David Anthony Adams Jr v. Ken Clark

Petitioner: David Anthony Adams, Jr.
Respondent: Ken Clark
Case Number: 2:2019cv04252
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jean P Rosenbluth
Referring Judge: Otis D Wright
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES #9 (Attachments: #1 LD #1, #2 LD #2, #3 LD #3, #4 LD #4, #5 LD #5, #6 LD #6, #7 LD #7)(Harris, Julie)
July 9, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES filed by respondent Ken Clark. (Harris, Julie)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the application is GRANTED and that Respondent is granted until July 19, 2019, to file a Motion to Dismiss the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, and until August 5, 2019, to file an Answer. re #7 (sbou)
June 11, 2019 Filing 7 APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File MOTION TO DISMISS THE PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AND TO FILE AN ANSWER filed by respondent Ken Clark. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Harris, Julie)
May 24, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE of California Attorney General Office Julie A. Harris on behalf of RESPONDENT Ken Clark. (Attorney Julie Ann Harris added to party Ken Clark(pty:res))(Harris, Julie)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REQUIRING RESPONSE TO PETITION by Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. that Respondent Ken Clark file Answer to the Petition not later than 7/5/2019. Notice: The court has issued a ruling on preliminary review. Pursuant to the Agreement on Acceptance of Service between the Clerk of Court and the California Attorney Generals Office, this Notice constitutes service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. Motions to Dismiss shall be filed by 6/18/2019. [See Order for further details]. (Attachments: #1 Petition for writ of Habeas Corpus) (et)
May 16, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and referred to Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (Attachments: #1 CV 111, #2 CV 38) (esa)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from California Southern
May 15, 2019 Filing 2 Case transferred to District of Central District of California, Western Division. Files transferred electronically to: *District of Central District of California, Western Division*.*255 East Temple Street, Room 181**Los Angeles, CA 90012-3332*. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 5/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 transfer order) (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp) (jao). [Transferred from California Southern on 5/16/2019.]
January 22, 2019 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus against Ken Clark, filed by David Anthony Adams, Jr.($5 Filing Fee, Fee Not Paid, IFP Not Filed) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-140-JLS-AGS. Judge Janis L. Sammartino and Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler are assigned to the case.[Case in Screening] (jms) [Transferred from California Southern on 5/16/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: David Anthony Adams Jr v. Ken Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: David Anthony Adams, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ken Clark
Represented By: Attorney General
Represented By: Julie Ann Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?