Andrew Guerrero et al v. Logan Paul et al

Plaintiff: Mackenzie Roberts, Stephen Brackett, Flobots Music LLC, James Laurie, Kenneth Ortiz, Andrew Guerrero and Jesse Walker
Defendant: Logan Paul and Maverick Media
Case Number: 2:2019cv04267
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Consuelo B Marshall
Referring Judge: Michael R Wilner
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Kenneth Ortiz, James Laurie, Flobots Music LLC, Stephen Brackett, Andrew Guerrero, Mackenzie Roberts, Jesse Walker, upon Defendant Maverick Media served on 5/22/2019, answer due 6/12/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jessica Gutierrez, Assistant to Don Steel, Esq., Authorized to Accept Service, in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Busch, Richard)
June 5, 2019 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Kenneth Ortiz, James Laurie, Flobots Music LLC, Stephen Brackett, Andrew Guerrero, Mackenzie Roberts, Jesse Walker, upon Defendant Logan Paul served on 5/22/2019, answer due 6/12/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jessica Gutierrez, Assistant to Don Steel, Esq., Authorized to Accept Service, in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Busch, Richard)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. It controls this case and may differ in some respects from the Local Rules. (ys)
May 17, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendants Maverick Media, Logan Paul. (esa)
May 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (esa)
May 16, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Plaintiffs Stephen Brackett, Flobots Music LLC, Andrew Guerrero, James Laurie, Kenneth Ortiz, Mackenzie Roberts, Jesse Walker. (Busch, Richard)
May 16, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Stephen Brackett, Flobots Music LLC, Andrew Guerrero, James Laurie, Kenneth Ortiz, Mackenzie Roberts, Jesse Walker. (Busch, Richard)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Stephen Brackett, Flobots Music LLC, Andrew Guerrero, James Laurie, Kenneth Ortiz, Mackenzie Roberts, Jesse Walker, (Busch, Richard)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Stephen Brackett, Flobots Music LLC, Andrew Guerrero, James Laurie, Kenneth Ortiz, Mackenzie Roberts, Jesse Walker. (Busch, Richard)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23752524 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Kenneth Ortiz, James Laurie, Flobots Music LLC, Stephen Brackett, Andrew Guerrero, Mackenzie Roberts, Jesse Walker. (Attorney Richard Steven Busch added to party Stephen Brackett(pty:pla), Attorney Richard Steven Busch added to party Flobots Music LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Richard Steven Busch added to party Andrew Guerrero(pty:pla), Attorney Richard Steven Busch added to party James Laurie(pty:pla), Attorney Richard Steven Busch added to party Kenneth Ortiz(pty:pla), Attorney Richard Steven Busch added to party Mackenzie Roberts(pty:pla), Attorney Richard Steven Busch added to party Jesse Walker(pty:pla))(Busch, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Andrew Guerrero et al v. Logan Paul et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Logan Paul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maverick Media
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mackenzie Roberts
Represented By: Richard Steven Busch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Brackett
Represented By: Richard Steven Busch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Flobots Music LLC
Represented By: Richard Steven Busch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Laurie
Represented By: Richard Steven Busch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Ortiz
Represented By: Richard Steven Busch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Guerrero
Represented By: Richard Steven Busch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Walker
Represented By: Richard Steven Busch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?