Certain Underwriters at Lloyds Subscribing to Policy No. VE17XX3615D16 v. Hyundai Merchant Marine (America), Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Certain Underwriters at Lloyds Subscribing to Policy No. VE17XX3615D16
Defendant: Hyundai Merchant Marine (America), Inc., EZ Logistics LLC and Does one through ten
Case Number: 2:2019cv04202
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John E McDermott
Referring Judge: Stephen V Wilson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 49:81
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 IN CHAMBERS ORDER-TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: The Order to Show Cause #13 , issued on 06/19/2019, is DISCHARGED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 24, 2019 Filing 14 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to EZ Logistics LLC answer now due 7/18/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Certain Underwriters at Lloyds Subscribing to Policy No. VE17XX3615D16. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Kirsch, Joshua)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Show Cause Response due by 7/3/2019.) (mrgo)
June 3, 2019 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Certain Underwriters at Lloyds Subscribing to Policy No. VE17XX3615D16, upon Defendant EZ Logistics LLC served on 5/28/2019, answer due 6/18/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Rizhun Chen - Person Authorized to Accept Service of Process in compliance with statute not specified by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Kirsch, Joshua)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
May 16, 2019 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant EZ Logistics LLC. (esa)
May 16, 2019 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Hyundai Merchant Marine (America), Inc. (esa)
May 16, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
May 16, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (esa)
May 15, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Certain Underwriters at Lloyds Subscribing to Policy No. VE17XX3615D16 (Kirsch, Joshua)
May 15, 2019 Filing 5 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Certain Underwriters at Lloyds Subscribing to Policy No. VE17XX3615D16, identifying Best Food Services, LLC; TRN Transportation, Inc.; Express Shipping Logistics, Inc.. (Kirsch, Joshua)
May 15, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Certain Underwriters at Lloyds Subscribing to Policy No. VE17XX3615D16. (Kirsch, Joshua)
May 15, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Certain Underwriters at Lloyds Subscribing to Policy No. VE17XX3615D16. (Kirsch, Joshua)
May 15, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Certain Underwriters at Lloyds Subscribing to Policy No. VE17XX3615D16. (Kirsch, Joshua)
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23740860 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Certain Underwriters at Lloyds Subscribing to Policy No. VE17XX3615D16. (Attorney Joshua E Kirsch added to party Certain Underwriters at Lloyds Subscribing to Policy No. VE17XX3615D16(pty:pla))(Kirsch, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Certain Underwriters at Lloyds Subscribing to Policy No. VE17XX3615D16 v. Hyundai Merchant Marine (America), Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyundai Merchant Marine (America), Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EZ Logistics LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does one through ten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Certain Underwriters at Lloyds Subscribing to Policy No. VE17XX3615D16
Represented By: Joshua E Kirsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?