Kenneth Buford Pollard v. Rainer Bodine et al

Plaintiff: Kenneth Buford Pollard
Defendant: Rainer Bodine, David Schmidt and NSH Fusion Centers in California
Case Number: 2:2019cv04212
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Kenly Kiya Kato
Referring Judge: Josephine L Staton
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER RE REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Judge Josephine L. Staton that the request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #2 , #5 is hereby DENIED, with leave to amend within 30 days. Plaintiff may re-submit the IFP application and Complaint to this Court, if submitted with the Certified Trust Account Statement and Disbursement Authorization. Plaintiff shall utilize the same case number. If plaintiff fails to submit the required documents within 30 days, this case shall be DISMISSED. (jp)
June 5, 2019 Filing 11 SUPPLEMENT to Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights), #1 filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Buford Pollard. (dts)
May 30, 2019 Filing 10 SUPPLEMENT to Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights), #1 filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Buford Pollard. (dts)
May 30, 2019 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENT to Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights), #1 filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Buford Pollard. (dts)
May 28, 2019 Filing 9 SUPPLEMENT to Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights), #1 filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Buford Pollard. (hr)
May 28, 2019 Filing 8 SUPPLEMENT to Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights), #1 filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Buford Pollard. (hr)
May 24, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Buford Pollard to Order,, #4 (dts)
May 24, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Buford Pollard. (dts)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER re: Failure to File Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato, re NOTICE OF FILING OF COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FILING FEES OR REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (CV-93) #2 if Pollard wishes to proceed with this lawsuit, within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order he must (1) pay the full $400.00 filing fee; (2) file a request for in forma pauperis status along with the necessary accompanying documents; or (3) show cause in writing why he is unable to do so. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application) (dts)
May 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and referred to Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (esa)
May 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING OF COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FILING FEES OR REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (CV-93) filed by plaintiff Kenneth Buford Pollard. (esa)
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed against DefendantsRainer Bodine(Sheriff SLO, in official capacity), Rainer Bodine(Sheriff SLO, in individual capacity), NSH Fusion Centers in California, David Schmidt pursuant to 42 USC 1983pr. Case assigned to Judge Josephine L. Staton and referred to Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato, filed by plaintiff Kenneth Buford Pollard. (esa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kenneth Buford Pollard v. Rainer Bodine et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rainer Bodine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NSH Fusion Centers in California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Buford Pollard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?