Norma Franchina v. Hoag Memorial Hospital Presbyterian CIGNA Group Insurance, Policy No. FLK0960425 et al

Plaintiff: Ms Norma Franchina and Norma Franchina
Defendant: Hoag Memorial Hospital Presbyterian/CIGNA Group Insurance, Policy No. FLK0960425, an ERISA Plan; Life Insurance Company of North America, Life Insurance Company of North America and Hoag Memorial Hospital Presbyterian CIGNA Group Insurance, Policy No. FLK0960425
Case Number: 2:2019cv04273
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Karen L Stevenson
Referring Judge: John F Walter
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER OF DISMISSAL by Judge John F. Walter. In the Notice of Settlement filed on July 9, 2019 #15 , the parties represent that they have settled this action. As a result, the Court dismisses this action without prejudice subject to either party reopening the action on or before August 8, 2019. The Court will retain jurisdiction for the sole purpose of enforcing the settlement until August 8, 2019. Thereafter, absent further order of the Court, the dismissal of this action will be with prejudice. All dates in this action, including the trial date are vacated. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (iv)
July 9, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Settlement (Joint) filed by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America. (Maguire, Daniel)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge John F. Walter: Counsel are hereby notified that a Scheduling Conference has been set for August 5, 2019 at 1:15 p.m. before Judge John F. Walter in Courtroom 7A, 350 W. 1st St, Los Angeles, CA 90012. Lead Trial Counsel shall attend all proceedings before this Court, including the Scheduling Conference. Counsel are directed to comply with Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 26-1 in a timely fashion and to file a Joint Report, on or before July 29, 2019. (iv)
July 2, 2019 Filing 13 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America, (Maguire, Daniel)
July 2, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America.(Maguire, Daniel)
June 17, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Norma Franchina, upon Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America served on 5/28/2019, answer due 6/18/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corp authorized agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Monge, Troy)
June 17, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Norma Franchina pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Hoag Memorial Hospital Presbyterian CIGNA Group Insurance, Policy No. FLK0960425. (Monge, Troy)
June 11, 2019 Filing 9 Joint APPLICATION to Extend Time to File Answer to 7/18/2019 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants Hoag Memorial Hospital Presbyterian CIGNA Group Insurance, Policy No. FLK0960425, Life Insurance Company of North America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Daniel W Maguire added to party Hoag Memorial Hospital Presbyterian CIGNA Group Insurance, Policy No. FLK0960425(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel W Maguire added to party Life Insurance Company of North America(pty:dft)) (Maguire, Daniel)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv)
May 17, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Hoag Memorial Hospital Presbyterian CIGNA Group Insurance, Policy No. FLK0960425, Life Insurance Company of North America. (ghap)
May 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
May 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (ghap)
May 16, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Norma Franchina. (Monge, Troy)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Norma Franchina, (Monge, Troy)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Norma Franchina. (Monge, Troy)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23754057 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Norma Franchina. (Attorney Troy Dana Monge added to party Norma Franchina(pty:pla))(Monge, Troy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Norma Franchina v. Hoag Memorial Hospital Presbyterian CIGNA Group Insurance, Policy No. FLK0960425 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hoag Memorial Hospital Presbyterian/CIGNA Group Insurance, Policy No. FLK0960425, an ERISA Plan; Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Daniel W Maguire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hoag Memorial Hospital Presbyterian CIGNA Group Insurance, Policy No. FLK0960425
Represented By: Daniel W Maguire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ms Norma Franchina
Represented By: Troy Dana Monge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norma Franchina
Represented By: Troy Dana Monge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?