Giles Jerry Medlock Jr v. J. R. Lozono

Petitioner: Giles Jerry Medlock, Jr
Respondent: J. R. Lozono
Case Number: 2:2019cv04228
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John D Early
Referring Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 13 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge John D. Early, Order Granting Request for Extension #12 . Good cause appearing therefore, the Second Request (Dkt. 12) is GRANTED. Respondent shall have until August 14, 2019, to file a Motion to Dismiss the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and until August 29, 2019, to file an Answer. This Courts original Order dated May 16, 2019, otherwise remains in effect. (mba)
July 8, 2019 Filing 12 APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Dismiss or Answer to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Respondent J. R. Lozono. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Markovich, Shira)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order Granting Petitioner's Request to Proceed without Prepayment of Filing Fees #10 by Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (hr)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order Granting Request for Extension #7 by Magistrate Judge John D. Early. Respondent shall have until July 15, 2019, to file a Motion to Dismiss the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and until July 30, 2019, to file an Answer. (see document for further details) (hr)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order Denying Motion for Appointment of Counsel #6 by Magistrate Judge John D. Early. The motion is DENIED without prejudice. Nothing prevents Petitioner from retaining counsel on his own. (see document for further details) (hr)
June 11, 2019 Filing 7 APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File MOTION TO DISMISS OR ANSWER TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS; DECLARATION OF SHIRA SEIGLE MARKOVICH filed by respondent J. R. Lozono. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Markovich, Shira)
June 10, 2019 Filing 10 REQUEST for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis; Declaration in Support filed by Petitioner Giles Jerry Medlock, Jr. (hr)
June 10, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel, filed by Petitioner Giles Jerry Medlock, Jr. (mba)
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE of California Attorney General Office Shira Seigle Markovich on behalf of Respondent J. R. Lozono. (Attorney Shira Seigle Markovich added to party J. R. Lozono(pty:res))(Markovich, Shira)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REQUIRING ANSWER/RETURN TO PETITION by Magistrate Judge John D. Early. That Respondent J. R. Lozono file Answer to the Petition not later than 7/1/2019. Notice: The court has issued a ruling on preliminary review. Pursuant to the Agreement on Acceptance of Service between the Clerk of Court and the California Attorney Generals Office, this Notice constitutes service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. Motions to Dismiss shall be filed by 6/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Petition part 1, #2 Petition part 2, #3 Petition part 3) (mba)
May 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge George H. Wu and referred to Magistrate Judge John D. Early, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (Attachments: #1 CV 111) (esa)
May 15, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTION REGARDING CONSENT to Proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge Declined, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636c filed by petitioner Giles Jerry Medlock, Jr. The petitioner does not consent. (esa)
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In State Custody (28:2254) Case assigned to Judge George H. Wu and referred to Magistrate Judge John D. Early, (Filing fee due), filed by petitioner Giles Jerry Medlock, Jr. (Attachments: #1 part 2, #2 part 3) (esa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Giles Jerry Medlock Jr v. J. R. Lozono
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Giles Jerry Medlock, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: J. R. Lozono
Represented By: Shira Seigle Markovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?