-cv-01712-GW-AGR (Watson, Coleman)
May 14, 2019 Filing 26 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Bryson Tiller. (esa)
May 14, 2019 Filing 25 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Anderson Hernandez. (esa)
May 14, 2019 Filing 24 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Michael Hernandez. (esa)
May 14, 2019 Filing 23 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Matthew Samuels. (esa)
May 14, 2019 Filing 22 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Cortez Bryant. (esa)
May 14, 2019 Filing 21 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Dreamville Records NY, Inc. (esa)
May 14, 2019 Filing 20 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Jermaine Cole. (esa)
May 14, 2019 Filing 19 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant ROC Nation Records, LLC. (esa)
May 14, 2019 Filing 18 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Universal Music Group, Inc. (esa)
May 14, 2019 Filing 17 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Sony Music Entertainment. (esa)
May 14, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
May 14, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (esa)
May 14, 2019 Filing 14 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Gary Frisby. (Watson, Coleman)
May 14, 2019 Filing 13 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Gary Frisby. (Watson, Coleman)
May 14, 2019 Filing 12 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Gary Frisby. (Watson, Coleman)
May 14, 2019 Filing 11 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Gary Frisby. (Watson, Coleman)
May 14, 2019 Filing 10 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Gary Frisby. (Watson, Coleman)
May 14, 2019 Filing 9 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Gary Frisby. (Watson, Coleman)
May 14, 2019 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Gary Frisby. (Watson, Coleman)
May 14, 2019 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Gary Frisby. (Watson, Coleman)
May 14, 2019 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Gary Frisby. (Watson, Coleman)
May 14, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Gary Frisby. (Watson, Coleman)
May 14, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Gary Frisby. (Watson, Coleman)
May 14, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Gary Frisby identifying none as Corporate Parent. (Watson, Coleman)
May 14, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Gary Frisby. (Watson, Coleman)
May 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23735538 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Gary Frisby. (Attorney Coleman W Watson added to party Gary Frisby(pty:pla))(Watson, Coleman)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gary Frisby v. Sony Music Entertainment, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Samuels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anderson Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cortez Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dreamville Records NY, Inc.
Represented By: William Archer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Universal Music Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryson Tiller
Represented By: KeAndra Z Barlow
Represented By: Peter J Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jermaine Cole
Represented By: William Archer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Music Entertainment
Represented By: KeAndra Z Barlow
Represented By: Peter J Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROC Nation Records, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Frisby
Represented By: Coleman W Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?